Oscar Sanchez Santos v. William Barr
Petitioner: OSCAR DAVID SANCHEZ SANTOS
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting Attorney General and WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Case Number: 19-1101
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 20, 2019 Oscar Sanchez Santos v. William Barr

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed [1000460348] substituting party. William P. Barr substituted for Matthew G. Whitaker. Copies to all parties. [19-1101] KH [Entered: 02/19/2019 02:07 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/01/2019. Response Brief due 04/30/2019 [19-1101] KH [Entered: 02/19/2019 10:04 AM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD in electronic format by Matthew G. Whitaker. Method of service: ECF service on counsel. [19-1101] DOJ Executive Office for Immigration Review [Entered: 02/15/2019 02:30 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Oscar David Sanchez Santos. [19-1101] John Gallagher [Entered: 02/11/2019 10:40 AM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Oscar David Sanchez Santos. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000455206] [19-1101] John Gallagher [Entered: 02/11/2019 10:40 AM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Oscar David Sanchez Santos. [1000455204] [19-1101] John Gallagher [Entered: 02/11/2019 10:37 AM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Filing fee paid. Amount received: 500.00 [19-1101] RW [Entered: 02/05/2019 12:39 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Annette M. Wietecha for Matthew G. Whitaker. [1000446616] [19-1101] Annette Wietecha [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:47 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Document sent [ # 1 ] petition for review , [ # 4 ] notice administrative record. Description of document: Notice issued serving respondent and requesting administrative record with Petition for review. Mailed to: Immigration and Customs Enforcement Baltimore Field Office 31 Hopkins Plaza, 7th Floor Baltimore, Maryland 21201. [19-1101] KH [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:56 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption modified. [19-1101] KH [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:48 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE ISSUED serving respondent and requesting record from Matthew G. Whitaker. Date petition for review or application filed: 01/25/2019. Administrative Record due 03/06/2019. [19-1101] KH [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:39 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] petition for review. Originating case number: A216-083-508. [19-1101] KH [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:29 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Mr. John Edward Gallagher, Esq. - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 02/11/2019. Originating case number: A216-083-508. [19-1101] KH [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:27 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for review of agency order filed by Oscar David Sanchez Santos .[1000445828] [19-1101] KH [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:26 PM]
January 25, 2019 Immigration Petition for Review case docketed. Originating case number: A216-083-508. Case manager: KHancock. [19-1101] KH [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oscar Sanchez Santos v. William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OSCAR DAVID SANCHEZ SANTOS
Represented By: John Edward Gallagher Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Annette Marie Wietecha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?