UMG Recordings, Incorporated v. Tofig Kurbanov
Plaintiff / Appellant: NONESUCH RECORDS INC., UMG RECORDINGS, INCORPORATED, SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT US LATIN LLC, CAPITAL RECORDS, INCORPORATED, ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INCORPORATED, ZOMBA RECORDING LLC, WARNER BROS RECORDS INC., LAFACE RECORDS LLC, SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, INCORPORATED, FUELED BY RAMEN LLC, ARISTA RECORDS, LLC and ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION
Defendant / Appellee: DOES 1-10 and TOFIG KURBANOV, d/b/a FLVTO.BIZ, a/k/a 2CONV.COM
Amicus Curiae: INTERNATIONAL ANTICOUNTERFEITING COALITION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, COPYRIGHT ALLIANCE and MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 19-1124
Filed: January 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 44 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by J. Matthew Williams for Motion Picture Association of America, Incorporated. [1000479540] [19-1124] J. Williams [Entered: 03/21/2019 11:13 AM]
March 20, 2019 Filing 42 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Megan L. Brown for Association of American Publishers. [1000479113] [19-1124] Megan Brown [Entered: 03/20/2019 03:45 PM]
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER filed [1000478959] granting filing of Copyright Alliance and International AntiCounterfeiting Coalition amicus curiae brief. Amicus brief due 04/04/2019. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? N/A. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. [19-1124] CH [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:39 PM]
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER filed [1000478949] granting filing of Motion Picture of America, Inc. amicus curiae brief. Amicus brief due 04/04/2019. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? N/A. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. [19-1124]--[Edited 03/20/2019 by CH]--[Edited 03/22/2019 by EB] CH [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:29 PM]
March 20, 2019 Filing 38 Corrected APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David E. Weslow for Association of American Publishers. [1000478901] [19-1124] David Weslow [Entered: 03/20/2019 12:42 PM]
March 20, 2019 Filing 36 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ari S. Meltzer for Association of American Publishers. [1000478895] [19-1124] Ari Meltzer [Entered: 03/20/2019 12:38 PM]
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER filed [1000478880] granting filing of Association of American Publishers amicus curiae brief . Amicus brief due 04/04/2019. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? N/A. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. [19-1124]--[Edited 03/20/2019 by CH] CH [Entered: 03/20/2019 12:17 PM]
March 20, 2019 Filing 33 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Association of American Publishers re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 03/25/2019 from Megan Leef Brown, Ari Scott Meltzer and David Edison Weslow. [19-1124] DL [Entered: 03/20/2019 11:36 AM]
March 20, 2019 Filing 32 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert H. Rotstein for Motion Picture Association of America, Incorporated. [1000478853] [19-1124] DL [Entered: 03/20/2019 11:28 AM]
March 20, 2019 Filing 31 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John Ulin for Copyright Alliance and International AntiCounterfeiting Coalition. [1000478830] [19-1124] DL [Entered: 03/20/2019 11:12 AM]
March 20, 2019 Filing 30 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David E. Weslow for Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capital Records, Incorporated, Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Laface Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Incorporated, UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Warner Bros Records Inc. and Zomba Recording LLC. [1000478810] [19-1124]--[Edited 03/20/2019 by CH] See ECF 38 David Weslow [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:56 AM]
March 19, 2019 Filing 45 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 27 ] by Association of American Publishers. Number of pages: [38]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/21/2019. [1000479627] [19-1124] KS [Entered: 03/21/2019 12:42 PM]
March 19, 2019 Filing 43 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 28 ] by Motion Picture Association of America, Incorporated. . Number of pages: [30]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/20/2019. [1000479322] [19-1124] DL [Entered: 03/21/2019 08:27 AM]
March 19, 2019 Filing 41 Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [ # 29 ] by Copyright Alliance and International AntiCounterfeiting Coalition. . Number of pages: [32]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/20/2019. [1000478984] [19-1124] DL [Entered: 03/20/2019 02:03 PM]
March 19, 2019 Filing 29 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Copyright Alliance and International AntiCounterfeiting Coalition in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/20/2019. [1000478556] [19-1124] John Ulin [Entered: 03/19/2019 07:54 PM]
March 19, 2019 Filing 28 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Motion Picture Association of America, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/19/2019. [1000478555] [19-1124] Robert Rotstein [Entered: 03/19/2019 06:45 PM]
March 19, 2019 Filing 27 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Association of American Publishers in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/20/2019. [1000478544] [19-1124]--[Edited 03/20/2019 by DL - Changed party filer] David Weslow [Entered: 03/19/2019 05:26 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 26 Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 24 ] by Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capital Records, Incorporated, Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Laface Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Incorporated, UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Warner Bros Records Inc. and Zomba Recording LLC. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [1]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [403]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/14/2019. [1000476227] [19-1124] DL [Entered: 03/15/2019 08:50 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 25 Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 23 ] by Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capital Records, Incorporated, Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Laface Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Incorporated, UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Warner Bros Records Inc. and Zomba Recording LLC. Number of pages: [67]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 03/14/2019. [1000476217] [19-1124] DL [Entered: 03/15/2019 08:43 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 24 Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capital Records, Incorporated, Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Laface Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Incorporated, UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Warner Bros Records Inc. and Zomba Recording LLC. