Patrick Christian v. C. Jenkins, Jr.
Defendant / Appellee: BRIDGETT K. GERAGHTY, Public Defender, J. HARVIE WILKINSON, III, Judge of Virginia, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit, TERRY MCAULIFFE, Former Governor of Virginia, CLYDE H. HAMILTON, Sr. Judge of S. Carolina, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit, GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF VIRGINIA, G. STEVEN AGEE, Judge of Virginia, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit, HENRY E. HUDSON, U.S. Judge Eastern District Court of Virginia, LEROY MILLETTE, JR., Senior Justice, Supreme Court of Virginia, DENNIS W. SHEDD, Sr. Judge of S. Carolina, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit, MELVIN R. HUGHES, Retired Judge 13th Circuit Court for the City of Richmond, ALLYSON K. DUNCAN, Chief Judge of N. Carolina, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit, JAMES A. WYNN, JR., Judge of N. Carolina, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit, S. BERNARD GOODWYN, Justice, Supreme Court of Virginia, SAMUEL A. ALITO, Associate Justice, United States Supreme Court, SONIA SOTOMAYOR, Associate Justice, United States Supreme Court, JONATHAN O'CONNOR, Pro Bono Lawyer, Defense Attorney, ELENA KAGAN, Associate Justice, United States Supreme Court, ROGER L. GREGORY, Chief Judge of Virginia, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit, ROBERT F. MCDONNELL, Former Governor of Virginia, C. N. JENKINS, JR., Presiding Chief Judge, 13th Circuit Court for the City of Richmond, WILLIAM B. TRAXLER, JR., Judge of S. Carolina, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit, STEPHANIE D. THACKER, Judge of W. Virginia, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit, NEIL M. GORSUCH, Associate Justice, United States Supreme Court, DIANA GRIBBON MOTZ, Judge of Maryland, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit, MARK HERRING, Attorney General of Virginia, STEPHEN BREYER, Associate Justice, United States Supreme Court, RUTH BADER GINSBURG, Associate Justice, United States Supreme Court, BRADLEY CAVEDO, Presiding Judge, 13th Circuit Court for the City of Richmond, ALBERT DIAZ, Judge of N. Carolina, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit, MICHAEL HERRING, Commonwealth Attorney, JOHN G. ROBERTS, Chief Justice, United States Supreme Court, CLARENCE THOMAS, Associate Justice, United States Supreme Court, M. HANNAH LAUCK, U.S. Judge Eastern District Court of Virginia and D. ARTHUR KELSEY, Justice, Supreme Court of Virginia
Plaintiff / Appellant: PATRICK O. CHRISTIAN
Case Number: 19-1139
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 26, 2019 Patrick Christian v. C. Jenkins, Jr.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Returned mail received from Patrick O. Christian re [ # 4 ] informal opening brief. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? None. Appellant mailed the informal brief to appellee Bridgett Geraghty and used the court's return address by mistake. [1000478344] [19-1139] DL [Entered: 03/19/2019 02:43 PM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE/SERVICE LIST by Patrick O. Christian. [19-1139] TF [Entered: 02/15/2019 11:55 AM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Patrick O. Christian. [19-1139] DL [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:38 PM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 03/04/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-1139] AB [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:54 AM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00868-JAG. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1139] AB [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:27 AM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00868-JAG. Case manager: ABrownlee. [19-1139] AB [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick Christian v. C. Jenkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIDGETT K. GERAGHTY, Public Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. HARVIE WILKINSON, III, Judge of Virginia, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERRY MCAULIFFE, Former Governor of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLYDE H. HAMILTON, Sr. Judge of S. Carolina, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: G. STEVEN AGEE, Judge of Virginia, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HENRY E. HUDSON, U.S. Judge Eastern District Court of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEROY MILLETTE, JR., Senior Justice, Supreme Court of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENNIS W. SHEDD, Sr. Judge of S. Carolina, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELVIN R. HUGHES, Retired Judge 13th Circuit Court for the City of Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLYSON K. DUNCAN, Chief Judge of N. Carolina, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES A. WYNN, JR., Judge of N. Carolina, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. BERNARD GOODWYN, Justice, Supreme Court of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMUEL A. ALITO, Associate Justice, United States Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONIA SOTOMAYOR, Associate Justice, United States Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONATHAN O'CONNOR, Pro Bono Lawyer, Defense Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELENA KAGAN, Associate Justice, United States Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROGER L. GREGORY, Chief Judge of Virginia, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT F. MCDONNELL, Former Governor of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. N. JENKINS, JR., Presiding Chief Judge, 13th Circuit Court for the City of Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM B. TRAXLER, JR., Judge of S. Carolina, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHANIE D. THACKER, Judge of W. Virginia, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEIL M. GORSUCH, Associate Justice, United States Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIANA GRIBBON MOTZ, Judge of Maryland, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK HERRING, Attorney General of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN BREYER, Associate Justice, United States Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUTH BADER GINSBURG, Associate Justice, United States Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRADLEY CAVEDO, Presiding Judge, 13th Circuit Court for the City of Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALBERT DIAZ, Judge of N. Carolina, U.S. Court of Appeals for the 4th Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL HERRING, Commonwealth Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN G. ROBERTS, Chief Justice, United States Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLARENCE THOMAS, Associate Justice, United States Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. HANNAH LAUCK, U.S. Judge Eastern District Court of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. ARTHUR KELSEY, Justice, Supreme Court of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICK O. CHRISTIAN
Represented By: Patrick O. Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?