Katherine Birl, et al v. Ski Shawnee Inc
Plaintiff: KATHERINE BIRL, AS PARENT AND NATURAL GUARDIAN OF G.B., A MINOR AND IN HER OWN RIGHT, DAMIAN BIRL, AS PARENT AND NATURAL GUARDIAN OF G.B., A MINOR AND IN HIS OWN RIGHT and COLLIN BIRL, IN HIS OWN RIGHT
Defendant: SKI SHAWNEE INC
Case Number: 25-1070
Filed: January 17, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2025 Filing 22 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (JK) [Entered: 03/07/2025 03:30 PM]
March 7, 2025 Filing 21 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Damian Birl and Katherine Birl due on or before 04/16/2025. Appendix due on or before 04/16/2025. (JK) [Entered: 03/07/2025 03:28 PM]
February 20, 2025 Filing 20 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Ski Shawnee Inc. [25-1070] (JJW) [Entered: 02/20/2025 12:47 PM]
February 20, 2025 Filing 19 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Anthony W. Hinkle, Esq. for Appellee Ski Shawnee Inc and James J. Walsh, Esq. for Appellee Ski Shawnee Inc requesting the following document(s): Disclosure Statement on or before 03/06/2025. (JK) [Entered: 02/20/2025 12:29 PM]
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER (Clerk) granting letter motion to amend caption filed by Appellants (JK) [Entered: 02/20/2025 12:24 PM]
February 5, 2025 Filing 17 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James J. Walsh on behalf of Appellee(s) Ski Shawnee, Inc.. [25-1070] (JJW) [Entered: 02/05/2025 09:51 AM]
February 5, 2025 Filing 16 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Anthony W. Hinkle on behalf of Appellee(s) Ski Shawnee, Inc.. [25-1070] (AWH) [Entered: 02/05/2025 09:49 AM]
February 4, 2025 Filing 15 FOLLOW UP LETTER to William M. Brennan, Esq. for Appellee Ski Shawnee Inc, Caitlin A. Donahue, Esq. for Appellee Ski Shawnee Inc, Anthony W. Hinkle, Esq. for Appellee Ski Shawnee Inc and James J. Walsh, Esq. for Appellee Ski Shawnee Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/18/2025. Disclosure Statement on or before 02/18/2025. (JK) [Entered: 02/04/2025 12:18 PM]
January 31, 2025 Filing 14 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Howard J. Bashman, Esq. for Appellants Collin Birl, Damian Birl and Katherine Birl Letter to the Court seeking correction of the docket and caption of this case to reflect the parties taking this appeal.. Certificate of Service dated 01/31/2025. Service made by ECF. [25-1070] (HJB) [Entered: 01/31/2025 04:02 PM]
January 31, 2025 Filing 13 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Katherine Birl and Damian Birl advising this court that no transcripts are available. [25-1070] (HJB) [Entered: 01/31/2025 02:27 PM]
January 31, 2025 Filing 12 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Katherine Birl and Damian Birl. [25-1070] (HJB) [Entered: 01/31/2025 02:26 PM]
January 31, 2025 Filing 11 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Katherine Birl and Damian Birl. [25-1070] (HJB) [Entered: 01/31/2025 02:23 PM]
January 31, 2025 Filing 10 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Katherine Birl and Damian Birl. [25-1070] (HJB) [Entered: 01/31/2025 02:21 PM]
January 30, 2025 Filing 9 Attorney Bar status modified for Adam J. Pantano, Esq. for Katherine Birl, Damian Birl and Collin Birl. Status is now active. (TMK) [Entered: 01/30/2025 03:40 PM]
January 30, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY STATUS for APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney Adam J. Pantano, Esq. for Appellants Katherine Birl, Damian Birl and Collin Birl. Counsel's current status in this Court's attorney rolls is inactive. An attorney must have active status in order to appear before this Court. R.A.D.E. 17.3. If you wish to return to active status or if you believe that you have been marked inactive in error, please complete the Attorney Admission Renewal/Adjustment of Status Form available on this Court's website by 02/13/2025. Future filings will not be accepted from an attorney in inactive status. (TMK) [Entered: 01/30/2025 09:10 AM]
January 28, 2025 Filing 7 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Adam J. Pantano, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) KATHERINE BIRL, as parent and natural guardian of G.B., a minor and in her own right, DAMIAN BIRL, as parent and natural guardian of G.B., a minor and in his own right. [25-1070] (AJP) [Entered: 01/28/2025 12:39 PM]
January 28, 2025 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Larry Bendesky, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) KATHERINE BIRL, as parent and natural guardian of G.B., a minor and in her own right, DAMIAN BIRL, as parent and natural guardian of G.B., a minor and in his own right. [25-1070] (LEB) [Entered: 01/28/2025 12:37 PM]
January 28, 2025 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert J. Mongeluzzi, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) KATHERINE BIRL, as parent and natural guardian of G.B., a minor and in her own right, DAMIAN BIRL, as parent and natural guardian of G.B., a minor and in his own right. [25-1070] (RJM) [Entered: 01/28/2025 12:13 PM]
January 17, 2025 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Howard J. Bashman on behalf of Appellant(s) Katherine Birl, as parent and natural guardian of G.B., a minor and in her own right, and Damian Birl, as parent and natural guardian of G.B., a minor and in his own right. [25-1070] (HJB) [Entered: 01/17/2025 03:39 PM]
January 17, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (JK) [Entered: 01/17/2025 03:10 PM]
January 17, 2025 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 01/17/2025 03:10 PM]
January 17, 2025 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Collin Birl, Damian Birl and Katherine Birl in District Court No. 3:22-cv-01598. (JK) [Entered: 01/17/2025 03:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Katherine Birl, et al v. Ski Shawnee Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE BIRL, AS PARENT AND NATURAL GUARDIAN OF G.B., A MINOR AND IN HER OWN RIGHT
Represented By: Adam J. Pantano Esq.
Represented By: Robert J. Mongeluzzi Esq.
Represented By: Scott A. Fellmeth Esq.
Represented By: Larry E. Bendesky Esq.
Represented By: Howard J. Bashman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAMIAN BIRL, AS PARENT AND NATURAL GUARDIAN OF G.B., A MINOR AND IN HIS OWN RIGHT
Represented By: Adam J. Pantano Esq.
Represented By: Robert J. Mongeluzzi Esq.
Represented By: Scott A. Fellmeth Esq.
Represented By: Larry E. Bendesky Esq.
Represented By: Howard J. Bashman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLLIN BIRL, IN HIS OWN RIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKI SHAWNEE INC
Represented By: James J. Walsh Esq.
Represented By: Anthony W. Hinkle Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin A. Donahue Esq.
Represented By: William M. Brennan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?