Anthony Hill v. Superintendent Mercer SCI, et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY D. HILL
Defendant: SUPERINTENDENT MERCER SCI and DISTRICT ATTORNEY ALLEGHENY COUNTY
Case Number: 25-1349
Filed: February 26, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (Clerk) referring to a motions panel the Motion by Appellant for Entry of Default Judgment. (SB) [Entered: 04/10/2025 03:50 PM]
April 7, 2025 Filing 12 Motion by Appellant for Entry of Default Judgment.. Response due on 04/24/2025. Certificate of Service dated 04/01/2025. Service made by US mail. (SB) [Entered: 04/10/2025 03:47 PM]
March 17, 2025 Filing 11 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Anthony D. Hill. (SB) [Entered: 03/18/2025 03:55 PM]
March 17, 2025 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF POVERTY filed by Appellant Anthony D. Hill to Accompany Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (SB) [Entered: 03/18/2025 11:46 AM]
March 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Anthony D. Hill. The Court may reconsider in forma pauperis status or request additional information at any time during the course of these proceedings. (SB) [Entered: 03/14/2025 02:55 PM]
March 11, 2025 Filing 8 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Anthony D. Hill. (SB) [Entered: 03/11/2025 01:53 PM]
March 11, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION filed by Appellant Anthony D. Hill to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 03/02/2025. Service made by US mail. (SB) [Entered: 03/11/2025 01:52 PM]
March 5, 2025 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ashley N. Oravetz on behalf of Appellee(s) all appellees. [25-1349] (ANO) [Entered: 03/05/2025 10:30 AM]
March 3, 2025 Filing 5 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (SH) [Entered: 03/03/2025 12:36 PM]
February 27, 2025 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Samantha R. Bentley on behalf of Appellee(s) All Appellees. [25-1349] (SRB) [Entered: 02/27/2025 09:50 AM]
February 26, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (GCH) [Entered: 02/26/2025 03:51 PM]
February 26, 2025 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (GCH) [Entered: 02/26/2025 03:51 PM]
February 26, 2025 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Anthony D. Hill in District Court No. 2:24-cv-00788. (GCH) [Entered: 02/26/2025 03:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Anthony Hill v. Superintendent Mercer SCI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY D. HILL
Represented By: Anthony D. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERINTENDENT MERCER SCI
Represented By: Ashley N. Oravetz Esq.
Represented By: Ronald Eisenberg Esq.
Represented By: Samantha R. Bentley Esq.
Represented By: Susan E. Affronti Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT ATTORNEY ALLEGHENY COUNTY
Represented By: Ashley N. Oravetz Esq.
Represented By: Samantha R. Bentley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?