Robert Johnston, III v. Linda Lamone
Plaintiff / Appellant: LIBERTARIAN PARTY OF MARYLAND and ROBERT S. JOHNSTON, III
Defendant / Appellee: LINDA H. LAMONE, in Her Official Capacity as Administrator of the Maryland State Board of Elections
Case Number: 19-1783
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 3, 2020 Robert Johnston, III v. Linda Lamone

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 16 ] by Robert S. Johnston, III and Libertarian Party of Maryland. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [1]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [427]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 09/11/2019. [1000589798] [19-1783] AW [Entered: 09/18/2019 09:16 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 15 ] by Robert S. Johnston, III and Libertarian Party of Maryland. Number of pages: [91]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 09/11/2019. [1000589794] [19-1783] AW [Entered: 09/18/2019 09:14 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Robert S. Johnston, III and Libertarian Party of Maryland. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 09/12/2019. [1000586232] [19-1783] Mark Davis [Entered: 09/11/2019 06:58 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF by Robert S. Johnston, III and Libertarian Party of Maryland in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 09/12/2019. [1000586229] [19-1783] Mark Davis [Entered: 09/11/2019 06:55 PM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 Accelerated BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/11/2019. Response Brief due 10/03/2019. [19-1783] AW [Entered: 08/12/2019 12:27 PM]
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed [1000565100] granting Motion to expedite briefing [ # 12 ], accelerating case processing. Is oral argument requested: Yes Copies to all parties. [19-1783] AW [Entered: 08/12/2019 12:23 PM]
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Robert S. Johnston, III and Libertarian Party of Maryland to expedite decision. Date and method of service: 08/09/2019 ecf. [1000564576] [19-1783] Mark Davis [Entered: 08/09/2019 06:22 PM]
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark A. Grannis for Robert S. Johnston, III and Libertarian Party of Maryland. [1000564573] [19-1783] Mark Grannis [Entered: 08/09/2019 05:43 PM]
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Douglas J. Zweizig. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing- January 31, 2019. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Robert S. Johnston, III and Libertarian Party of Maryland.. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03988-CCB. Transcript due from Douglas J. Zweizig, Official Court Reporter on 10/15/2019. [19-1783] AW [Entered: 08/09/2019 04:12 PM]
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 Docket correction requested from Robert S. Johnston, III and Libertarian Party of Maryland. [19-1783] AW [Entered: 08/09/2019 04:02 PM]
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Robert S. Johnston, III and Libertarian Party of Maryland. [19-1783] Mark Davis [Entered: 08/09/2019 04:00 PM]
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Robert S. Johnston, III and Libertarian Party of Maryland. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000564448] [19-1783] Mark Davis [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:48 PM]
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark A. Grannis for Robert S. Johnston, III and Libertarian Party of Maryland. [1000564441] [19-1783] --[Edited 08/09/2019 by AW-- see docket correction notice at ECF #9] Mark Davis [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:46 PM]
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark D. Davis for Robert S. Johnston, III and Libertarian Party of Maryland. [1000564437] [19-1783] Mark Davis [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:44 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Linda H. Lamone. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000559026] [19-1783] Andrea Trento [Entered: 08/01/2019 04:47 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrea W. Trento for Linda H. Lamone. [1000559025] [19-1783] Andrea Trento [Entered: 08/01/2019 04:47 PM]
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03988-CCB. [19-1783] AW [Entered: 07/26/2019 07:57 AM]
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03988-CCB. Case manager: AWalker. [19-1783] AW [Entered: 07/26/2019 07:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert Johnston, III v. Linda Lamone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LIBERTARIAN PARTY OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Mark Andrew Grannis
Represented By: Mark Daniel Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT S. JOHNSTON, III
Represented By: Mark Andrew Grannis
Represented By: Mark Daniel Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINDA H. LAMONE, in Her Official Capacity as Administrator of the Maryland State Board of Elections
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?