Intl. Refugee Assistance v. Donald J. Trump Featured Case

On September 24, 2017, President Trump issued Proclamation No. 9645 (the Proclamation), a travel ban which indefinitely suspends the entry of some or all immigrants and nonimmigrants from eight countries: Chad, Iran, Libya, North Korea, Somalia, Syria, Venezuela, and Yemen. The Plaintiffs assert that the Proclamation violates some or all of the Immigration and Nationality Act, the Establishment Clause of the First Amendment, the Free Speech and Free Association Clauses of the First Amendment, the equal protection and procedural due process components of the Due Process Clause of the Fifth Amendment, the Religious Freedom Restoration Act, the Refugee Act, and the Administrative Procedure Act.

Plaintiff: ALLAN HAKKY and SAMANEH TAKALOO
Plaintiff - Appellee: INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT, a project of the Urban Justice Center, Inc., on behalf of itself and its clients, HIAS, INC., on behalf of itself and its clients, JOHN DOES #1 & 3, JANE DOE #2, MIDDLE EAST STUDIES ASSOCIATION OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., on behalf of itself and its members, MUHAMMED METEAB, PAUL HARRISON, IBRAHIM AHMED MOHOMED and ARAB AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK, on behalf of itself and its clients
Defendant - Appellant: DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, ELAINE C. DUKE, in her official capacity as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, JOHN F. KELLY, in his official capacity as Secretary of Homeland Security, REX TILLERSON, in his official capacity as Secretary of State and DANIEL R. COATS, in his official capacity as Director of National Intelligence
Case Number: 17-2231
Filed: October 20, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
February 15, 2018 Summary International Refugee Assistance Project v. Trump
February 28, 2018 Summary International Refugee Assistance Project v. Trump

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2018 178 Case reopened. Supreme Court Remand. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] SJC [Entered: 07/30/2018 12:32 PM]
July 30, 2018 177 SUPREME COURT REMARK--judgment in certiorari 17-1270 remanding case received. REMANDED vacated, 07/30/2018. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] SJC [Entered: 07/30/2018 12:29 PM]
July 30, 2018 176 SUPREME COURT REMARK--judgment in certiorari #17-1194 remanding case received. REMANDED vacated, 07/30/2018. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] SJC [Entered: 07/30/2018 12:26 PM]
June 28, 2018 175 SUPREME COURT REMARK--order granting cert and remanding case received. 06/28/2018, REMANDED vacated. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240]--[Edited 06/29/2018 by SJC] SJC [Entered: 06/28/2018 02:56 PM]
June 28, 2018 174 SUPREME COURT REMARK--order granting cert and remanding case received. 06/28/2018, REMANDED vacated. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240]--[Edited 06/29/2018 by SJC] SJC [Entered: 06/28/2018 02:55 PM]
March 22, 2018 172 MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee Technology Companies in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233 to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney. Was a copy of the motion served on the defendant? Y. Was the defendant advised of right to file response within 7 days? N. Date and method of service: 03/22/2018 ecf. [1000262504] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] John Lewis [Entered: 03/22/2018 12:25 PM]
March 13, 2018 171 SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari filed. 03/09/2018. 17-1270. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] SJC [Entered: 03/13/2018 02:24 PM]
February 28, 2018 170 Featured Case AMENDED OPINION filed amending and superseding opinion dated 02/15/2018. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Copies to all parties.. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] TF [Entered: 02/28/2018 09:59 AM]
February 28, 2018 169 AMENDING ORDER filed. Copies to all parties.. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] TF [Entered: 02/28/2018 09:56 AM]
February 27, 2018 168 SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari filed. 02/23/2018. 17-1194. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] SJC [Entered: 02/27/2018 09:12 AM]
February 15, 2018 167 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 17-2231 opn.p.arg 17-2232 opn.p.arg 17-2233 opn.p.arg 17-2240 opn.p.arg. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case numbers: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC, 8:17-cv-02921-TDC, and 1:17-cv-02969-TDC. Entered on Docket Date: 02/15/2018. [1000242143] Copies to all parties and the district court. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 02/15/2018 10:38 AM]
February 15, 2018 166 Featured Case OPINION ATTACHMENTS. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 02/15/2018 10:34 AM]
February 15, 2018 165 Featured Case PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case numbers: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC, 8:17-cv-02921-TDC, and 1:17-cv-02969-TDC. [1000242135]. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 02/15/2018 10:31 AM]
February 15, 2018 164 COURT ORDER filed [1000242132] granting motion to file addendum/attachment [152]; granting motion for judicial notice and to supplement the record [159]; granting motion for judicial notice and to supplement the record [162]. Copies to all parties. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 02/15/2018 10:27 AM]
December 22, 2017 163 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellees Grannaz Amirjamshidi, Arab American Association of New York, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Mohamad Mashta, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Shapour Shirani, Yemeni-American Merchants Association and Fakhri Ziaolhagh in 17-2231. [1000213949]. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 12/22/2017 10:18 PM]
December 22, 2017 162 MOTION by Appellees Iranian Alliances Across Borders, Iranian Students' Foundation, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #5, John Doe #6 and Jane Doe #4 in 17-2232 for judicial notice of Visa denial received by mother-in-law of Plaintiff John Doe #6 , to supplement record. Date and method of service: 12/22/2017 ecf. [1000213717] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Mark Mosier [Entered: 12/22/2017 01:58 PM]
December 8, 2017 161 EN BANC ORAL ARGUMENT heard before the Honorable Roger L. Gregory, Paul V. Niemeyer, Diana Gribbon Motz, William B. Traxler, Jr., Robert B. King, Dennis W. Shedd, G. Steven Agee, Barbara Milano Keenan, James A. Wynn, Jr., Albert Diaz, Henry F. Floyd, Stephanie D. Thacker and Pamela A. Harris. Attorneys arguing case: Ms. Cecillia D. Wang for - Paul Harrison, Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and Appellees John Doe #4, John Doe #5, Jane Doe #2, International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS, Inc., Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, John Does #1 & 3, Arab American Association of New York, Yemeni-American Merchants Association, Mohamad Mashta, Grannaz Amirjamshidi, Fakhri Ziaolhagh, Shapour Shirani and Afsaneh Khazaeli, Hashim M. Mooppan for Appellants United States Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Rex Tillerson, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Donald J. Trump, Daniel R. Coats and Elaine C. Duke and Ms. Cecillia D. Wang for Appellees John Doe #4, John Doe #5, Jane Doe #2, International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS, Inc., Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, John