Ortagus Bennett v. Randy Smith
Defendant / Appellee: JOHN GARRETT, in his individual and representative capacity as a agent for the US Drug Enforcement Agency, JAMES & JOAN DOE 1-10, in their individual and representative capacities Agents of the State of South Carolina Law Enforcement Agencies, JOHN & JANE DOES 1 - 10, DEA agents in their individual and representative capacities and RANDY SMITH, in his individual and representative capacity as a agent for the US Drug Enforcement Agency
Plaintiff / Appellant: ORTAGUS DEMETRICE BENNETT
Case Number: 19-2055
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 11, 2020 Ortagus Bennett v. Randy Smith

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ortagus Demetrice Bennett. [19-2055] RHS [Entered: 10/23/2019 02:51 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ortagus Demetrice Bennett. [19-2055] RHS [Entered: 10/22/2019 10:12 AM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 6:19-cv-01799-TMC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-2055] RHS [Entered: 09/27/2019 12:43 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 10/21/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2055] RHS [Entered: 09/27/2019 12:40 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Ortagus Demetrice Bennett - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 10/28/2019 Originating case number: 6:19-cv-01799-TMC.. [19-2055] RHS [Entered: 09/27/2019 12:38 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:19-cv-01799-TMC. Case manager: RSewell. [19-2055] RHS [Entered: 09/27/2019 12:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortagus Bennett v. Randy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN GARRETT, in his individual and representative capacity as a agent for the US Drug Enforcement Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES & JOAN DOE 1-10, in their individual and representative capacities Agents of the State of South Carolina Law Enforcement Agencies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN & JANE DOES 1 - 10, DEA agents in their individual and representative capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RANDY SMITH, in his individual and representative capacity as a agent for the US Drug Enforcement Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ORTAGUS DEMETRICE BENNETT
Represented By: Ortagus Demetrice Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?