Ephraim Ugwuonye v. Omoyele Sowore
Defendant: MOBOLAJI ALUKO, OLUWOLE ROTIMI and DOMAIN BY PROXY, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: EPHRAIM EMEKA UGWUONYE
Defendant / Appellee: OMOYELE SOWORE, d/b/a Saharareporters.com
Case Number: 12-2584
Filed: December 31, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2013 Filing 13 Local Rule 45 mandate issued. Originating case number: 8:09-cv-00658-PJM.. [12-2584] DSD [Entered: 04/10/2013 08:05 AM]
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER filed [999083842] dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute (Local Rule 45) Copies to all parties.. [12-2584] DSD [Entered: 04/10/2013 08:04 AM]
March 21, 2013 Filing 11 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Ephraim Emeka Ugwuonye in 12-2584 re: filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days, filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1) Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days, filing of docketing statement (Loc.R. 3(b)) Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days.. [12-2584, 13-1080] CH [Entered: 03/21/2013 04:27 PM]
February 1, 2013 Filing 10 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [12-2584, 13-1080] SLW [Entered: 02/01/2013 03:13 PM]
January 31, 2013 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Bruce D. Brown for Omoyele Sowore in 12-2584, 13-1080.[999034522] [12-2584, 13-1080] Bruce Brown [Entered: 01/31/2013 05:10 PM]
January 31, 2013 Filing 7 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Party Ephraim Emeka Ugwuonye in 12-2584 re: filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1) Disclosure statement due from Ephraim Emeka Ugwuonye on 02/05/2013, filing of docketing statement (Loc.R. 3(b)) Docketing statement due from Ephraim Emeka Ugwuonye on 02/05/2013. Mailed to: Ephraim Emeka Ugwuonye. [12-2584, 13-1080] CH [Entered: 01/31/2013 04:15 PM]
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed [999024255] consolidating case 13-1080 with 12-2584 Cross-appeal appellant:Ephraim Emeka Ugwuonye. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Ephraim Ugwuonye. [12-2584, 13-1080] CH [Entered: 01/17/2013 10:39 AM]
January 17, 2013 Filing 5 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:09-cv-00658-PJM. Case manager: CHalupa. [13-1080, 12-2584] CH [Entered: 01/17/2013 10:25 AM]
January 14, 2013 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Omoyele Sowore. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999021935] [12-2584] Laurie Babinski [Entered: 01/14/2013 05:48 PM]
January 14, 2013 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Laurie A. Babinski for Omoyele Sowore.[999021934] [12-2584] Laurie Babinski [Entered: 01/14/2013 05:47 PM]
December 31, 2012 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 8:09-cv-00658-PJM. Mailed to: Ephraim Ugwuonye. [12-2584] CH [Entered: 12/31/2012 03:39 PM]
December 31, 2012 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:09-cv-00658-PJM. Case manager: CHalupa. [12-2584] CH [Entered: 12/31/2012 03:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ephraim Ugwuonye v. Omoyele Sowore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EPHRAIM EMEKA UGWUONYE
Represented By: Ephraim Emeka Ugwuonye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOBOLAJI ALUKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLUWOLE ROTIMI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOMAIN BY PROXY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OMOYELE SOWORE, d/b/a Saharareporters.com
Represented By: Laurie Ann Babinski
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?