Phillip O'Briant v. Howard County Office

Defendant / Appellee: HOWARD COUNTY OFFICE OF HUMAN RIGHTS
Plaintiff / Appellant: PHILLIP O'BRIANT
Case Number: 19-1039
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed [1000448505] deferring action on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Phillip O'Briant [8]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Phillip O'Briant. [19-1039] CB [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:38 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Phillip O'Briant. [19-1039] CB [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:36 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Phillip O'Briant. [19-1039] CB [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:59 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-02729-TDC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1039] CB [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:36 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 FEE NOTICE issued to Phillip O'Briant - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 02/11/2019. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-02729-TDC. Mailed to: Phillip O'Briant. [19-1039] CB [Entered: 01/10/2019 11:07 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Phillip O'Briant. Informal Opening Brief due 02/04/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-1039] CB [Entered: 01/10/2019 11:04 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 01/24/2019. [19-1039] CB [Entered: 01/10/2019 11:02 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-02729-TDC. Case manager: CBennett. [19-1039] CB [Entered: 01/10/2019 11:00 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillip O'Briant v. Howard County Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOWARD COUNTY OFFICE OF HUMAN RIGHTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PHILLIP O'BRIANT
Represented By: Phillip O'Briant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?