Does #1 & 3, Arab American Association of New York, Yemeni-American Merchants Association, Mohamad Mashta, Grannaz Amirjamshidi, Fakhri Ziaolhagh, Shapour Shirani and Afsaneh Khazaeli in 17-2231, Attorney Hashim M. Mooppan for Appellants Rex Tillerson, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Donald J. Trump, Elaine C. Duke, James McCament and Kevin K. McAleenan in 17-2232, Attorney Hashim M. Mooppan for Appellants United States Department of State, United States Department of Homeland Security, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and Elaine C. Duke in 17-2233, Ms. Cecillia D. Wang for Appellants John Doe #4, John Doe #5, Jane Doe #2, International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS, Inc., Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, John Does #1 & 3, Arab American Association of New York, Yemeni-American Merchants Association, Mohamad Mashta, Grannaz Amirjamshidi, Fakhri Ziaolhagh, Shapour Shirani and Afsaneh Khazaeli and Hashim M. Mooppan for Appellees United States Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Rex Tillerson, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Donald J. Trump, Daniel R. Coats and Elaine C. Duke in 17-2240. Courtroom Deputy: RJ Warren. [1000205625] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 12/08/2017 11:09 AM]
December 6, 2017 160 NOTICE re: Plaintiffs by Grannaz Amirjamshidi, Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Afsaneh Khazaeli, Mohamad Mashta, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Shapour Shirani, Yemeni-American Merchants Association and Fakhri Ziaolhagh in 17-2231, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, John Doe #6, Iranian Alliances Across Borders and Iranian Students' Foundation in 17-2232, John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Sumaya Hamadmad, Fahed Muqbil and Eblal Zakzok in 17-2233, 17-2240. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 12/06/2017 01:33 PM]
December 4, 2017 159 MOTION by Appellees Eblal Zakzok, Fahed Muqbil, Sumaya Hamadmad, John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2 and Jane Doe #3 in 17-2233 for judicial notice of statements of the President and his spokesperson on November 29, 2017 , to supplement record. Date and method of service: 12/04/2017 ecf. [1000202965] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Robert Atkins [Entered: 12/04/2017 07:15 PM]
December 4, 2017 158 SUPREME COURT REMARK order granting stay. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] SJC [Entered: 12/04/2017 04:19 PM]
November 29, 2017 157 REPLY BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Grannaz Amirjamshidi, Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Afsaneh Khazaeli, Mohamad Mashta, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Shapour Shirani, Yemeni-American Merchants Association and Fakhri Ziaolhagh in 17-2231 and 17-2240, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, John Doe #6, Iranian Alliances Across Borders and Iranian Students' Foundation in 17-2232, John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Sumaya Hamadmad, Fahed Muqbil and Eblal Zakzok in 17-2233. Number of pages: [21]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 12/01/2017. Received by clerk date: 12/01/2017. [1000201561] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 12/01/2017 11:12 AM]
November 29, 2017 156 BRIEF by Appellees Arab American Association of New York, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Afsaneh Khazaeli, Mohamad Mashta, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Shapour Shirani, Yemeni-American Merchants Association and Fakhri Ziaolhagh in 17-2231, Appellants Grannaz Amirjamshidi and Jane Doe #2 in 17-2240 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/30/2017. [1000200283] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 11/29/2017 08:51 PM]
November 29, 2017 154 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Yemeni-American Merchants Association in 17-2240. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000199896] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 11/29/2017 11:57 AM]
November 29, 2017 153 Featured Case ORDER filed [1000199616] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)). Copies to all parties. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/29/2017 08:14 AM]
November 28, 2017 155 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Massachusetts Technology Leadership Counsel, Inc. in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [193]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/29/2017. Received by clerk date: 11/28/2017. [1000200101] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/29/2017 02:55 PM]
November 28, 2017 152 MOTION by Potential Amicus Curiae Massachusetts Technology Leadership Counsel, Inc. in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233 file addendum/attachment to Amicus Brief.. Date and method of service: 11/28/2017 ecf. [1000199531] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Gare Smith [Entered: 11/28/2017 05:50 PM]
November 28, 2017 151 MOTION by Potential Amicus Curiae Massachusetts Technology Leadership Counsel, Inc. in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233 to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal outside time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 11/28/2017 ecf. [1000199530] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Gare Smith [Entered: 11/28/2017 05:48 PM]
November 28, 2017 150 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Potential Amicus Curiae Massachusetts Technology Leadership Counsel, Inc. in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233 in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000199529] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Gare Smith [Entered: 11/28/2017 05:44 PM]
November 28, 2017 133 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jethro Eisenstein for Eblal Zakzok in 17-2233.[1000199267] [17-2233, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2240] Jethro Eisenstein [Entered: 11/28/2017 02:27 PM]
November 24, 2017 126 Letter re: [118] Notice by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Appellees Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240. [1000197345] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 11/24/2017 04:14 PM]
November 22, 2017 149 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of FRED T. KOREMATSU CENTER FOR LAW & EQUALITY, Jay Hirabayashi, Karen Korematsu, National Bar Associations of Color and Holly Yasui in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: []. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199503] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 04:35 PM]
November 22, 2017 127 RESPONSE/REPLY BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231 and 17-2240, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233. Number of pages: [41]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. Received by clerk date: 11/27/2017. [1000199219] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 01:58 PM]
November 22, 2017 125 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Paul W. Hughes for Technology Companies in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233.[1000197330] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] John Lewis [Entered: 11/22/2017 06:56 PM]
November 22, 2017 124 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John T. Lewis for Technology Companies in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233.[1000197329] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] John Lewis [Entered: 11/22/2017 06:49 PM]
