Sanderson Farms, Incorporated v. Tyson Foods, Incorporated Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellee: SANDERSON FARMS, INCORPORATED and PERDUE FARMS, INCORPORATED
Defendant - Appellant: TYSON FOODS, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 08-1461
Filed: April 28, 2008
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2008 Filing 26 Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 1:08-cv-00210-RDB [08-1461] (JSN)
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER filed [997881657] granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [24] Copies to all parties. [08-1461] (JSN)
June 20, 2008 Filing 24 Joint MOTION filed by Appellant Tyson Foods, Incorporated to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [24]. Date of service: 06/20/2008 [997880706] [08-1461] (EPJ)
June 9, 2008 Filing 23 NOTICE ISSUED to Perdue Farms, Incorporated and Sanderson Farms, Incorporated requesting response to Motion to extend filing time [22]Response due: 06/18/2008.[997872061] [08-1461] (JSN)
June 9, 2008 Filing 22 MOTION filed by Appellant Tyson Foods, Incorporated to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix. Date of service: 06/09/2008 [997871763] [08-1461] (EPJ)
May 20, 2008 Filing 21 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Paul Zidlicky for Tyson Foods, Incorporated by Attorney(s) Paul J. Zidlicky for party(s) Appellant Tyson Foods, Incorporated, in case 08-1461.[997860308] [08-1461] (JSN)
May 20, 2008 Filing 20 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Carter Phillips for Tyson Foods, Incorporated by Attorney(s) Carter G. Phillips for party(s) Appellant Tyson Foods, Incorporated, in case 08-1461.[997860307] [08-1461] (JSN)
May 19, 2008 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Eamon P. Joyce for Tyson Foods, Incorporated by Attorney(s) Eamon Paul Joyce for party(s) Appellant Tyson Foods, Incorporated, in case 08-1461.[997859470] [08-1461] (JSN)
May 15, 2008 Filing 18 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Randal Miller for Perdue Farms, Incorporated and Sanderson Farms, Incorporated.[997857958] [08-1461] (JSN)
May 15, 2008 Filing 17 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Nicholas M. DePalma for Perdue Farms, Incorporated and Sanderson Farms, Incorporated.[997857957] [08-1461] (JSN)
May 13, 2008 Filing 16 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/23/2008. Response Brief due 07/25/2008 [08-1461] (JSN)
May 13, 2008 Filing 15 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Caitlin Halligan.[997856375] [08-1461] (JSN)
May 13, 2008 Filing 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Helene Jaffe for Tyson Foods, Incorporated.[997856372] [08-1461] (JSN)
May 13, 2008 Filing 13 DOCKETING STATEMENT filed by Appellant Tyson Foods, Incorporated. Transcript needed: Y Transcript already on file: Y Transcript order attached: N [08-1461] (JSN)
May 2, 2008 Filing 12 DOCKETING NOTICE issued. Originating case number: 1:08-cv-00210-RDB. Initial forms due within 14 days. [08-1461] (JSN)
April 30, 2008 Filing 11 COURT ORDER filed [997849848] denying Motion for stay pending appeal [7] Copies to all parties. [08-1461] (JSN)
April 30, 2008 Filing 10 MOTION filed by Appellees Perdue Farms, Incorporated and Sanderson Farms, Incorporated to supplement response in opposition. Date of service: 04/30/2008 [997849842] [08-1461] (JSN)
April 29, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION filed by Appellees Perdue Farms, Incorporated and Sanderson Farms, Incorporated to exceed length limitations for response/answer. Date of service: 04/29/2008 [997848981] [08-1461] (JSN)
April 29, 2008 Filing 8 RESPONSE/ANSWER filed by Perdue Farms, Incorporated and Sanderson Farms, Incorporated to notice requesting response [3]. Nature of response: in opposition. [08-1461] (JSN)
April 29, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION filed by Appellant Tyson Foods, Incorporated for emergency stay of preliminary injunction pending appeal. Date of action to be stayed, if applicable:5/1/08.. Date of service: 04/29/2008 [997848846] [08-1461] (JSN)
April 28, 2008 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Appellee Perdue Farms, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [997848144] [08-1461] (JSN)
April 28, 2008 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Appellee Sanderson Farms, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [997848143] [08-1461] (JSN)
April 28, 2008 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Appellant Tyson Foods, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [997848135] [08-1461] (JSN)
April 28, 2008 Filing 3 NOTICE ISSUED to Perdue Farms, Incorporated and Sanderson Farms, Incorporated requesting response to Motion for stay pending appeal [2]Response due: 04/29/2008.[997848130] [08-1461] (JSN)
April 28, 2008 Filing 2 MOTION filed by Appellant Tyson Foods, Incorporated for stay pending appeal. Date of action to be stayed, if applicable:5/1/2008.. Date of service: 04/28/2008 [997848128] [08-1461] (JSN)
April 28, 2008 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:08-cv-00210-RDB. Case manager: JeffNeal. [08-1461] (JSN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sanderson Farms, Incorporated v. Tyson Foods, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: SANDERSON FARMS, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Nicholas M. DePalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: PERDUE FARMS, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Nicholas M. DePalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: TYSON FOODS, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Caitlin J. Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?