US v. Heidi Janelle Myers
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellant: HEIDI JANELLE SILVER MYERS
Case Number: 08-4823
Filed: August 22, 2008
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 55 Archival information. Item archived: Case File. Accession Number: 276 2015 0008. Box: 75 of 150.. [08-4811, 08-4812, 08-4813, 08-4814, 08-4815, 08-4816, 08-4818, 08-4819, 08-4820, 08-4821, 08-4822, 08-4823, 08-4824, 08-4825, 08-4826, 08-4827, 08-4828, 08-4829, 08-4830, 08-4831, 08-4832, 08-4833, 08-4834, 08-4835, 08-4836, 08-4837, 08-4838, 08-4839, 08-4840, 08-4841, 08-4842, 08-4843, 08-4844, 08-4845, 08-4846, 08-4847, 08-4848, 08-4849, 08-4850, 08-4851, 08-4852, 08-4853, 08-4855, 08-4856, 08-4857, 08-4858, 08-4859, 08-4860, 08-4861, 08-4862, 08-4863, 08-4864, 08-4865, 08-4867, 08-4868, 08-4869, 08-4870, 08-4866, 08-4871, 08-4872, 08-4854] AD [Entered: 04/28/2020 12:19 PM]
October 26, 2016 Filing 54 Briefs/Appendices archival information: Accession Number: 27620120024. Box: 50 of 65.. [08-4808, 08-4809, 08-4810, 08-4811, 08-4812, 08-4813, 08-4814, 08-4815, 08-4817, 08-4818, 08-4819, 08-4820, 08-4821, 08-4822, 08-4823, 08-4824, 08-4825] RP [Entered: 10/26/2016 02:14 PM]
January 29, 2009 Filing 52 Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 47 ],Judgment Order , [ # 46 ], Opinion. Originating case number: 5:06-cr-00055-FPS-JES-1 [08-4823] AB [Entered: 01/29/2009 06:55 AM]
January 21, 2009 Filing 51 COURT ORDER filed [998016489] denying Motion for rehearing and rehearing en banc [ # 49 ] Copies to all parties. [08-4823] AB [Entered: 01/21/2009 09:05 AM]
December 24, 2008 Filing 50 Mandate stayed by FRAP 41(d)(1). [08-4823] AB [Entered: 12/24/2008 06:17 AM]
December 23, 2008 Filing 49 PETITION for rehearing and rehearing en banc filed by Heidi Janelle Silver Myers. [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 12/23/2008 11:09 PM]
December 10, 2008 Filing 48 Copy of decision mailed to defendant. [ # 47 ], judgment Order , [ # 46 ], Opinion [08-4823] LRM [Entered: 12/10/2008 04:12 PM]
December 9, 2008 Filing 47 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 5:06-cr-00055-FPS-JES-1. Entered on Docket Date: 12/09/2008. [997991661] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [08-4823] AB [Entered: 12/09/2008 09:27 AM]
December 9, 2008 Filing 46 UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 5:06-cr-00055-FPS-JES-1 Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [997991658] [08-4823] AB [Entered: 12/09/2008 09:25 AM]
November 18, 2008 Filing 45 [Edited 11/18/2008 by JW]. [Reason for edit: Incorrect Entry Struck]. [08-4823] JW [Entered: 11/18/2008 03:48 PM]
October 21, 2008 Filing 44 REPLY BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Heidi Janelle Silver Myers. Number of pages: [38]. Entered on Docket Date: 10/22/2008. [997961287] [08-4823] AB [Entered: 10/22/2008 09:38 AM]
October 21, 2008 Filing 43 COURT ORDER filed [997960849] denying Motion to schedule oral argument [ # 32 ] Copies to all parties. [08-4823] DHB [Entered: 10/21/2008 03:12 PM]
October 21, 2008 Filing 41 BRIEF filed by Appellant Heidi Janelle Silver Myers in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Reply. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. [997960806] [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 10/21/2008 02:53 PM]
October 21, 2008 Filing 40 Corrected BRIEF filed by Appellee US in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/14/2008. [997960698] [08-4823] Paul Camilletti [Entered: 10/21/2008 01:54 PM]
October 20, 2008 Filing 38 NOTICE ISSUED to US requesting corrected electronic Appellee's brief. Corrected electronic brief due 10/30/2008. [08-4823] MS [Entered: 10/20/2008 11:52 AM]
October 14, 2008 Filing 39 RESPONSE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of US. Number of pages: [44]. Entered on Docket Date: 10/20/2008. [997959356] [08-4823] MS [Entered: 10/20/2008 12:08 PM]
October 14, 2008 Filing 37 [Edited 10/22/2008 by AB]. [Reason for edit: Incorrect Entry Struck]. Paul Camilletti [Entered: 10/14/2008 05:47 PM]
October 9, 2008 Filing 36 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 12/04/2008. Time: 8:45 - 9:00 [08-4823] JLC [Entered: 10/09/2008 01:46 PM]
October 8, 2008 Filing 35 RESPONSE/ANSWER filed by US to Motion oral argument via video-conference [ # 32 ], Motion to schedule oral argument [ # 32 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [08-4823] Paul Camilletti [Entered: 10/08/2008 04:08 PM]