November 22, 2017 123 BRIEF by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE/REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/22/2017. [1000197292] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 11/22/2017 04:09 PM]
November 22, 2017 122 Featured Case ORDER filed [1000197284] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)). Copies to all parties.. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] AW [Entered: 11/22/2017 03:27 PM]
November 22, 2017 121 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Karen Korematsu, Jay Hirabayashi, Holly Yasui, The Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Civil Rights Organizations, and National Bar Associations of Color as Amici supporting Appellee in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/22/2017. [1000197259] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Pratik Shah [Entered: 11/22/2017 02:55 PM]
November 22, 2017 120 Featured Case ORDER filed [1000197222] granting filing of amicus curiae briefs (FRAP 29(e)). Copies to all parties. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/22/2017 02:24 PM]
November 22, 2017 119 Docket correction requested from Mr. Gare Alan Smith for Massachusetts Technology Leadership Counsel, Inc. in 17-2231(L) Re: [108] Motion to file amicus curiae brief. Access to Motion to file amicus curiae brief has been restricted to case participants. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/22/2017 02:11 PM]
November 22, 2017 118 Notice issued re: request that the Government supplement the record. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/22/2017 01:52 PM]
November 21, 2017 117 COURT ORDER filed [1000196598] approving/authorizing request from C-Span to provide live audio feed of oral argument Copies to all parties. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] PSC [Entered: 11/21/2017 04:09 PM]
November 21, 2017 116 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Elizabeth B. Wydra for Richard J. Durbin in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233.[1000196522] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Elizabeth Wydra [Entered: 11/21/2017 03:17 PM]
November 20, 2017 115 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Matthew E. Sloan for Immigration Equality, the New York City Gay and Lesbian Anti-Violence Project, The National Queer Asian Pacific Islander Alliance, The LGBT Bar Association of Los Angeles, The LGBT Bar Association of Greater New York, Lesbian and Gay Bar Association of Chicago, GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders and Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233.[1000195696] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Matthew Sloan [Entered: 11/20/2017 10:36 PM]
November 20, 2017 114 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Noelle M. Reed for Immigration Equality, the New York City Gay and Lesbian Anti-Violence Project, The National Queer Asian Pacific Islander Alliance, The LGBT Bar Association of Los Angeles, The LGBT Bar Association of Greater New York, Lesbian and Gay Bar Association of Chicago, GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders and Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233.[1000195683] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Noelle Reed [Entered: 11/20/2017 07:34 PM]
November 17, 2017 148 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of The American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [43]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199487] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 04:20 PM]
November 17, 2017 147 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Technology Companies in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240. Number of pages: [56]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. Received by clerk date: 11/27/2017. [1000199473] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 04:14 PM]
November 17, 2017 146 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of National Asian Pacific American Bar Association in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [34]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199465] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 04:11 PM]
November 17, 2017 145 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Organizations and Clergy Members in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199439] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 03:57 PM]
November 17, 2017 144 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Colleges and Universities in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240 Number of pages: [43]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017.. [1000199429] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 03:53 PM]
November 17, 2017 143 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Professors of Federal Courts Jurisprudence, Constitutional Law, and Immigration Law in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199424] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 03:48 PM]
November 17, 2017 142 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Members of Congress in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [56]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199415] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 03:44 PM]
November 17, 2017 141 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Scholars of Immigration Law in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [38]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199408] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 03:40 PM]
November 17, 2017 140 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of International Bar Association's Human Rights Institute in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [28]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199398] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 03:35 PM]
November 17, 2017 139 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [68]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199383] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 03:28 PM]
November 17, 2017 138 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles, City of Philadelphia City of New York and U.S. Conference of Mayors in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [45]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199337] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 03:09 PM]
November 17, 2017 137 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Immigration Law Professors on Statutory Claims in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199314] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 02:55 PM]
November 17, 2017 136 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom, GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, Immigration Equality, Lesbian and Gay Bar Association of Chicago, The LGBT Bar Association of Greater New York, The LGBT Bar Association of Los Angeles, The National Queer Asian Pacific Islander Alliance and The New York City Gay and Lesbian Anti-Violence Project in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [46]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199289] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 02:41 PM]
November 17, 2017 135 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of International Labor Organizations in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [43]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199281] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 02:37 PM]
