Farried Jassiem v. William Barr
Petitioner: FARRIED JASSIEM
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting Attorney General and WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Case Number: 19-1140
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Farried Jassiem. [19-1140] James Feroli [Entered: 03/07/2019 12:36 PM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Farried Jassiem. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000471955] [19-1140] James Feroli [Entered: 03/07/2019 12:35 PM]
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/15/2019. Response Brief due 05/13/2019. [19-1140] TW [Entered: 03/04/2019 02:03 PM]
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] petition for review. Originating case number: A073-609-616. [19-1140] TW [Entered: 03/04/2019 02:02 PM]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed [1000468947] rescinding informal briefing order. Copies to all parties. [19-1140] TW [Entered: 03/04/2019 01:59 PM]
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James Feroli for Farried Jassiem. [1000468728] [19-1140] James Feroli [Entered: 03/04/2019 11:32 AM]
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD in electronic format by William P. Barr. Method of service: ECF service on counsel. [19-1140] DOJ Executive Office for Immigration Review [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:01 PM]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER filed [1000460669] substituting party William P. Barr for Matthew G. Whitaker. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Farried Jassiem. [19-1140] CB [Entered: 02/19/2019 03:50 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Song Park for Matthew G. Whitaker. [1000454398] [19-1140] Song Park [Entered: 02/08/2019 10:44 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Farried Jassiem. Informal Opening Brief due 03/04/2019. Administrative Record due 03/20/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-1140] CB [Entered: 02/08/2019 10:33 AM]
February 6, 2019 Immigration Petition for Review case docketed. Originating case number: A073-609-616. Case manager: CBennett. [19-1140] CB [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:34 AM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid. Amount received: $500. [19-1140] CB [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:49 AM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for review of agency order filed by Farried Jassiem .[1000452659] [19-1140] CB [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farried Jassiem v. William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FARRIED JASSIEM
Represented By: Farried Jassiem
Represented By: James Feroli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Song Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?