October 8, 2008 Filing 34 Notice issued re: date of December 4, 2008.. [08-4823] PSC [Entered: 10/08/2008 11:26 AM]
October 8, 2008 Filing 33 NOTICE ISSUED to US requesting response to Motion oral argument via video-conference [ # 32 ], Motion to schedule oral argument [ # 32 ]Response due: 10/08/2008Response due: 10/08/2008.[997951636] [08-4823] AB [Entered: 10/08/2008 08:09 AM]
October 7, 2008 Filing 32 MOTION filed by Appellant Heidi Janelle Silver Myers to schedule oral argument, for oral argument via video-conference. Date of service: 10/07/2008 [997951547] [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 10/07/2008 05:06 PM]
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER filed [997950119] granting confidentiality certificate [ # 28 ]; sealing. Volume III of Joint Appendix. Copies to all parties. [08-4823] AB [Entered: 10/06/2008 01:28 PM]
October 3, 2008 Filing 31 OPENING BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Heidi Janelle Silver Myers. Number of pages: [72]. Entered on Docket Date: 10/07/2008. [997950977] [08-4823] AB [Entered: 10/07/2008 11:35 AM]
October 3, 2008 Filing 29 APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Heidi Janelle Silver Myers. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 3. Total number of pages in all volumes: 642. Total number of sealed volumes: 1. Entered on Docket Date: 10/06/2008. [997950114] [08-4823] AB [Entered: 10/06/2008 01:26 PM]
October 3, 2008 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY filed (Local Rule 25(c)) by Heidi Janelle Silver Myers. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: JA Volume III. [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 10/03/2008 05:11 PM]
October 3, 2008 Filing 27 Notice of paper filing of appendix Joint Appendix Volume III is under seal. Date paper copies mailed, dispatched or delivered to court: 10/03/2008. Method of filing paper copies: hand delivery. [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 10/03/2008 05:11 PM]
October 3, 2008 Filing 26 BRIEF filed by Appellant Heidi Janelle Silver Myers in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/03/2008. [997949593] [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 10/03/2008 05:10 PM]
September 29, 2008 Filing 25 Expedited BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening brief and appendix due 10/03/2008. Response brief due 10/14/2008 [08-4823] DHB [Entered: 09/29/2008 02:22 PM]
September 29, 2008 Filing 24 COURT ORDER filed [997945342] Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 21 ]; terminating Motion to expedite decision [ # 21 ] Copies to all parties. [08-4823] DHB [Entered: 09/29/2008 02:20 PM]
September 19, 2008 Filing 23 RESPONSE/ANSWER filed by US to Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 21 ], Motion to expedite decision [ # 21 ]. [08-4823] Paul Camilletti [Entered: 09/19/2008 04:06 PM]
September 18, 2008 Filing 22 NOTICE ISSUED to US requesting response to Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 21 ], Motion to expedite decision [ # 21 ]Response due: 09/22/2008Response due: 09/22/2008.[997938175] [08-4823] AB [Entered: 09/18/2008 01:36 PM]
September 17, 2008 Filing 21 MOTION filed by Appellant Heidi Janelle Silver Myers to accelerate case processing., to expedite decision. Date of service: 09/17/2008 [997937383] [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 09/17/2008 06:49 PM]
September 16, 2008 Filing 20 DOCKETING STATEMENT filed by Appellant Heidi Janelle Silver Myers. [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 09/16/2008 02:05 PM]
September 15, 2008 Filing 19 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Appellant Heidi Janelle Silver Myers re: filing of docketing statement (Loc.R. 3(b)) Docketing statement due from Heidi Janelle Silver Myers on 09/25/2008 [08-4823] AB [Entered: 09/15/2008 08:03 AM]
September 5, 2008 Filing 18 COURT ORDER filed [997929184] denying Motion for bail/release pending appeal (Local Rule 9(a) and (b)) [ # 9 ] Copies to all parties. [08-4823] AB [Entered: 09/05/2008 03:27 PM]
September 4, 2008 Filing 17 REPLY filed by Heidi Janelle Silver Myers to Response [ # 14 ], Response [ # 15 ]. [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 09/04/2008 03:13 AM]
September 3, 2008 Filing 16 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE: referencing [ # 14 ], Response filed by Appellee US. [997927667] [08-4823] Paul Camilletti [Entered: 09/03/2008 04:18 PM]