November 17, 2017 134 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Council on American-Islamic Relations, Muslim Justice League and Muslim Public Affairs Council in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [39]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199277] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 02:33 PM]
November 17, 2017 132 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Cato Institute in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [44]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199259] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 02:20 PM]
November 17, 2017 113 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by The American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240 in electronic and paper format. [1000194915] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/20/2017 08:35 AM]
November 17, 2017 112 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Technology Companies in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194779] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Andrew Pincus [Entered: 11/17/2017 11:50 PM]
November 17, 2017 111 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by National Asian Pacific American Bar Association (Amicus Supporting Appellees) in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/20/2017. [1000194776] [17-2231] Joshua Rogaczewski [Entered: 11/17/2017 09:03 PM]
November 17, 2017 110 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Organizations and Clergy Members in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194773] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Marc Hearron [Entered: 11/17/2017 08:18 PM]
November 17, 2017 109 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Colleges and Universities in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/20/2017. [1000194770] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Lindsay Harrison [Entered: 11/17/2017 06:33 PM]
November 17, 2017 108 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by Massachusetts Technology Leadership Counsel, Inc., Amicus Supporting Plaintiffs to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 11/17/2017 ecf. [1000194762] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240]--[Edited 12/04/2017 by RW] Gare Smith [Entered: 11/17/2017 05:45 PM]
November 17, 2017 107 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Professors of Federal Courts Jurisprudence, Constitutional Law, and Immigration Law in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194761] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Meir Feder [Entered: 11/17/2017 05:44 PM]
November 17, 2017 106 MOTION by American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, Amicus Curiae leave to file Brief Amicus Curiae. Date and method of service: 11/17/2017 ecf. [1000194759] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Christopher Wright [Entered: 11/17/2017 05:36 PM]
November 17, 2017 105 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Members of Congress, as Amici Curiae in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194753] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Peter Karanjia [Entered: 11/17/2017 05:04 PM]
November 17, 2017 104 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Scholars of Immigration Law, Amici Curiae in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194750] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Alan Schoenfeld [Entered: 11/17/2017 04:59 PM]
November 17, 2017 103 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by International Bar Associations Human Rights Institute in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194746] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Donald Donovan [Entered: 11/17/2017 04:56 PM]
November 17, 2017 102 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194736] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Amanda Callais [Entered: 11/17/2017 04:51 PM]
November 17, 2017 101 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by BENNA RUTH SOLOMON, Attorney for amicus curiae City of Chicago in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/20/2017. [1000194735] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Benna Solomon [Entered: 11/17/2017 04:49 PM]
November 17, 2017 100 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Immigration Law Professors on Statutory Claims in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellees in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194729] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Fatma Marouf [Entered: 11/17/2017 04:43 PM]
November 17, 2017 99 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amici Karen Korematsu, Jay Hirabayashi, Holly Yasui, The Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Civil Rights Organizations, and National Bar Associations of Color in Support of Appellees in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194727] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] --[Edited 11/22/2017 by AW] Pratik Shah [Entered: 11/17/2017 04:40 PM]
November 17, 2017 98 MOTION by International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 11/17/2017 ecf. [1000194724] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Amanda Callais [Entered: 11/17/2017 04:37 PM]
November 17, 2017 97 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Immigration Equal., NYC Gay&Lesbian Anti-Violence Proj., Natl Queer Asian Pac. Islander All., LGBT Bar Assn of L.A., LGBT Bar Assn Greater NY, Lesbian&Gay Bar Assn of Chi., GLBTQ Legal Advs&Defs, & Bay Area Lawyers Indiv. Freedom. Amicus ISO Pls-Apps in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194684] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Eric Gorman [Entered: 11/17/2017 03:48 PM]
November 17, 2017 96 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by International Labor Organizations as Amici Curiae in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194634] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Jonathan Weissglass [Entered: 11/17/2017 02:54 PM]
November 17, 2017 95 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amici Curiae Muslim Justice League, Muslim Public Affairs Council, and Council on American-Islamic Relations, California, in support of Appellees in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194613] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Benjamin Shatz [Entered: 11/17/2017 02:31 PM]
November 17, 2017 94 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by THE CATO INSTITUTE in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194585] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Cameron Russell [Entered: 11/17/2017 01:52 PM]
November 17, 2017 92 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from The American Center for Law and Justice in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/17/2017 12:50 PM]
November 17, 2017 91 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amici Curiae, Civil Rights Organizations in Support of Appellees in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194348] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Lynne Bernabei [Entered: 11/17/2017 10:36 AM]
November 16, 2017 131 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Civil Rights Organizations in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [61]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199249] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 02:15 PM]
November 16, 2017 130 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of California, Connecticut, Delaware, District of Columbia, Illinois, Iowa, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, New York, Oregon, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia and Washington in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [44]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017. [1000199243] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 02:13 PM]
