Pacific Union Financial, LLC v. Lavone Dickson

Defendant / Appellant: LAVONE DICKSON
Plaintiff / Appellee: PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL, LLC
Case Number: 19-1055
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Lavone Dickson for the filing of docketing statement Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. [19-1055] TF [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:27 AM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/11/2019. Response Brief due 04/10/2019 [19-1055] TF [Entered: 01/30/2019 09:50 AM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Lavone Dickson for the filing of docketing statement. Docketing statement due from Lavone Dickson on 02/04/2019. [19-1055] TF [Entered: 01/30/2019 09:48 AM]
January 14, 2019 Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [18-2087, 19-1055] MRB [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:11 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joseph R. Pope for Pacific Union Financial, LLC in 19-1055, 18-2087. [1000437843] [19-1055, 18-2087] Joseph Pope [Entered: 01/11/2019 12:08 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Pacific Union Financial, LLC in 19-1055, 18-2087. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000437840] [19-1055, 18-2087] J.P. Boyd [Entered: 01/11/2019 12:06 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by J.P. McGuire Boyd, Jr. for Pacific Union Financial, LLC in 19-1055, 18-2087. [1000437836] [19-1055, 18-2087] J.P. Boyd [Entered: 01/11/2019 12:05 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:18-cv-00136-RAJ-RJK. Mailed to: Holland. [19-1055] TF [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:26 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-00136-RAJ-RJK. Case manager: TFischer. [19-1055] TF [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Union Financial, LLC v. Lavone Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LAVONE DICKSON
Represented By: Henry Woods McLaughlin Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL, LLC
Represented By: J.P. McGuire Boyd Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Ray Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?