Sandra Peters v. Aetna Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: OPTUMHEALTH CARE SOLUTIONS, INC., AETNA INCORPORATED and AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff / Appellant: SANDRA M. PETERS, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Case Number: 19-2085
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 20 ] Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 12/23/2019. Response brief due 02/10/2020. Reply brief due 03/09/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000614206] [19-2085] AB [Entered: 10/25/2019 10:09 AM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Sandra M. Peters to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until December 23, 2019; Appellees' response brief until February 10, 2020; and Appellant's reply brief until March 9, 2020.. Date and method of service: 10/24/2019 ecf. [1000613519] [19-2085] Jason Knott [Entered: 10/24/2019 11:37 AM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rebecca L. Gauthier for OptumHealth Care Solutions, Inc.. [1000612846] [19-2085] Rebecca Gauthier [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:03 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2085] LHP [Entered: 10/23/2019 01:46 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/02/2019. Response Brief due 12/30/2019 [19-2085] KH [Entered: 10/21/2019 10:31 AM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Sandra M. Peters. [19-2085] Jason Knott [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:35 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Sandra M. Peters. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000610024] [19-2085] Jason Knott [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:32 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by OptumHealth Care Solutions, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000610012] [19-2085] Brian Boone [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:20 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000610009] [19-2085] Earl Holman [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:16 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Aetna Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000610006] [19-2085] Earl Holman [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:14 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by E. Thomison Holman for Aetna Incorporated and Aetna Life Insurance Company. [1000609997] [19-2085] Earl Holman [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:10 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jessica F. Rosenbaum for Aetna Incorporated and Aetna Life Insurance Company. [1000609584] [19-2085] Jessica Rosenbaum [Entered: 10/18/2019 12:40 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Earl B. Austin, III for Aetna Incorporated and Aetna Life Insurance Company. [1000609578] [19-2085] Earl Austin [Entered: 10/18/2019 12:38 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David M. Wilkerson for Sandra M. Peters. [1000608947] [19-2085] David Wilkerson [Entered: 10/17/2019 04:01 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Larry S. McDevitt for Sandra M. Peters. [1000608931] [19-2085] David Wilkerson [Entered: 10/17/2019 03:54 PM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jason M. Knott for Sandra M. Peters. [1000602597] [19-2085] Jason Knott [Entered: 10/08/2019 10:12 AM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael R. Hoernlein for OptumHealth Care Solutions, Inc.. [1000602261] [19-2085] Michael Hoernlein [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:36 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian D. Boone for OptumHealth Care Solutions, Inc.. [1000602259] [19-2085] Brian Boone [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:18 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-00109-MR. Mailed to: Nell Z. Peyser, D. Brian Hufford, Jason S. Cowart. [19-2085] KH [Entered: 10/04/2019 03:14 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-00109-MR. Case manager: KHancock. [19-2085] KH [Entered: 10/04/2019 03:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sandra Peters v. Aetna Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OPTUMHEALTH CARE SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Emily Claire McGowan
Represented By: Brian D. Boone
Represented By: Mark Timothy Calloway
Represented By: Michael Roger Hoernlein
Represented By: Rebecca Lauren Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AETNA INCORPORATED
Represented By: Matthew Scott Roberson Esq.
Represented By: Earl Thomison Holman
Represented By: Earl B. Austin III
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew Scott Roberson Esq.
Represented By: Earl Thomison Holman
Represented By: Earl B. Austin III
Represented By: Jessica F. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SANDRA M. PETERS, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Jason Matthew Knott
Represented By: Nell Z. Peyser
Represented By: D. Brian Hufford
Represented By: Jason S. Cowart
Represented By: Larry Stephen McDevitt
Represented By: David Matthew Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?