Yolanda Bell v. US
Defendant / Appellee: DAVIS MCLEMORE, Former Deputy Program Manager of the Defense Travel office, Defense Logistics Agency; in his official and individual capacity, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS III, U.S. Attorney General, CHAD A. READLER, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MICHAEL SIMON, III, Former Program Manager of the Defense Travel Office, Defense Logitice Agency; in his official and individual capacity, JAMES N. MATTIS, Secretary of Defense; in his official capacity, HARTICHEK, Admiral and UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Plaintiff / Appellant: YOLANDA BELL
Case Number: 19-1711
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 22, 2019 Yolanda Bell v. US

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Department of Justice, Hartichek, James N. Mattis, Davis Mclemore, Chad A. Readler, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Michael Simon, III, United States Attorney's Office and US that no brief will be filed. [19-1711] Dennis Barghaan [Entered: 08/09/2019 08:41 PM]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER filed [1000559887] granting Motion to extend filing time to file response to motion to dismiss appeal [ # 8 ]. Number of days granted: 5. Copies to all parties. [19-1711] CH [Entered: 08/05/2019 08:20 AM]
August 4, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Yolanda Bell to notice requesting response [ # 6 ]. [19-1711] Yolanda Bell [Entered: 08/04/2019 05:00 PM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Yolanda Bell to extend filing time for response until August 7, 2019. Date and method of service: 08/02/2019 ecf. [1000559809] [19-1711] Yolanda Bell [Entered: 08/02/2019 09:45 PM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Yolanda Bell. [19-1711] Yolanda Bell [Entered: 07/29/2019 12:44 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE ISSUED to Yolanda Bell requesting response to Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 5 ]. Response due: 08/02/2019.[1000552231]. [19-1711] CH [Entered: 07/23/2019 10:08 AM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Department of Justice, Hartichek, James N. Mattis, Davis Mclemore, Chad A. Readler, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Michael Simon, III, United States Attorney's Office and US to dismiss appeal [5], to suspend Briefing Schedule. Date and method of service: 07/22/2019 ecf. [1000551690] [19-1711] Dennis Barghaan [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:41 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Dennis C. Barghaan, Jr. for Department of Justice, Hartichek, James N. Mattis, Davis Mclemore, Chad A. Readler, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Michael Simon, III, United States Attorney's Office and US. [1000551684] [19-1711] Dennis Barghaan [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:38 PM]
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00469-LO-IDD. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1711] DL [Entered: 07/11/2019 08:35 AM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/19/2019. [19-1711] CH [Entered: 07/05/2019 11:54 AM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Yolanda Bell. Informal Opening Brief due 07/29/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1711] CH [Entered: 07/05/2019 11:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yolanda Bell v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVIS MCLEMORE, Former Deputy Program Manager of the Defense Travel office, Defense Logistics Agency; in his official and individual capacity
Represented By: Lauren Anne Wetzler
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS III, U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Lauren Anne Wetzler
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHAD A. READLER
Represented By: Lauren Anne Wetzler
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Lauren Anne Wetzler
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Lauren Anne Wetzler
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL SIMON, III, Former Program Manager of the Defense Travel Office, Defense Logitice Agency; in his official and individual capacity
Represented By: Lauren Anne Wetzler
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES N. MATTIS, Secretary of Defense; in his official capacity
Represented By: Lauren Anne Wetzler
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARTICHEK, Admiral
Represented By: Lauren Anne Wetzler
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Represented By: Lauren Anne Wetzler
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YOLANDA BELL
Represented By: Yolanda Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?