November 16, 2017 90 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by New York, California, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Iowa, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia, Washington, and the District of Columbia in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194133] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Anisha Dasgupta [Entered: 11/16/2017 11:09 PM]
November 15, 2017 129 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [38]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017.. [1000199240] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 02:09 PM]
November 15, 2017 93 OPENING/RESPONSE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Grannaz Amirjamshidi, Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Afsaneh Khazaeli, Mohamad Mashta, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Shapour Shirani, Yemeni-American Merchants Association and Fakhri Ziaolhagh in 17-2231 and 17-2240, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, John Doe #6, Iranian Alliances Across Borders and Iranian Students' Foundation in 17-2232, John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Sumaya Hamadmad, Fahed Muqbil and Eblal Zakzok in 17-2233. Number of pages: [81]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/17/2017. Received by clerk date: 11/17/2017. [1000194544] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/17/2017 01:08 PM]
November 15, 2017 89 BRIEF by Appellees Grannaz Amirjamshidi, Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Afsaneh Khazaeli, Mohamad Mashta, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Shapour Shirani, Yemeni-American Merchants Association and Fakhri Ziaolhagh in 17-2231, Appellees Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, John Doe #6, Iranian Alliances Across Borders and Iranian Students' Foundation in 17-2232, Appellees John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Sumaya Hamadmad and Eblal Zakzok in 17-2233 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING/RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/16/2017. [1000193375] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 11/15/2017 11:50 PM]
November 15, 2017 88 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Appellees Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240. [1000193208]. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] H. Byron [Entered: 11/15/2017 03:21 PM]
November 15, 2017 87 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center as Amicus Curiae in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/15/2017. [1000193138] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Amir Ali [Entered: 11/15/2017 01:59 PM]
November 14, 2017 85 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Immigration Reform Law Institute in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/14/2017 12:55 PM]
November 13, 2017 84 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Appellees Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240. Counsel arguing: Hashim M. Mooppan [1000191479] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 11/13/2017 04:42 PM]
November 13, 2017 83 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Hashim M. Mooppan for Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240.[1000191472] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 11/13/2017 04:39 PM]
November 13, 2017 82 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by David Hausman for Grannaz Amirjamshidi, Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Afsaneh Khazaeli, Mohamad Mashta, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Shapour Shirani, Yemeni-American Merchants Association and Fakhri Ziaolhagh in 17-2240.[1000191362] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] David Hausman [Entered: 11/13/2017 03:53 PM]
November 13, 2017 81 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Alabama, Arkansas, Florida, Louisiana, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Texas and West Virginia in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/13/2017 01:01 PM]
November 13, 2017 80 Additional copies of the OPENING BRIEF and JOINT APPENDIX received. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/13/2017 12:58 PM]
November 13, 2017 79 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellees Grannaz Amirjamshidi, Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Afsaneh Khazaeli, Mohamad Mashta, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Shapour Shirani, Yemeni-American Merchants Association and Fakhri Ziaolhagh in 17-2231, Appellees Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, John Doe #6, Iranian Alliances Across Borders and Iranian Students' Foundation in 17-2232, Appellees John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Sumaya Hamadmad, Fahed Muqbil and Eblal Zakzok in 17-2233, Appellants Grannaz Amirjamshidi, Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Afsaneh Khazaeli, Mohamad Mashta, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Shapour Shirani, Yemeni-American Merchants Association and Fakhri Ziaolhagh in 17-2240. Counsel arguing: Cecillia D. Wang Opening argument time: 25 Rebuttal argument time: 5 [1000190479] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/13/2017 07:48 AM]
November 9, 2017 128 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of T.A. in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, and 17-2240. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/28/2017.[1000199238] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/28/2017 02:07 PM]
November 9, 2017 78 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by T.A., A U.S. Citizen of Yemeni Descent in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/09/2017. [1000190278] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Richard Bernstein [Entered: 11/09/2017 04:41 PM]
November 9, 2017 77 MOTION by T.A., U.S. Citizen of Yemeni Descent to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 11/09/2017 ecf. [1000190267] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Richard Bernstein [Entered: 11/09/2017 04:31 PM]
November 9, 2017 76 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Johnathan James Smith for Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, Jane Doe #6, John Doe #6, Iranian Alliances Across Borders and Iranian Students' Foundation in 17-2232.[1000190047] [17-2232, 17-2231, 17-2233, 17-2240] Johnathan Smith [Entered: 11/09/2017 02:19 PM]
November 7, 2017 74 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for Immigration Reform Law Institute in 17-2231.[1000188124] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Christopher Hajec [Entered: 11/07/2017 11:06 AM]
November 7, 2017 73 Featured Case ORDER filed [1000188038] granting leave to file amicus curiae briefs. Copies to all parties. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/07/2017 10:00 AM]
November 6, 2017 86 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Immigration Reform Law Institute in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240. Number of pages: [36]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/14/2017. Received by clerk date: 11/14/2017. [1000192137] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/14/2017 12:59 PM]
November 6, 2017 72 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellant Immigration Reform Law Institute in 17-2231(L) in electronic and paper format. [1000187982] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/07/2017 09:35 AM]
