Weizeng Liu v. The Grier School
Plaintiff: WEIZENG LIU
Defendant: THE GRIER SCHOOL, d/b/a Grier School
Case Number: 24-3157
Filed: November 18, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (AWI) [Entered: 12/20/2024 02:55 PM]
December 20, 2024 Filing 13 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief and Appendix on behalf of Appellant Weizeng Liu due on or before 01/29/2025. (AWI) [Entered: 12/20/2024 02:53 PM]
December 18, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY STATUS for APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney Sean R. Riley, Esq. for Appellee The Grier School. Counsel's current status in this Court's attorney rolls is inactive. An attorney must have active status in order to appear before this Court. R.A.D.E. 17.3. If you wish to return to active status or if you believe that you have been marked inactive in error, please complete the Attorney Admission Renewal/Adjustment of Status Form available on this Court's website by 01/02/2025. Future filings will not be accepted from an attorney in inactive status. (TMK) [Entered: 12/18/2024 09:27 AM]
December 16, 2024 Filing 11 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee The Grier School. [24-3157] (SRR) [Entered: 12/16/2024 12:09 PM]
December 16, 2024 Filing 10 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sean R. Riley on behalf of Appellee(s) The Grier School. [24-3157] (SRR) [Entered: 12/16/2024 12:08 PM]
December 4, 2024 Filing 9 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Attorney Sean R. Riley, Esq. for Appellee The Grier School requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 12/18/2024. Disclosure Statement on or before 12/18/2024. (TMK) [Entered: 12/04/2024 09:34 AM]
November 26, 2024 Filing 8 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Weizeng Liu. [24-3157] (JOP) [Entered: 11/26/2024 01:53 PM]
November 26, 2024 Filing 7 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Weizeng Liu. [24-3157] (JOP) [Entered: 11/26/2024 01:51 PM]
November 26, 2024 Filing 6 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Weizeng Liu advising this court that no transcripts are available. [24-3157] (JOP) [Entered: 11/26/2024 01:39 PM]
November 26, 2024 Filing 5 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Weizeng Liu. [24-3157] (JOP) [Entered: 11/26/2024 01:34 PM]
November 26, 2024 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jennifer Price on behalf of Appellant(s) Weizeng Liu. [24-3157] (JOP) [Entered: 11/26/2024 01:30 PM]
November 18, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (AWI) [Entered: 11/18/2024 01:04 PM]
November 18, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AWI) [Entered: 11/18/2024 01:04 PM]
November 18, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Weizeng Liu in District Court No. 1-24-cv-00324. (AWI) [Entered: 11/18/2024 01:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Weizeng Liu v. The Grier School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEIZENG LIU
Represented By: Jennifer O. Price Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GRIER SCHOOL, d/b/a Grier School
Represented By: Sean R. Riley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?