Mark Downey v. Mark Herring
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF VIRGINIA DOWNEY
Defendant / Appellee: STEPHEN MACISAAC, Arlington County, Virginia County Attorney, ARLINGTON COUNTY, VIRGINIA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, BELFOR USA GROUP, INC. and MARK HERRING, Attorney General
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARK DOWNEY
Case Number: 19-1906
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Mark Downey in 19-1807 for summary judgment. Date and method of service: 10/18/2019 US mail. [1000609692] [19-1807, 19-1895, 19-1896, 19-1901, 19-1906] DL [Entered: 10/18/2019 01:45 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 Supplemental INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Mark Downey. [19-1906] CH [Entered: 09/16/2019 10:59 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Mark Downey in 19-1803, 19-1807, 19-1895, 19-1896, 19-1901, 19-1906 for nationwide public ruling to quash federal and state sovereign immunity and for compensation for repeated denials to quash sovereign immunity. Date and method of service: 09/11/2019 US mail. [1000586067] [19-1803, 19-1807, 19-1895, 19-1896, 19-1901, 19-1906] CH [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:07 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Mark Downey. [19-1906] CH [Entered: 09/10/2019 12:16 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 DOCUMENT - re: motion to seal notice of appeal by Mark Downey. [1000584872] [19-1906] CH [Entered: 09/10/2019 12:13 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Duplicate IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Mark Downey. [19-1906]--[Edited 09/10/2019 by CH] CH [Entered: 09/10/2019 12:11 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 Notice issued re: motion to proceed in forma pauperis deemed moot. Mailed to: Mark Downey. [19-1906] CH [Entered: 08/28/2019 08:10 AM]
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00198-LO-IDD. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1906] DL [Entered: 08/23/2019 07:43 AM]
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 09/04/2019. [19-1906] CH [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:26 PM]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER filed [1000571647] deferring action on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [3]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Mark Downey. [19-1906] CH [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:23 PM]
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 IFP APPLICATION transferred from district court (court access only). [19-1906] CH [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:22 PM]
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Mark Downey. Informal Opening Brief due 09/16/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-1906] CH [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:13 PM]
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00198-LO-IDD. Case manager: CHalupa. [19-1906] CH [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:59 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mark Downey v. Mark Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN MACISAAC, Arlington County, Virginia County Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARLINGTON COUNTY, VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BELFOR USA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK HERRING, Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK DOWNEY
Represented By: Mark Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF VIRGINIA DOWNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?