Wanda Hudson v. State Farm Insurance Company
Defendant / Appellee: ENTERPRISE RENTAL CAR, WAKEMED HOSPITALS, NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, ROCK QUARRY ROAD FAMILY MEDICINE and STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff / Appellant: WANDA S. HUDSON
Case Number: 19-1025
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 18 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Wanda S. Hudson. [19-1025] AB [Entered: 03/06/2019 12:05 PM]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER filed [1000446300] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 13 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 03/06/2019. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Wanda S. Hudson P. O. Box 473 Morrisville, NC 27560. [19-1025] AB [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:02 AM]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER filed [1000446283] deferring action on Motion to appoint/assign counsel filed by Appellant Wanda S. Hudson. [ # 12 ] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Wanda S. Hudson P. O. Box 473 Morrisville, NC 27560. [19-1025] AB [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:49 AM]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER filed [1000446276] deferring action on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Wanda S. Hudson. [14] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Wanda S. Hudson P. O. Box 473 Morrisville, NC 27560. [19-1025] AB [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:46 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 14 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Wanda S. Hudson. [19-1025] AB [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:45 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Wanda S. Hudson to extend filing time for informal opening brief. Date and method of service: 01/26/2019 US mail. [1000446270] [19-1025] AB [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:45 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Wanda S. Hudson to appoint/assign counsel. Date and method of service: 01/26/2019 US mail. [1000446267] [19-1025] AB [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:44 AM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Enterprise Rental Car. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000439253] [19-1025] Samuel Hartzell [Entered: 01/15/2019 12:09 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Samuel B. Hartzell for Enterprise Rental Car. [1000439247] [19-1025] Samuel Hartzell [Entered: 01/15/2019 12:05 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by WakeMed Hospitals. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000435683] [19-1025] Elizabeth Hedrick [Entered: 01/08/2019 04:52 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Elizabeth Sims Hedrick for WakeMed Hospitals. [1000435681] [19-1025] Elizabeth Hedrick [Entered: 01/08/2019 04:50 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Nationwide Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000435446] [19-1025] Gemma Saluta [Entered: 01/08/2019 02:29 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Gemma L. Saluta for Nationwide Insurance Company. [1000435429] [19-1025] Gemma Saluta [Entered: 01/08/2019 02:21 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00516-FL. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1025] AB [Entered: 01/04/2019 03:12 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Wanda S. Hudson P. O. Box 473 Morrisville, NC 27560 Rachel E. Keen Mason E. Freeman. Informal Opening Brief due 01/28/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-1025] AB [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:53 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 FEE NOTICE issued to Wanda S. Hudson - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 02/04/2019. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00516-FL. Mailed to: Wanda S. Hudson P. O. Box 473 Morrisville, NC 27560 Rachel E. Keen Mason E. Freeman. [19-1025] AB [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:50 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 01/18/2019. [19-1025] AB [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:47 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-00516-FL. Case manager: ABrownlee. [19-1025] AB [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wanda Hudson v. State Farm Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENTERPRISE RENTAL CAR
Represented By: Samuel Batiste Hartzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WAKEMED HOSPITALS
Represented By: Elizabeth Sims Hedrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Gemma Lillian Saluta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROCK QUARRY ROAD FAMILY MEDICINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: James Scott Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WANDA S. HUDSON
Represented By: Wanda S. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?