Francis Akinro v. Towson Library Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellant: FRANCIS AKINRO
Defendant - Appellee: TOWSON LIBRARY
Case Number: 10-1666
Filed: June 15, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2010 Filing 10 Local Rule 45 mandate issued. Originating case number: 1:10-cv-01458-BEL [10-1666] (CH)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed [998408277] dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute (Local Rule 45) [9] Copies to all parties. [10-1666] (CH)
July 23, 2010 Filing 8 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Francis Akinro re: failure to satisfy fee and informal briefing requirements Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. [10-1666] (CH)
June 21, 2010 Filing 7 FEE NOTICE issued to Francis Akinro - after denial by district court. Fee or application to proceed as an indigent due 07/21/2010 Originating case number: 1:10-cv-01458-BEL. [10-1666] (CH)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DISTRICT COURT UPDATE. ORDER denying [6] Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis - Signed by Judge Benson Everett Legg on 6/18/2010. [10-1666] (AD)
June 21, 2010 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:10-cv-01458-BEL. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. [10-1666] (CH)
June 16, 2010 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT UPDATE. Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit -- Initial [10-1666] (JB)
June 15, 2010 Filing 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 06/29/2010 [10-1666] (CH)
June 15, 2010 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 07/09/2010 Informal response brief, if any: 17 days after informal opening brief filed. [10-1666] (CH)
June 15, 2010 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:10-cv-01458-BEL. Case manager: CHalupa. Date notice of appeal filed: 06/15/2010 [10-1666] (CH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Francis Akinro v. Towson Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: FRANCIS AKINRO
Represented By: Francis Akinro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: TOWSON LIBRARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?