Michelle Duncan-Bogley v. US
Plaintiff: JAMES BOGLEY, III
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and SDC NEW RIDGE PARKWAY AND BENSON AVENUE - MARYLAND, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: MICHELLE DUNCAN-BOGLEY
Case Number: 19-1060
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed [1000460785] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 04/11/2019. Response brief due 05/10/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1060] CB [Entered: 02/19/2019 04:52 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1060] LP [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:39 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by SDC New Ridge Parkway and Benson Avenue - Maryland, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000447160] [19-1060] Matthew Youssef [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:11 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew J. Youssef for SDC New Ridge Parkway and Benson Avenue - Maryland, Inc.. [1000447155] [19-1060] Matthew Youssef [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:10 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/11/2019. Response Brief due 04/09/2019. [19-1060] CB [Entered: 01/29/2019 08:32 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Michelle Duncan-Bogley. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000446848] [19-1060] David Lampton [Entered: 01/28/2019 06:45 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David T. Lampton for Michelle Duncan-Bogley. [1000446847] [19-1060] David Lampton [Entered: 01/28/2019 06:44 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Michelle Duncan-Bogley. [19-1060] David Lampton [Entered: 01/28/2019 06:40 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Evelyn Lombardo Cusson for US. [1000440795] [19-1060] Evelyn Cusson [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:30 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:16-cv-01137-JKB. [19-1060] CB [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:50 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:16-cv-01137-JKB. Case manager: CBennett. [19-1060] CB [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michelle Duncan-Bogley v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SDC NEW RIDGE PARKWAY AND BENSON AVENUE - MARYLAND, INC.
Represented By: Matthew James Youssef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BOGLEY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHELLE DUNCAN-BOGLEY
Represented By: David Thomas Lampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?