September 3, 2008 Filing 15 RESPONSE/ANSWER filed by US to Motion to exceed length limitations [ # 6 ], notice requesting response [ # 10 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [08-4823] Paul Camilletti [Entered: 09/03/2008 04:16 PM]
September 3, 2008 Filing 14 RESPONSE/ANSWER filed by US to notice requesting response [ # 10 ], Motion for bail/release pending appeal (Local Rule 9(a) and (b)) [ # 9 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [08-4823] Paul Camilletti [Entered: 09/03/2008 04:05 PM]
August 29, 2008 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY filed (Local Rule 25(c)) by Heidi Janelle Silver Myers. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Supplement to Appellant's Motion for Bond Pending Appeal (8/4/2008 Sentencing Transcript). [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 08/29/2008 06:41 PM]
August 29, 2008 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT OR MOTION filed by Appellant Heidi Janelle Silver Myers. Document Title: Supplement to Appellant's Emergency Motion for Bond Pending Appeal (8/4/2008 Sentencing Transcript). Date of service: 08/29/2008. Filed Ex parte: N. [997926109] [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 08/29/2008 06:37 PM]
August 27, 2008 Filing 11 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE received re: filing of transcript for sentencing hearing on 8/4/08 by Jennifer Vail-Kirkbride. Timely filed: Yes. Type of filing: Initial filing. [08-4823] AB [Entered: 08/28/2008 07:40 AM]
August 27, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE ISSUED to US requesting response to Motion for bail/release pending appeal (Local Rule 9(a) and (b)) [ # 9 ], Motion to exceed length limitations [ # 6 ]Response due: 09/03/2008 [997924412] [08-4823] DHB [Entered: 08/27/2008 04:12 PM]
August 27, 2008 Filing 9 Redacted Emergency MOTION filed by Appellant Heidi Janelle Silver Myers for bail or release pending appeal (Local Rule 9(a) and (b)). Date of service: 08/27/2008 [997924323] [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 08/27/2008 03:30 PM]
August 27, 2008 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY filed (Local Rule 25(c)) by Heidi Janelle Silver Myers. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Sealed Emergency Motion for Release Pending Appeal. [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 08/27/2008 03:21 PM]
August 27, 2008 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT OR MOTION filed by Appellant Heidi Janelle Silver Myers for bail or release pending appeal (Local Rule 9(a) and (b)). Document Title: Emergency Motion for Release Pending Appeal. Date of service: 08/27/2008. Filed Ex parte: N. [997924299] [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 08/27/2008 03:17 PM]
August 27, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION filed by Appellant Heidi Janelle Silver Myers to exceed length limitations for motion. Date of service: 08/27/2008 [997924182] [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 08/27/2008 02:12 PM]
August 27, 2008 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by William B. Moffitt for Heidi Janelle Silver Myers.[997924165] [08-4823] William Moffitt [Entered: 08/27/2008 01:58 PM]
August 25, 2008 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) for US.[997921987] [08-4823] Thomas Mucklow [Entered: 08/25/2008 09:21 AM]
August 22, 2008 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by paul T. Camilletti for US.[997921623] [08-4823] Paul Camilletti [Entered: 08/22/2008 02:26 PM]
August 22, 2008 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued. Re: [ # 1 ],case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days.. Originating case number: 5:06-cr-00055-FPS-JES-1. [08-4823] AB [Entered: 08/22/2008 01:56 PM]
August 22, 2008 Filing 1 Criminal case docketed. Originating case number: 5:06-cr-00055-FPS-JES-1. Date notice of appeal filed: 08/13/2008. Case manager: ABrownlee. [08-4823] AB [Entered: 08/22/2008 01:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: US v. Heidi Janelle Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Paul Thomas Camilletti
Represented By: Thomas Oliver Mucklow
Represented By: Sharon Lynn Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HEIDI JANELLE SILVER MYERS
Represented By: William Benjamin Moffitt III
Represented By: Heidi Janelle Silver Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?