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 03/13/2019. [1000474575] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 03/12/2019 05:22 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 23 BRIEF by Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capital Records, Incorporated, Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Laface Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Incorporated, UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Warner Bros Records Inc. and Zomba Recording LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/13/2019. [1000474573] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 03/12/2019 05:17 PM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 22 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Valentin Gurvits for Tofig Kurbanov. [1000458691] [19-1124] Valentin Gurvits [Entered: 02/15/2019 09:22 AM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Zomba Recording LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000458073] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 02/14/2019 12:11 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by UMG Recordings, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000458072] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 02/14/2019 12:09 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000458069] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 02/14/2019 12:07 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Capital Records, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000458064] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 02/14/2019 12:06 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Sony Music Entertainment, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000458060] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 02/14/2019 12:03 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Laface Records LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000458053] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 02/14/2019 12:01 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Warner Bros Records Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000458049] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:59 AM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Fueled by Ramen LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000458042] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:56 AM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Nonesuch Records Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000458034] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:54 AM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000458026] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:52 AM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Arista Records, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000458019] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:50 AM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Atlantic Recording Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000458013] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:48 AM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capital Records, Incorporated, Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Laface Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Incorporated, UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Warner Bros Records Inc. and Zomba Recording LLC. [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:44 AM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ian Heath Gershengorn for Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capital Records, Incorporated, Elektra Entertainment Group, Incorporated, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Laface Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Incorporated, UMG Recordings, Incorporated, Warner Bros Records Inc. and Zomba Recording LLC. [1000457997] [19-1124] Ian Gershengorn [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:39 AM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew Shayefar for Tofig Kurbanov. [1000457950] [19-1124] Matthew Shayefar [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:12 AM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Evan Fray-Witzer for Tofig Kurbanov. [1000457562] [19-1124] Evan Fray-Witzer [Entered: 02/13/2019 10:39 PM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Does 1-10 and Tofig Kurbanov. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000456964] [19-1124] Jeffrey Geiger [Entered: 02/13/2019 10:50 AM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jeffrey H. Geiger for Does 1-10 and Tofig Kurbanov. [1000456959] [19-1124] Jeffrey Geiger [Entered: 02/13/2019 10:49 AM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Matthew Lloyd Haws. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/12/2019. Response Brief due 04/11/2019. [19-1124] CH [Entered: 01/31/2019 12:17 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00957-CMH-TCB. Mailed to: Matthew Lloyd Haws. [19-1124] CH [Entered: 01/31/2019 12:15 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-00957-CMH-TCB. Case manager: CHalupa. [19-1124] CH [Entered: 01/31/2019 12:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UMG Recordings, Incorporated v. Tofig Kurbanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NONESUCH RECORDS INC.
Represented By: Ian Heath Gershengorn
Represented By: Matthew Lloyd Haws
Represented By: Alison I. Stein
Represented By: Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Langlinais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UMG RECORDINGS, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Ian Heath Gershengorn
Represented By: Matthew Lloyd Haws
Represented By: Alison I. Stein
Represented By: Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Langlinais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT US LATIN LLC
Represented By: Ian Heath Gershengorn
Represented By: Matthew Lloyd Haws
Represented By: Alison I. Stein
Represented By: Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Langlinais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CAPITAL RECORDS, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Ian Heath Gershengorn
Represented By: Matthew Lloyd Haws
Represented By: Alison I. Stein
Represented By: Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Langlinais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELEKTRA ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Ian Heath Gershengorn
Represented By: Matthew Lloyd Haws
Represented By: Alison I. Stein
Represented By: Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Langlinais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ZOMBA RECORDING LLC
Represented By: Ian Heath Gershengorn
Represented By: Matthew Lloyd Haws
Represented By: Alison I. Stein
Represented By: Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Langlinais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WARNER BROS RECORDS INC.
Represented By: Ian Heath Gershengorn
Represented By: Matthew Lloyd Haws
Represented By: Alison I. Stein
Represented By: Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Langlinais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAFACE RECORDS LLC
Represented By: Ian Heath Gershengorn
Represented By: Matthew Lloyd Haws
Represented By: Alison I. Stein
Represented By: Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Langlinais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Ian Heath Gershengorn
Represented By: Matthew Lloyd Haws
Represented By: Alison I. Stein
Represented By: Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Langlinais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FUELED BY RAMEN LLC
Represented By: Ian Heath Gershengorn
Represented By: Matthew Lloyd Haws
Represented By: Alison I. Stein
Represented By: Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Langlinais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ARISTA RECORDS, LLC
Represented By: Ian Heath Gershengorn
Represented By: Matthew Lloyd Haws
Represented By: Alison I. Stein
Represented By: Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Langlinais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION
Represented By: Ian Heath Gershengorn
Represented By: Matthew Lloyd Haws
Represented By: Alison I. Stein
Represented By: Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Langlinais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES 1-10
Represented By: Jeffrey Hamilton Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOFIG KURBANOV, d/b/a FLVTO.BIZ, a/k/a 2CONV.COM
Represented By: Valentin David Gurvits
Represented By: Matthew Shayefar
Represented By: Jeffrey Hamilton Geiger
Represented By: Evan M. Fray-Witzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL ANTICOUNTERFEITING COALITION
Represented By: John Charles Ulin Esq.
Represented By: Michael E. Kientzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS
Represented By: Megan Leef Brown
Represented By: Ari Scott Meltzer
Represented By: David Edison Weslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COPYRIGHT ALLIANCE
Represented By: John Charles Ulin Esq.
Represented By: Michael E. Kientzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INCORPORATED
Represented By: J. Matthew Williams
Represented By: Robert Henry Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?