Mark Downey v. Commonwealth of Virginia
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF VIRGINIA DOWNEY
Defendant: BELFOR USA GROUP, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: BELFOR HOLDINGS, INC., CAPTAIN MICHELLE NUNEVILLE, DR. MARY JANE MAJOR, ARLINGTON COUNTY, VIRGINIA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, CHIEF FARR and STEPHEN MACISAAC
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARK DOWNEY
Case Number: 19-1896
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Mark Downey in 19-1807 for summary judgment. Date and method of service: 10/18/2019 US mail. [1000609692] [19-1807, 19-1895, 19-1896, 19-1901, 19-1906] DL [Entered: 10/18/2019 01:45 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 Supplemental INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Mark Downey. [19-1896] CH [Entered: 09/16/2019 10:57 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Mark Downey in 19-1803, 19-1807, 19-1895, 19-1896, 19-1901, 19-1906 for nationwide public ruling to quash federal and state sovereign immunity and for compensation for repeated denials to quash sovereign immunity. Date and method of service: 09/11/2019 US mail. [1000586067] [19-1803, 19-1807, 19-1895, 19-1896, 19-1901, 19-1906] CH [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:07 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Mark Downey. [19-1896] CH [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:31 AM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 DOCUMENT - re: motion to seal notice of appeal by Mark Downey. [1000584782] [19-1896] CH [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:25 AM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Mark Downey. [19-1896] CH [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:23 AM]
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00197-LO-IDD. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? No. [19-1896] CH [Entered: 08/21/2019 08:55 AM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 09/03/2019. [19-1896] CH [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:52 AM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Mark Downey. Informal Opening Brief due 09/13/2019, Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1896] CH [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:48 AM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00197-LO-IDD. Case manager: CHalupa. [19-1896] CH [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:39 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mark Downey v. Commonwealth of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BELFOR HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAPTAIN MICHELLE NUNEVILLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. MARY JANE MAJOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARLINGTON COUNTY, VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHIEF FARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN MACISAAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELFOR USA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK DOWNEY
Represented By: Mark Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF VIRGINIA DOWNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?