Howard County, Maryland v. FAA

Petitioner: HOWARD COUNTY, MARYLAND
Respondent: DANIEL K. ELWELL, Acting Administrator, Federal Aviation Administration and FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
Undetermined: STATE OF MARYLAND
Case Number: 19-1062
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY by Daniel K. Elwell and Federal Aviation Administration to Motion [ # 15 ], response [ # 22 ].. [19-1062] John Gunter [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:47 AM]
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER filed [1000472508] granting motion to suspend briefing [ # 19 ]. Copies to all parties. [19-1062] TW [Entered: 03/08/2019 10:37 AM]
March 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Daniel K. Elwell and Federal Aviation Administration that a reply will be filed. [1000472435].. [19-1062] John Gunter [Entered: 03/08/2019 09:07 AM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Howard County, Maryland to notice requesting response [ # 16 ], Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 15 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [19-1062] Lewis Taylor [Entered: 03/07/2019 05:08 PM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Nicholas A. DiMascio for State of Maryland. [1000471890] [19-1062] Nicholas DiMascio [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:57 AM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Nicholas DiMascio for State of Maryland re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 03/11/2019. [19-1062] JSN [Entered: 03/07/2019 09:58 AM]
March 4, 2019 Filing 19 Amended MOTION by Howard County, Maryland to suspend Briefing. Date and method of service: 03/04/2019 ecf. [1000469146] [19-1062] Melissa Goldmeier [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:48 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 18 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by Howard County, Maryland to suspend Briefing. Date and method of service: 03/01/2019 ecf. [1000468232] [19-1062]--[Edited 03/08/2019 by TW, see ECF 19 for corrected filing] Melissa Goldmeier [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:59 PM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFIED LIST in lieu of agency record by Daniel K. Elwell and Federal Aviation Administration. [19-1062] John Gunter [Entered: 02/25/2019 04:03 PM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE ISSUED to Melissa Goldmeier, Gary Kuc, and Lewis Taylor for Howard County, Maryland requesting response to Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 15 ]. Response due: 03/07/2019.[1000464163].. [19-1062] JSN [Entered: 02/25/2019 02:36 PM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Daniel K. Elwell and Federal Aviation Administration to dismiss appeal [15]. Date and method of service: 02/25/2019 ecf. [1000464131] [19-1062] John Gunter [Entered: 02/25/2019 02:21 PM]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed [1000457829] granting Motion to intervene [ # 12 ]. Copies to all parties. [19-1062] JSN [Entered: 02/14/2019 10:13 AM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Proposed Intervenor-Respondent State of Maryland, through the Maryland Aviation Administration to intervene. Date and method of service: 02/13/2019 ecf. [1000457465] [19-1062] Nicholas DiMascio [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:22 PM]
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John David Gunter II for Daniel K. Elwell and Federal Aviation Administration. [1000456619] [19-1062] John Gunter [Entered: 02/12/2019 04:50 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Howard County, Maryland. [19-1062] Lewis Taylor [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:59 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Howard County, Maryland. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000440208] [19-1062] Lewis Taylor [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:55 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Melissa E. Goldmeier for Howard County, Maryland. [1000440207] [19-1062] Melissa Goldmeier [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:53 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lewis J. Taylor for Howard County, Maryland. [1000440204] [19-1062] Lewis Taylor [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:51 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Gary W. Kuc for Howard County, Maryland. [1000440203] [19-1062] Gary Kuc [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:48 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE ISSUED serving respondent and requesting record from Federal Aviation Administration. Date petition for review or application filed: 01/14/2019. Administrative Record due 02/25/2019. Mailed to: Daniel K. Elwell, Federal Aviation Administration. [19-1062] JSN [Entered: 01/15/2019 12:53 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 3 ] petition for review Originating case number:. [19-1062] JSN [Entered: 01/15/2019 12:36 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Petition for review of agency order filed by Howard County, Maryland .[1000438640] [19-1062] RE [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:46 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic filing fee paid. Filing Fee:$500.00 Receipt Number:A04-67123-569. [19-1062] RE [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:44 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number:. Case manager: REdwards. [19-1062] RE [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard County, Maryland v. FAA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HOWARD COUNTY, MARYLAND
Represented By: Melissa Goldmeier
Represented By: Lewis J. Taylor
Represented By: Gary W. Kuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Nicholas DiMascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DANIEL K. ELWELL, Acting Administrator, Federal Aviation Administration
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?