Subodh Pandit v. Sudhir Pandit

Defendant / Appellee: CATHALINE R. SAMUEL, SUDHIR K. PANDIT, MESHACH V. SAMUEL and DOROTHY PANDIT
Plaintiff / Appellant: SUBODH K. PANDIT
Case Number: 19-1045
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER filed [1000467434] withdrawing counsel ; administratively terminating Motion to strike [ # 14 ] Copies to all parties. [19-1045] RHS [Entered: 02/28/2019 02:48 PM]
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Cathaline R. Samuel and Meshach V. Samuel to strike Attorney's appearance... Date and method of service: 02/28/2019 ecf. [1000467388] [19-1045] Mary Biscoe-Hall [Entered: 02/28/2019 02:22 PM]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed [1000457446] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 12 ] Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 03/13/2019. Response brief due 04/12/2019 Copies to all parties. [19-1045] RHS [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:09 PM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Subodh K. Pandit to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until May 20, 2019.. Date and method of service: 02/13/2019 ecf. [1000457163] [19-1045] Brian Maul [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:38 PM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mary C. Biscoe-Hall for Cathaline R. Samuel and Meshach V. Samuel. [1000457142] [19-1045] Mary Biscoe-Hall [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:13 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Meshach V. Samuel and Cathaline R. Samuel. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000440944] [19-1045] Steven Leder [Entered: 01/17/2019 01:43 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Steven E. Leder for Cathaline R. Samuel and Meshach V. Samuel. [1000440942] [19-1045] Steven Leder [Entered: 01/17/2019 01:41 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Dorothy Pandit and Sudhir K. Pandit. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000439903] [19-1045] Kelly Burchell [Entered: 01/16/2019 10:29 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kelly Lynn Burchell for Dorothy Pandit and Sudhir K. Pandit. [1000439882] [19-1045] Kelly Burchell [Entered: 01/16/2019 10:16 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/20/2019. Response Brief due 03/22/2019 [19-1045] RHS [Entered: 01/11/2019 08:30 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Subodh K. Pandit. [19-1045] Brian Maul [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:51 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Subodh K. Pandit. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000437360] [19-1045] Brian Maul [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:50 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian M Maul for Subodh K. Pandit. [1000437357] [19-1045] Brian Maul [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:49 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 8:18-cv-01136-PX.. [19-1045] RHS [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:18 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-01136-PX. Case manager: RSewell. [19-1045] RHS [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Subodh Pandit v. Sudhir Pandit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATHALINE R. SAMUEL
Represented By: Mary Catherine Biscoe-Hall Esq.
Represented By: Steven E. Leder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUDHIR K. PANDIT
Represented By: Kelly Lynn Burchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MESHACH V. SAMUEL
Represented By: Mary Catherine Biscoe-Hall Esq.
Represented By: Steven E. Leder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOROTHY PANDIT
Represented By: Kelly Lynn Burchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUBODH K. PANDIT
Represented By: Brian M. Maul Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?