November 6, 2017 71 COURT ORDER filed [1000187659] granting initial hearing en banc (FRAP 35). Copies to all parties. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/06/2017 05:26 PM]
November 6, 2017 70 MOTION by Immigration Reform Law Institute to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 11/06/2017 ecf. [1000187638] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Christopher Hajec [Entered: 11/06/2017 04:54 PM]
November 3, 2017 75 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Alabama, Arkansas, Florida, Louisiana, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Texas and West Virginia in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240. Number of pages: [39]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/07/2017. Received by clerk date: 11/06/2017. [1000188266] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/07/2017 01:07 PM]
November 3, 2017 69 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Mark H. Lynch for Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, John Doe #6, Iranian Alliances Across Borders and Iranian Students' Foundation in 17-2232.[1000186780] [17-2232, 17-2231, 17-2233, 17-2240] Kathryn Cahoy [Entered: 11/03/2017 05:52 PM]
November 3, 2017 68 DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL (Local Rule 12(b)) by Appellees Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2231. Name of lead counsel: Omar C. Jadwat. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 11/03/2017 05:00 PM]
November 3, 2017 67 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellees John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Sumaya Hamadmad, Fahed Muqbil and Eblal Zakzok in 17-2233. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000186669] [17-2233, 17-2231] Robert Atkins [Entered: 11/03/2017 03:10 PM]
November 3, 2017 64 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Potential Amicus Curiae Texas in 17-2231Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Kansas, Louisiana, Missouri, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, and West Virginia in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. [1000186503] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Scott Keller [Entered: 11/03/2017 12:45 PM]
November 2, 2017 63 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Kathryn E. Cahoy for Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, John Doe #6, Iranian Alliances Across Borders and Iranian Students' Foundation in 17-2232.[1000186080] [17-2232, 17-2231, 17-2233, 17-2240] Kathryn Cahoy [Entered: 11/02/2017 04:41 PM]
November 2, 2017 62 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Richard B. Katskee for Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, John Doe #6, Iranian Alliances Across Borders and Iranian Students' Foundation in 17-2232.[1000185828] [17-2232, 17-2231, 17-2233, 17-2240] Richard Katskee [Entered: 11/02/2017 12:41 PM]
November 1, 2017 66 APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 3. Total number of pages in all volumes: 1523. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of Copies: 4. Entered on Docket Date: 11/03/2017. Received by clerk date: 11/03/2017. [1000186613] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/03/2017 02:12 PM]
November 1, 2017 65 OPENING BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240. Number of pages: [71]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/03/2017. Received by clerk date: 11/03/2017. [1000186609] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/03/2017 02:07 PM]
November 1, 2017 61 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of The American Center for Law and Justice in 17-2231. Number of pages: [30]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/02/2017. Received by clerk date: 11/02/2017. [1000185797] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 11/02/2017 12:21 PM]
November 1, 2017 60 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by H. Thomas Byron III for Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240.[1000185250] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] H. Byron [Entered: 11/01/2017 07:18 PM]
November 1, 2017 59 Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Appellees Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 11/02/2017. [1000185249] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 11/01/2017 06:59 PM]
November 1, 2017 58 BRIEF by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Appellees Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 01/02/2017. [1000185246] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 11/01/2017 06:53 PM]
November 1, 2017 57 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Eric Rothschild for Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, Jane Doe #6, John Doe #6, Iranian Alliances Across Borders and Iranian Students' Foundation in 17-2232.[1000185147] [17-2232, 17-2231, 17-2233, 17-2240] Eric Rothschild [Entered: 11/01/2017 04:04 PM]
November 1, 2017 56 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 12/08/2017. Registration Time: 8:15 - 8:30. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:00. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] JLC [Entered: 11/01/2017 11:25 AM]
November 1, 2017 55 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by American Center for Law and Justice as Amicus Curiae in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/01/2017. [1000184588] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Edward White [Entered: 11/01/2017 09:32 AM]
November 1, 2017 54 MOTION by American Center for Law and Justice Amicus Curiae to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 11/01/2017 ecf. [1000184583] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Edward White [Entered: 11/01/2017 09:26 AM]
October 31, 2017 53 Docket correction requested from Mr. Scott Allen Keller for Ohio, Louisiana, South Carolina, West Virginia, Alabama, Florida, Texas, Oklahoma and Arkansas in 17-2231. Re: [15] amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Brief has been restricted to case participants. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 10/31/2017 02:58 PM]
October 31, 2017 52 COURT ORDER filed [1000184197] granting Motion to Expedite Merits Briefing Schedule [28]. Opening brief and appendix due 11/01/2017. Opening/Response brief due: 11/15/2017. Response/Reply brief due 11/22/2017. Reply brief due 11/29/2017. Oral argument is scheduled for December 8, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. in Richmond, Virginia. Copies to all parties. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 10/31/2017 02:53 PM]
October 31, 2017 51 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Deborah A. Jeon for Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2240, 17-2231.[1000183524] [17-2240, 17-2231] Deborah Jeon [Entered: 10/31/2017 09:24 AM]
October 30, 2017 50 REPLY by Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240 to Response [44], Response [40].. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 10/30/2017 07:36 PM]
October 27, 2017 48 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee HIAS, Inc. in 17-2231. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000182200] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 10/27/2017 06:55 PM]
October 27, 2017 47 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Arab American Association of New York in 17-2231. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000182198] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 10/27/2017 06:54 PM]
October 27, 2017 46 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2231. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000182197] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 10/27/2017 06:53 PM]
