Richard Edwards, Jr. v. Cardinal Transport, Inc.
Defendant: DANNY MCGOWAN, individually and as an employee of McElliotts Trucking, LLC and/or as agent of Cardinal Transport, MCELLIOTTS TRUCKING, LLC and HAROLD MIDKIFF, individually as agent driver of McElliotts Trucking, LLC and/or as agent driver of Cardinal Transport, Inc.
Defendant / Appellant: CARDINAL TRANSPORT, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellee: RICHARD EDWARDS, JR.
Case Number: 19-1034
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 15 ] by Cardinal Transport, Inc.. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [2]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [571]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/04/2019. [1000471825] [19-1034] AW [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:52 AM]
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 14 ] by Cardinal Transport, Inc.. Number of pages: [58]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/04/2019. [1000471824] [19-1034] AW [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:51 AM]
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Cardinal Transport, Inc.. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 03/05/2019. [1000468933] [19-1034] Matthew Fitzgerald [Entered: 03/04/2019 01:49 PM]
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF by Cardinal Transport, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/05/2019. [1000468924] [19-1034] Matthew Fitzgerald [Entered: 03/04/2019 01:39 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sarah R. Bennett for Cardinal Transport, Inc.. [1000455528] [19-1034] Sarah Bennett [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:57 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Anthony J. Majestro for Richard Edwards, Jr.. [1000453984] [19-1034] Anthony Majestro [Entered: 02/07/2019 03:56 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Richard Edwards, Jr.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000453377] [19-1034] Richard Weston [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:58 AM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Richard W Weston for Richard Edwards, Jr.. [1000453351] [19-1034] Richard Weston [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:45 AM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Richard Edwards, Jr. re: filing of appearance form and disclosure form. Appearance form and disclosure statement due on 02/07/2019 from Richard W. Weston. [19-1034] AW [Entered: 02/04/2019 12:05 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 Mediation conference data modified. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1034] MRB [Entered: 01/25/2019 11:01 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1034] MRB [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:23 AM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/04/2019. Response Brief due 04/03/2019 [19-1034] AW [Entered: 01/23/2019 12:30 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Cardinal Transport, Inc.. [19-1034] Matthew Fitzgerald [Entered: 01/23/2019 09:38 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Cardinal Transport, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000438702] [19-1034] Matthew Fitzgerald [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:09 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew A. Fitzgerald for Cardinal Transport, Inc.. [1000438687] [19-1034] Matthew Fitzgerald [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:04 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 3:16-cv-01879. Mailed to: Connor Robertson, Esq. [19-1034] AW [Entered: 01/09/2019 10:50 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:16-cv-01879. Case manager: AWalker. [19-1034] AW [Entered: 01/09/2019 10:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Edwards, Jr. v. Cardinal Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CARDINAL TRANSPORT, INC.
Represented By: Sarah Bennett
Represented By: Matthew Allen Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANNY MCGOWAN, individually and as an employee of McElliotts Trucking, LLC and/or as agent of Cardinal Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCELLIOTTS TRUCKING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAROLD MIDKIFF, individually as agent driver of McElliotts Trucking, LLC and/or as agent driver of Cardinal Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD EDWARDS, JR.
Represented By: Richard W. Weston
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?