Beckley Oncology Associates v. Rami Abumasmah
Defendant / Appellee: RAMI ABUMASMAH, M.D.
Plaintiff / Appellant: BECKLEY ONCOLOGY ASSOCIATES, INC.
Case Number: 19-1751
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 12 ] by Beckley Oncology Associates, Inc.. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [1]. Total number of pages in all volumes: 68. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 09/09/2019. [1000585994] [19-1751] CB [Entered: 09/11/2019 02:25 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 11 ] by Beckley Oncology Associates, Inc. Number of pages: 44. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 09/09/2019. [1000585993] [19-1751] CB [Entered: 09/11/2019 02:24 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Beckley Oncology Associates, Inc.. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 09/09/2019. [1000583855] [19-1751] Justin Harrison [Entered: 09/09/2019 02:53 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF by Beckley Oncology Associates, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 09/09/2019. [1000583852] [19-1751] Justin Harrison [Entered: 09/09/2019 02:51 PM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Rami Abumasmah. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000566273] [19-1751] Omar Ahmad [Entered: 08/13/2019 02:14 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Omar D. Ahmad for Rami Abumasmah. [1000560156] [19-1751] Omar Ahmad [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:41 AM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1751] MRB [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:27 AM]
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Omar Ahmed & Timothy Eves. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/09/2019. Response Brief due 10/09/2019. [19-1751] TW [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:01 PM]
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Beckley Oncology Associates, Inc.. [19-1751] Justin Harrison [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:40 PM]
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Beckley Oncology Associates, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000557988] [19-1751] Justin Harrison [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:39 PM]
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Grace E. Hurney for Beckley Oncology Associates, Inc.. [1000557981] [19-1751] Justin Harrison [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:38 PM]
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Justin M. Harrison for Beckley Oncology Associates, Inc.. [1000557979] [19-1751] Justin Harrison [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:37 PM]
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:18-cv-01549. Mailed to: Omar Ahmad and Timothy Eves. [19-1751] CB [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:54 AM]
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:18-cv-01549. Case manager: CBennett. [19-1751] CB [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beckley Oncology Associates v. Rami Abumasmah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAMI ABUMASMAH, M.D.
Represented By: Omar Ahmad
Represented By: Timothy L. Eves
Represented By: Omar Dirar Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BECKLEY ONCOLOGY ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Grace Elizabeth Hurney
Represented By: Justin M. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?