Christopher Dolin v. Jordan Kindred
Defendant / Appellee: CAPTAIN WYCHE, SERGENT BROWN, JORDAN KINDRED, WALTER J. MINTON, LIEUTENANT JONES, KAREN CRAIG, DEVIN HOLLAND, CAPTAIN ROCHELLE, BILL WILSON, MAJOR FLIPPIN and PAMALA GILLEY
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHRISTOPHER DOLIN
Case Number: 19-2082
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 23, 2020 Christopher Dolin v. Jordan Kindred

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 23 INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Christopher Dolin. [19-2082] Christopher Dolin [Entered: 10/22/2019 01:11 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 22 Docket correction requested from Christopher Dolin. Re: [ # 21 ] informal response brief. Access to informal response brief has been restricted to case participants.. [19-2082] TF [Entered: 10/22/2019 12:44 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 21 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Brown, Karen Craig, Flippin, Pamala Gilley, Devin Holland, Lieutenant Jones, Jordan Kindred, Walter J. Minton, Rochelle, Bill Wilson and Wyche. [19-2082] See ECF #23 for corrected document.--[Edited 10/22/2019 by TF] Christopher Dolin [Entered: 10/21/2019 09:18 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 20 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Brown, Karen Craig, Flippin, Pamala Gilley, Devin Holland, Lieutenant Jones, Jordan Kindred, Walter J. Minton, Rochelle, Bill Wilson and Wyche. [19-2082] William Etherington [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:40 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Wyche. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000610803] [19-2082] William Etherington [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:38 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Bill Wilson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000610801] [19-2082] William Etherington [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:37 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Rochelle. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000610799] [19-2082] William Etherington [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:36 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Walter J. Minton. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000610798] [19-2082] William Etherington [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:35 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jordan Kindred. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000610797] [19-2082] William Etherington [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:33 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Lieutenant Jones. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000610793] [19-2082] William Etherington [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:31 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Devin Holland. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000610786] [19-2082] William Etherington [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:30 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Pamala Gilley. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000610782] [19-2082] William Etherington [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:29 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Flippin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000610780] [19-2082] William Etherington [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:28 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Karen Craig. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000610777] [19-2082] William Etherington [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:27 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Brown. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000610775] [19-2082] William Etherington [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:26 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William F. Etherington for Brown, Karen Craig, Flippin, Pamala Gilley, Devin Holland, Lieutenant Jones, Jordan Kindred, Walter J. Minton, Rochelle, Bill Wilson and Wyche. [1000610772] [19-2082] William Etherington [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:25 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Christopher Dolin in 19-2071, 19-2078, 19-2082 for leave to file electronically. [1000604657] [19-2071, 19-2078, 19-2082] TF [Entered: 10/10/2019 10:53 AM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Christopher Dolin. [19-2082] TF [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:33 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Christopher Dolin. [19-2082] TF [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:23 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Dolin. Informal Opening Brief due 10/28/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2082] TF [Entered: 10/04/2019 10:13 AM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 FEE NOTICE issued to Christopher Dolin - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 11/04/2019 Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00537-HEH. Mailed to: Dolin. [19-2082] TF [Entered: 10/04/2019 10:12 AM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00537-HEH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-2082] TF [Entered: 10/04/2019 10:04 AM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00537-HEH. Case manager: TFischer. [19-2082] TF [Entered: 10/04/2019 09:52 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher Dolin v. Jordan Kindred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAPTAIN WYCHE
Represented By: William Fisher Etherington Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Neal Jamerson Esq.
Represented By: Greer Quinlan Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGENT BROWN
Represented By: William Fisher Etherington Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Neal Jamerson Esq.
Represented By: Greer Quinlan Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JORDAN KINDRED
Represented By: William Fisher Etherington Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Neal Jamerson Esq.
Represented By: Greer Quinlan Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALTER J. MINTON
Represented By: William Fisher Etherington Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Neal Jamerson Esq.
Represented By: Greer Quinlan Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIEUTENANT JONES
Represented By: William Fisher Etherington Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Neal Jamerson Esq.
Represented By: Greer Quinlan Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAREN CRAIG
Represented By: William Fisher Etherington Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Neal Jamerson Esq.
Represented By: Greer Quinlan Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEVIN HOLLAND
Represented By: William Fisher Etherington Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Neal Jamerson Esq.
Represented By: Greer Quinlan Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAPTAIN ROCHELLE
Represented By: William Fisher Etherington Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Neal Jamerson Esq.
Represented By: Greer Quinlan Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL WILSON
Represented By: William Fisher Etherington Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Neal Jamerson Esq.
Represented By: Greer Quinlan Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAJOR FLIPPIN
Represented By: William Fisher Etherington Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Neal Jamerson Esq.
Represented By: Greer Quinlan Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAMALA GILLEY
Represented By: William Fisher Etherington Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Neal Jamerson Esq.
Represented By: Greer Quinlan Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER DOLIN
Represented By: Christopher Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?