October 27, 2017 45 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee International Refugee Assistance Project in 17-2231. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000182196] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 10/27/2017 06:52 PM]
October 27, 2017 44 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2231, 17-2240 to Motion for stay pending appeal [5]. Nature of response: in opposition. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 10/27/2017 04:58 PM]
October 27, 2017 43 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Iranian Students' Foundation in 17-2232. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000182102] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Mark Mosier [Entered: 10/27/2017 04:13 PM]
October 27, 2017 42 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Iranian Alliances Across Borders in 17-2232. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000182100] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Mark Mosier [Entered: 10/27/2017 04:12 PM]
October 27, 2017 41 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellees Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5 and John Doe #6 in 17-2232. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000182098] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Mark Mosier [Entered: 10/27/2017 04:11 PM]
October 27, 2017 40 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, John Doe #6, Iranian Alliances Across Borders and Iranian Students' Foundation in 17-2232, John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Sumaya Hamadmad, Fahed Muqbil and Eblal Zakzok in 17-2233 to Motion for stay pending appeal [5]. Nature of response: in opposition. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Mark Mosier [Entered: 10/27/2017 04:09 PM]
October 27, 2017 39 Letter re: Letter regarding oral argument date by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Appellees Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240. [1000181801] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 10/27/2017 11:56 AM]
October 26, 2017 38 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Anne Murphy for Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240.[1000181419] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Anne Murphy [Entered: 10/26/2017 04:11 PM]
October 26, 2017 37 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Justin B. Cox for Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2240, 17-2231.[1000181165] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Karen Tumlin [Entered: 10/26/2017 12:06 PM]
October 26, 2017 36 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Marielena Hincapie for Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2240, 17-2231.[1000181157] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Karen Tumlin [Entered: 10/26/2017 12:02 PM]
October 26, 2017 35 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Melissa S. Keaney for Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2240, 17-2231.[1000181155] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Karen Tumlin [Entered: 10/26/2017 12:00 PM]
October 26, 2017 34 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Esther Sung for Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2240, 17-2231.[1000181146] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Karen Tumlin [Entered: 10/26/2017 11:56 AM]
October 26, 2017 33 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Nicholas Espiritu for Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2240, 17-2231.[1000181144] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Karen Tumlin [Entered: 10/26/2017 11:54 AM]
October 26, 2017 32 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Karen C. Tumlin for Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2240, 17-2231.[1000181122] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Karen Tumlin [Entered: 10/26/2017 11:38 AM]
October 25, 2017 31 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2231, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, Jane Doe #6 and Iranian Alliances Across Borders in 17-2232, John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Sumaya Hamadmad, Fahed Muqbil and Eblal Zakzok in 17-2233, 17-2240 to Motion to accelerate case processing [28]. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 10/25/2017 07:06 PM]
October 25, 2017 30 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Faiza Patel for John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Sumaya Hamadmad, Fahed Muqbil and Eblal Zakzok.[1000180590] [17-2233] Faiza Patel [Entered: 10/25/2017 01:38 PM]
October 25, 2017 29 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Michael Price for John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Sumaya Hamadmad, Fahed Muqbil and Eblal Zakzok.[1000180553] [17-2233] Michael Price [Entered: 10/25/2017 01:05 PM]
October 24, 2017 49 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Alabama, Arkansas, Florida, Louisiana, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Texas and West Virginia in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240. Number of pages: [38]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 10/30/2017. Received by clerk date: 10/25/2017. [1000182744] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240]--[Edited 11/06/2017 by RW] RW [Entered: 10/30/2017 12:31 PM]
October 24, 2017 28 Corrected MOTION by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Appellees Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240 to accelerate case processing.. Date and method of service: 10/24/2017 ecf. [1000180039] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 10/24/2017 10:09 PM]
October 24, 2017 27 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Corrected MOTION by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Appellees Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240 to accelerate case processing.. Date and method of service: 10/24/2017 ecf. [1000180038] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240]--[Edited 10/25/2017 by RW] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 10/24/2017 08:19 PM]
October 24, 2017 26 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233, Appellees Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2240 to accelerate case processing.. Date and method of service: 10/24/2017 ecf. [1000180035] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240]--[Edited 10/25/2017 by RW] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 10/24/2017 07:15 PM]
October 24, 2017 25 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Steven C. Herzog for John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Sumaya Hamadmad, Fahed Muqbil and Eblal Zakzok.[1000179954] [17-2233] Steven Herzog [Entered: 10/24/2017 04:10 PM]
October 24, 2017 24 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Liza Velazquez for John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Sumaya Hamadmad, Fahed Muqbil and Eblal Zakzok.[1000179940] [17-2233] Liza Velazquez [Entered: 10/24/2017 04:04 PM]
October 24, 2017 23 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Andrew J. Ehrlich for John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Sumaya Hamadmad, Fahed Muqbil and Eblal Zakzok.[1000179928] [17-2233] Andrew Ehrlich [Entered: 10/24/2017 04:00 PM]
October 24, 2017 22 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert A. Atkins for John Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Sumaya Hamadmad, Fahed Muqbil and Eblal Zakzok.[1000179919] [17-2233] Robert Atkins [Entered: 10/24/2017 03:56 PM]
