Jairo Sanchez v. William Barr
Petitioner: JAIRO FERINO SANCHEZ
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting Attorney General and WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Case Number: 19-1085
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 30, 2019 Jairo Sanchez v. William Barr

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed [1000460254] substituting party William P. Barr for Matthew G. Whitaker. Copies to all parties. [19-1085] KS [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:36 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/01/2019. Response Brief due 05/01/2019. [19-1085] KS [Entered: 02/19/2019 09:16 AM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD in electronic format by Matthew G. Whitaker. Method of service: ECF service on counsel. [19-1085] DOJ Executive Office for Immigration Review [Entered: 02/15/2019 02:28 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Jairo Ferino Sanchez. [19-1085] Tamara Jezic [Entered: 01/24/2019 04:00 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jairo Ferino Sanchez. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000445032] [19-1085] Tamara Jezic [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:59 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tamara L. Jezic for Jairo Ferino Sanchez. [1000445027] [19-1085] Tamara Jezic [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:58 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kohsei Ugumori for Matthew G. Whitaker. [1000443161] [19-1085] Kohsei Ugumori [Entered: 01/23/2019 09:49 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE ISSUED serving respondent and requesting record from Matthew G. Whitaker. Date petition for review or application filed: 01/22/2019. Administrative Record due 03/04/2019. [19-1085] KS [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:12 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 2 ] petition for review. Originating case number: A094-216-521. [19-1085] KS [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:09 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for review of agency order filed by Jairo Ferino Sanchez . [1000442789] [19-1085] KS [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:08 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 Electronic filing fee paid. Filing Fee: $500.00. Receipt Number: A04-67151-481. [19-1085] KS [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:06 PM]
January 22, 2019 Immigration Petition for Review case docketed. Originating case number: A094-216-521. Case manager: KStump. [19-1085] KS [Entered: 01/22/2019 04:03 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jairo Sanchez v. William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAIRO FERINO SANCHEZ
Represented By: Tamara L. Jezic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Kohsei Ugumori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?