Jonathan Riches v. Philip Woolston Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellant: JONATHAN LEE RICHES
Defendant - Appellee: PHILIP WOOLSTON, Individually and in his official capacity as Teacher at FCI Williamsburg, STEVE JOBS and APPLE COMPUTER INC.
Case Number: 08-7983
Filed: September 24, 2008
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2008 Filing 7 Local Rule 45 mandate issued. Originating case number: 3:07-cv-00632-HEH [08-7983] (AC)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed [997993851] dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute (Local Rule 45) [6] Copies to all parties. [08-7983] (AC)
October 24, 2008 Filing 5 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Jonathan Lee Riches re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA (Loc.R. 24) Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. [08-7983] (AC)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:08-cv-00632-HEH. [08-7983] (AC)
September 24, 2008 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Jonathan Lee Riches ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. [08-7983] (AC)
September 24, 2008 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:08-cv-00632-HEH. Case manager: ACooper. Date notice of appeal filed: 09/08/2008 [08-7983] (AC)

Search for this case: Jonathan Riches v. Philip Woolston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: JONATHAN LEE RICHES
Represented By: Jonathan Lee Riches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: PHILIP WOOLSTON, Individually and in his official capacity as Teacher at FCI Williamsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: STEVE JOBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: APPLE COMPUTER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?