US v. Duane Berry
Defendant: APPROXIMATELY $11,789.34 IN FUNDS, Approximately $11,789.34 in funds seized from Bank of America Account XXX8484, such account held in the name of Mornay Logan DBA Holding Properties, APPROXIMATELY $38,910.23 IN FUNDS, Approximately $38,910.23 in funds seized from Bank of America Account XXX7847, such account held in the name of UAV Research and Development, LLC, APPROXIMATELY $445,502.76 IN FUNDS, Approximately $445,502.76 in funds seized from Bank of America Account XXX8497, such account held in the name of Mornay Logan DBA Holding Properties, APPROXIMATELY $81,413.13 IN FUNDS, Approximately $81,413.13 in funds seized from Woori Bank Account XXX1720, such account held in the name of Neo Tech & Design, Inc., APPROXIMATELY $961,308.93 IN FUNDS, Approximately $961,308.93 in funds seized from JP Morgan Chase Account XXX5580, such account held in the name of Royce Hub Trading, Inc. and APPROXIMATELY $3,517.94 IN FUNDS, Approximately $3,517.94 in funds seized from Bank of America Account XXX5136, such account held in the name of Earth Lab, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: DUANE LETROY BERRY
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-1713
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 DOCUMENT referencing [ # 2 ] plra Notice by Duane Letroy Berry. [1000563576] [19-1713] JSN [Entered: 08/08/2019 03:00 PM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Duane Letroy Berry re: for failure to satisfy PLRA and informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Duane Berry. [19-1713] JSN [Entered: 08/02/2019 02:34 PM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Duane Letroy Berry. [19-1713] JSN [Entered: 08/02/2019 02:32 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 DOCUMENT by Duane Letroy Berry. [1000559323] [19-1713] JSN [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:45 AM]
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-0081-KDB-DCK. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1713] JSN [Entered: 07/24/2019 11:15 AM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/19/2019. [19-1713] JSN [Entered: 07/05/2019 12:08 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 07/29/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. Mailed to: Duane Berry.[19-1713] JSN [Entered: 07/05/2019 12:06 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Duane Letroy Berry ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Duane Berry. [19-1713] JSN [Entered: 07/05/2019 12:04 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-cv-0081-KDB-DCK. Case manager: JeffNeal. [19-1713] JSN [Entered: 07/05/2019 11:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US v. Duane Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPROXIMATELY $11,789.34 IN FUNDS, Approximately $11,789.34 in funds seized from Bank of America Account XXX8484, such account held in the name of Mornay Logan DBA Holding Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPROXIMATELY $38,910.23 IN FUNDS, Approximately $38,910.23 in funds seized from Bank of America Account XXX7847, such account held in the name of UAV Research and Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPROXIMATELY $445,502.76 IN FUNDS, Approximately $445,502.76 in funds seized from Bank of America Account XXX8497, such account held in the name of Mornay Logan DBA Holding Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPROXIMATELY $81,413.13 IN FUNDS, Approximately $81,413.13 in funds seized from Woori Bank Account XXX1720, such account held in the name of Neo Tech & Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPROXIMATELY $961,308.93 IN FUNDS, Approximately $961,308.93 in funds seized from JP Morgan Chase Account XXX5580, such account held in the name of Royce Hub Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPROXIMATELY $3,517.94 IN FUNDS, Approximately $3,517.94 in funds seized from Bank of America Account XXX5136, such account held in the name of Earth Lab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DUANE LETROY BERRY
Represented By: Duane Letroy Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?