Humane Society of the US v. US Fish and Wildlife Service
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR and UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Plaintiff / Appellant: HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, BORN FREE USA and HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL
Case Number: 19-1678
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 Corrected FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International and Humane Society of the United States. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 08/19/2019. [1000569450] [19-1678] Neal Mollen [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:14 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 Corrected BRIEF by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International and Humane Society of the United States in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 08/19/2019. [1000569365] [19-1678] Neal Mollen [Entered: 08/19/2019 02:17 PM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 Docket correction requested from Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International and Humane Society of the United States.... [19-1678] MR [Entered: 08/12/2019 01:11 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 12 ] by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International and Humane Society of the United States. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [1]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [259]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? No. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 08/05/2019. [1000565150] [19-1678] MR [Entered: 08/12/2019 01:08 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 11 ] by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International and Humane Society of the United States. Number of pages: [69]. Sufficient: No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 08/05/2019. [1000565144] [19-1678] MR [Entered: 08/12/2019 01:00 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International, Humane Society of the United States and Born Free USA. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 08/05/2019. [1000560160] [19-1678] Neal Mollen [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:43 AM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International and Humane Society of the United States in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 08/05/2019. [1000560143] [19-1678] Neal Mollen [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:30 AM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Noah N. Simmons for Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International and Humane Society of the United States. [1000544179] [19-1678] Neal Mollen [Entered: 07/09/2019 06:17 PM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Charles A. Patrizia for Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International and Humane Society of the United States. [1000544178] [19-1678] Neal Mollen [Entered: 07/09/2019 06:16 PM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International and Humane Society of the United States. [19-1678] Neal Mollen [Entered: 07/09/2019 06:12 PM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Born Free USA, Center for Biological Diversity, Humane Society International and Humane Society of the United States. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000544174] [19-1678] Neal Mollen [Entered: 07/09/2019 06:10 PM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Neal D. Mollen for Born Free USA, Humane Society of the United States, Center for Biological Diversity and Humane Society International. [1000544173] [19-1678] Neal Mollen [Entered: 07/09/2019 06:08 PM]
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by R. Trent McCotter for United States Department of the Interior and United States Fish and Wildlife Service. [1000536804] [19-1678] R. McCotter [Entered: 06/25/2019 06:33 PM]
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/05/2019. Response Brief due 09/03/2019 [19-1678] MR [Entered: 06/25/2019 08:51 AM]
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01301-LO-JFA.. [19-1678] MR [Entered: 06/25/2019 08:50 AM]
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01301-LO-JFA. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1678] MR [Entered: 06/25/2019 08:49 AM]
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01301-LO-JFA. Case manager: MRadday. [19-1678] MR [Entered: 06/25/2019 08:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humane Society of the US v. US Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Neal David Mollen
Represented By: Charles Andrew Patrizia
Represented By: Scott M. Flicker
Represented By: Tanya Sanerib
Represented By: Anna Elizabeth Jacobson Frostic
Represented By: Noah Nathan Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Neal David Mollen
Represented By: Charles Andrew Patrizia
Represented By: Scott M. Flicker
Represented By: Tanya Sanerib
Represented By: Anna Elizabeth Jacobson Frostic
Represented By: Noah Nathan Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BORN FREE USA
Represented By: Neal David Mollen
Represented By: Charles Andrew Patrizia
Represented By: Scott M. Flicker
Represented By: Tanya Sanerib
Represented By: Anna Elizabeth Jacobson Frostic
Represented By: Noah Nathan Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Neal David Mollen
Represented By: Charles Andrew Patrizia
Represented By: Scott M. Flicker
Represented By: Tanya Sanerib
Represented By: Anna Elizabeth Jacobson Frostic
Represented By: Noah Nathan Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?