Frederick Shepherd, Jr. v. Community First Bank
Defendant / Appellant: COMMUNITY FIRST BANK SERP PLAN, ROBERT H. EDWARDS, WILLIAM M. BROWN, DR. LARRY S. BOWMAN, GARY V. THRIFT, COMMUNITY FIRST BANK, JAMES E. TURNER, CHARLES L. WINCHESTER, RICHARD D. BURLESON and JOHN R. HAMRICK
Plaintiff / Appellee: FREDERICK D. SHEPHERD, JR.
Case Number: 19-1453
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 26 BRIEFING ORDER filed -- FRAP 30(c) Schedule. Page-Proof Opening Brief due: 07/15/2019. Page-Proof Response Brief due: 08/14/2019. Appendix under FRAP 30(c) due: 08/28/2019. All Briefs in Final Form due 10 days after FRAP 30(c) Appendix served. [19-1453] EB [Entered: 06/04/2019 05:06 PM]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER filed [1000524563] rescinding briefing schedule. Copies to all parties. [19-1453] EB [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:56 PM]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER filed [1000524560] granting Motion to proceed with a deferred appendix [ # 23 ]. Copies to all parties. [19-1453] EB [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:53 PM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Larry S. Bowman, William M. Brown, Richard D. Burleson, Community First Bank, Community First Bank SERP Plan, Robert H. Edwards, John R. Hamrick, Gary V. Thrift, James E. Turner and Charles L. Winchester to proceed with a deferred appendix. Date and method of service: 06/04/2019 ecf. [1000524275] [19-1453] Justin Outling [Entered: 06/04/2019 01:32 PM]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER filed [1000520644] extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 07/01/2019. Response brief due 07/31/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1453] EB [Entered: 05/29/2019 12:06 PM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 20 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1453] MRB [Entered: 05/14/2019 04:54 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Justin N. Outling for Larry S. Bowman, William M. Brown, Richard D. Burleson, Community First Bank, Community First Bank SERP Plan, Robert H. Edwards, John R. Hamrick, Gary V. Thrift, James E. Turner and Charles L. Winchester. [1000510067] [19-1453] Justin Outling [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:15 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/18/2019. Response Brief due 07/18/2019. [19-1453] EB [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:29 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Robert H. Edwards. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000509952] [19-1453] James Adams [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:19 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Charles L. Winchester. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000509948] [19-1453] James Adams [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:16 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by James E. Turner. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000509946] [19-1453] James Adams [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:15 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by John R. Hamrick. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000509943] [19-1453] James Adams [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:14 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by William M. Brown. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000509941] [19-1453] James Adams [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:13 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Larry S. Bowman. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000509939] [19-1453] James Adams [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:13 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Gary V. Thrift. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000509936] [19-1453] James Adams [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:12 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Richard D. Burleson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000509932] [19-1453] James Adams [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:11 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Community First Bank SERP Plan. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000509928] [19-1453] James Adams [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:10 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Community First Bank. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000509926] [19-1453] James Adams [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:09 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Larry S. Bowman, William M. Brown, Richard D. Burleson, Community First Bank, Community First Bank SERP Plan, Robert H. Edwards, John R. Hamrick, Gary V. Thrift, James E. Turner and Charles L. Winchester. [19-1453] James Adams [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:07 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James C. Adams, II for Larry S. Bowman, William M. Brown, Richard D. Burleson, Community First Bank, Community First Bank SERP Plan, Robert H. Edwards, John R. Hamrick, Gary V. Thrift, James E. Turner and Charles L. Winchester. [1000509917] [19-1453] James Adams [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:05 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Frederick D. Shepherd, Jr.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000501978] [19-1453] Austin Watts [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:09 AM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Douglas F. Patrick for Frederick D. Shepherd, Jr.. [1000501971] [19-1453] Austin Watts [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:07 AM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Austin F. Watts for Frederick D. Shepherd, Jr.. [1000501968] [19-1453] Austin Watts [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:06 AM]
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 8:15-cv-04337-DCC. Mailed to: Justin Nathaniel Outling. [19-1453] EB [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:58 AM]
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:15-cv-04337-DCC. Case manager: EBorneisen. [19-1453] EB [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Frederick Shepherd, Jr. v. Community First Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COMMUNITY FIRST BANK SERP PLAN
Represented By: James Conrad Adams Esq. II
Represented By: Justin Nathaniel Outling
Represented By: James Edward Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Justin Outling Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROBERT H. EDWARDS
Represented By: James Conrad Adams Esq. II
Represented By: Justin Nathaniel Outling
Represented By: James Edward Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Justin Outling Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WILLIAM M. BROWN
Represented By: James Conrad Adams Esq. II
Represented By: Justin Nathaniel Outling
Represented By: James Edward Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Justin Outling Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DR. LARRY S. BOWMAN
Represented By: James Conrad Adams Esq. II
Represented By: Justin Nathaniel Outling
Represented By: James Edward Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Justin Outling Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GARY V. THRIFT
Represented By: James Conrad Adams Esq. II
Represented By: Justin Nathaniel Outling
Represented By: James Edward Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Justin Outling Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COMMUNITY FIRST BANK
Represented By: James Conrad Adams Esq. II
Represented By: Justin Nathaniel Outling
Represented By: James Edward Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Justin Outling Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JAMES E. TURNER
Represented By: James Conrad Adams Esq. II
Represented By: Justin Nathaniel Outling
Represented By: James Edward Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Justin Outling Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHARLES L. WINCHESTER
Represented By: James Conrad Adams Esq. II
Represented By: Justin Nathaniel Outling
Represented By: James Edward Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Justin Outling Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RICHARD D. BURLESON
Represented By: James Conrad Adams Esq. II
Represented By: Justin Nathaniel Outling
Represented By: James Edward Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Justin Outling Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHN R. HAMRICK
Represented By: James Conrad Adams Esq. II
Represented By: Justin Nathaniel Outling
Represented By: James Edward Bradley Esq.
Represented By: Justin Outling Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FREDERICK D. SHEPHERD, JR.
Represented By: Douglas Franklin Patrick Sr.
Represented By: Austin Fletcher Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?