James Blakely v. Robert Ward
Plaintiff - Appellant: JAMES G. BLAKELY, a/k/a Jimmy G. Blakely
Defendant - Appellee: ROBERT WARDS, Regional Director, DAVID M. TATARSKY, General Counsel Attorney, ANTHONY PADULA, Warden, M. BELL, Associate Warden, MAJOR DEAN, NURSE MACDONALD, Head Nurse at Lee Correctional, J. LIVINGTON, Librarian, A. SMITH, Business Office Manager at Lee Correctional Institution, T. EVANS, Chaplain, CAIN, Chaplain, MS. SIMON, Mailroom Supervisor at Lee Correctional, LT. JUNE, Wateree Corr, MR. BAINOR, Medical, MR. BIDDINGER, Cafteria Supervisor, MS. TAYLOR, Canteen Supervisor, MS. HANCOCK, Commissionary Manager and JON OZMINT, Director
Case Number: 11-6945
Filed: July 26, 2011
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 14, 2012 Summary Blakely v. Wards
October 21, 2013 Summary James Blakely v. Robert Wards
October 22, 2013 Summary James Blakely v. Robert Wards
October 24, 2013 Summary James Blakely v. Robert Wards

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 404695314 AMENDING ORDER/OPINION filed [999225409] amending and superseding Published Authored Opinion [999002806-2], Published Authored Opinion [999221875-2]. Originating case number: 4:10-cv-00718-RMG Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Jina Moon, Matthew Vaughan, Frederick Hall. [11-6945]
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 404692190 AMENDING ORDER/OPINION filed [999223960] amending and superseding Published Authored Opinion [999221875-2]. Originating case number: 4:10-cv-00718-RMG Copies to all parties.. [11-6945]
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 404218718 PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Motion disposition in opinion denying Motion to reconsider [998693056-2] Originating case number: 4:10-cv-00718-RMG Paper copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [999002806]. [11-6945]
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Blakely v. Robert Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: JAMES G. BLAKELY, a/k/a Jimmy G. Blakely
Represented By: James G. Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: ROBERT WARDS, Regional Director
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: DAVID M. TATARSKY, General Counsel Attorney
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: ANTHONY PADULA, Warden
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: M. BELL, Associate Warden
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: MAJOR DEAN
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: NURSE MACDONALD, Head Nurse at Lee Correctional
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: J. LIVINGTON, Librarian
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: A. SMITH, Business Office Manager at Lee Correctional Institution
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: T. EVANS, Chaplain
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: CAIN, Chaplain
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: MS. SIMON, Mailroom Supervisor at Lee Correctional
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: LT. JUNE, Wateree Corr
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: MR. BAINOR, Medical
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: MR. BIDDINGER, Cafteria Supervisor
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: MS. TAYLOR, Canteen Supervisor
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: MS. HANCOCK, Commissionary Manager
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: JON OZMINT, Director
Represented By: Erin Mary Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?