October 24, 2017 21 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Heather L. Weaver for Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2240, 17-2231.[1000179702] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Heather Weaver [Entered: 10/24/2017 02:05 PM]
October 24, 2017 20 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Cecillia Wang for Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2240, 17-2231.[1000179701] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Cecillia Wang [Entered: 10/24/2017 02:04 PM]
October 24, 2017 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Daniel Mach for Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2240, 17-2231.[1000179693] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Daniel Mach [Entered: 10/24/2017 01:57 PM]
October 24, 2017 18 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Spencer Amdur for Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2240, 17-2231.[1000179670] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Spencer Amdur [Entered: 10/24/2017 01:29 PM]
October 24, 2017 17 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Cody Wofsy for Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2240, 17-2231.[1000179652] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Cody Wofsy [Entered: 10/24/2017 01:09 PM]
October 24, 2017 16 MOTION by Potential Amici Curiae Texas, Alabama, Arkansas, Florida, Louisiana, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, and West Virginia in 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240 to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)). [1000179533] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 10/24/2017 12:13 PM]
October 24, 2017 15 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by State of Texas, et al in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. [1000179453] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233]--[Edited 11/06/2017 by RW] Scott Keller [Entered: 10/24/2017 11:09 AM]
October 24, 2017 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Sirine Shebaya for Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, Jane Doe #6 and Iranian Alliances Across Borders in 17-2232.[1000179367] [17-2232, 17-2231, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 10/24/2017 10:13 AM]
October 23, 2017 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lee Gelernt for Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2240, 17-2231.[1000179092] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Lee Gelernt [Entered: 10/23/2017 06:17 PM]
October 23, 2017 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Omar Jadwat for Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. in 17-2240, 17-2231.[1000179090] [17-2240, 17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 10/23/2017 05:40 PM]
October 23, 2017 11 Featured Case ORDER filed [1000179021] consolidating case 17-2231(L) with 17-2240. Cross-appeal appellant: Donald J. Trump; Department of Homeland Security; Department of State; Office of the Director of National Intelligence; Elaine C. Duke; Rex W. Tillerson; Daniel Coats. Copies to all parties. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233, 17-2240] RW [Entered: 10/23/2017 04:13 PM]
October 21, 2017 10 REPLY by Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233 to Response [9], Response [8].. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 10/21/2017 07:41 PM]
October 21, 2017 9 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, Jane Doe #6 and Iranian Alliances Across Borders in 17-2232 to Motion to accelerate case processing [6]. Nature of response: in opposition. [17-2232, 17-2231, 17-2233] Mark Mosier [Entered: 10/21/2017 12:55 PM]
October 21, 2017 8 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. to Motion to accelerate case processing [6]. [17-2231] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 10/21/2017 09:52 AM]
October 20, 2017 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Mark W. Mosier for Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, Jane Doe #6 and Iranian Alliances Across Borders.[1000178182] [17-2232] Mark Mosier [Entered: 10/20/2017 09:13 PM]
October 20, 2017 6 MOTION by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2231, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233 to accelerate case processing.. Date and method of service: 10/20/2017 ecf. [1000178181] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 10/20/2017 08:12 PM]
October 20, 2017 5 MOTION by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233 for stay pending appeal.. Date and method of service: 10/20/2017 ecf. [1000178180] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 10/20/2017 08:09 PM]
October 20, 2017 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lowell V. Sturgill Jr. for Department of State, Elaine C. Duke, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in 17-2231, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McCament, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump in 17-2232, Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Department of State in 17-2233.[1000177940] [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 10/20/2017 02:25 PM]
October 20, 2017 3 Featured Case ORDER filed [1000177866] consolidating case 17-2232 and 17-2233 with 17-2231(L). Copies to all parties. [17-2231, 17-2232, 17-2233] RW [Entered: 10/20/2017 01:31 PM]
October 20, 2017 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] Case Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. [17-2231] RW [Entered: 10/20/2017 01:26 PM]
October 20, 2017 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Case manager: RWarren. [17-2231] RW [Entered: 10/20/2017 12:27 PM]

Search for this case: Intl. Refugee Assistance v. Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT, a project of the Urban Justice Center, Inc., on behalf of itself and its clients
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: HIAS, INC., on behalf of itself and its clients
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: JOHN DOES #1 & 3
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: JANE DOE #2
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: MIDDLE EAST STUDIES ASSOCIATION OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., on behalf of itself and its members
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: MUHAMMED METEAB
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: PAUL HARRISON
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: IBRAHIM AHMED MOHOMED
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: ARAB AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK, on behalf of itself and its clients
Represented By: Katherine Anne Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLAN HAKKY
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMANEH TAKALOO
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Schwei
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Schwei
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Schwei
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Schwei
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: ELAINE C. DUKE, in her official capacity as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Schwei
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: JOHN F. KELLY, in his official capacity as Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: REX TILLERSON, in his official capacity as Secretary of State
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Schwei
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: DANIEL R. COATS, in his official capacity as Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Schwei
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?