Rose Duru v. President Trump Administration
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, Marietta, Georgia, H&R BLOCK BAILEY'S CROSSROADS CENTER, DAVID R. CLOUSTON, Attorney, KERRY KOHNEN, of KPGA, STATE OF TEXAS, -Judicial Court, HENRIETTA KING, of KPGA/TSPMG, U.S. CIVIL COURT ADMINISTRATORS, RANDALL ALAN CONSTANTINE, HENRY J. KAISER, of Kaiser Family Foundation, KAISER PERMANENTE NORTHERN CA, KAISER PERMANENTE VIRGINIA, KIM KAISER, of Kaiser Family Foundation, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., KAISER PERMANENTE COLORADO, UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS, ANGELA D. CAESAR, Clerk of Court U.S. District Court-DC, MELINDA LOUIE, Schwab, LAW FIRM- SESSIONS, FISHMAN, NATHAN AND ISRAEL, LLP, KAISER PERMANENTE MARYLAND, PATHWAYS TO HOUSING DC, THE SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC, -TSPMG, COURT ADMINISTRATOR, State of Texas Judicial Court, DEPUTY CLERKS OF U.S. COURTHOUSE-DC, KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, KAISER PERMANENTE SOUTHERN CA, KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION, HCA HEALTHCARE CORPORATION OF AMERICA, North Texas Division, STATE OF TEXAS, District Court Clerk, H&R BLOCK, INCORPORATED, MICHAEL F. DOHERTY, of KPGA, KAISER PERMANENTE CAPITOL HILL, CHRISTOPHER P. RICHIE, Attorney, BANK OF AMERICA, Northbrook, IL, UNNAMED DEFENDANT, THE PERMANENTE FEDERATION, LLC, KAISER PERMANENTE VENTURES, THE CITY OF WASHINGTON, DC DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, LESLYE E. MOSLEY, Attorney, JODI MADDOX, Schwab, NATHALIA CIBOLTI, Pathways to Housing District of Columbia Government Outreach Specialist, MARK LANGLEY, Court Clerk U.S. Court of Appeals, UNNAMED CO-DEFENDANT, KAISER PERMANENTE U.S.A. INC., STATE OF TEXAS, District Court Administrator, CHARLES SCHWAB & COMPANY, INCORPORATED, 401K/IRA, MR. CHARLES SCHWAB, Schwab, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, ROBERT SCHREINER, HCA HEALTHCARE CORPORATION OF AMERICA, Corporate Headquarters-One Park Plaza, THE STATE DEPARTMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, PRESIDENT TRUMP ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF THE CLERK, United States District Court-DC, H&R BLOCK ADVISORS, H&R BLOCK EASTERN ENTERPRISES, INCORPORATED, MAZURSKY CONSTANTINE, LLC, NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, Dallas, Texas, CRAIG FAERBER, of KPGA, GEOFFREY BECKHAM, Schwab, OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, Texas, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, San Francisco, CA and REX TILLERSON, Former Secretary of State 2017
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROSE ADANMA DURU
Case Number: 19-2134
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 24, 2020 Rose Duru v. President Trump Administration

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Anthony J. Durone for H&R Block Eastern Enterprises, Incorporated. [1000642198] [19-2134] Anthony Durone [Entered: 12/10/2019 12:34 PM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by H&R Block Eastern Enterprises, Incorporated. [19-2134] Anthony Durone [Entered: 12/10/2019 11:40 AM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Rose Adanma Duru re: filing of disclosure form Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Rose Duru. [19-2134] AW [Entered: 12/06/2019 07:29 AM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE/SERVICE LIST by Rose Adanma Duru. Related documents: [ # 7 ] informal opening brief [19-2134] AW [Entered: 12/02/2019 09:41 AM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Northern Trust Company. [19-2134] Wendy McGraw [Entered: 11/26/2019 02:20 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by HCA Healthcare Corporation of America and HCA Healthcare Corporation of America. [19-2134] Leslie Machado [Entered: 11/25/2019 01:56 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by HCA Healthcare Corporation of America and HCA Healthcare Corporation of America. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000633281] [19-2134] Leslie Machado [Entered: 11/25/2019 01:55 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Leslie Paul Machado for HCA Healthcare Corporation of America and HCA Healthcare Corporation of America. [1000633276] [19-2134] Leslie Machado [Entered: 11/25/2019 01:54 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Rose Adanma Duru re: filing of disclosure form. Mailed to: Rose Duru. [19-2134] AW [Entered: 11/13/2019 12:51 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Rose Adanma Duru. [19-2134] AW [Entered: 11/13/2019 12:51 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Northern Trust Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000617526] [19-2134] Wendy McGraw [Entered: 10/31/2019 11:28 AM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Wendy C. McGraw for Northern Trust Company. [1000617516] [19-2134] Wendy McGraw [Entered: 10/31/2019 11:22 AM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00874-LO-TCB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-2134] AW [Entered: 10/21/2019 09:24 AM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 10/31/2019. [19-2134] AW [Entered: 10/17/2019 11:42 AM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Rose Duru. Informal Opening Brief due 11/12/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2134] AW [Entered: 10/17/2019 11:41 AM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00874-LO-TCB. Case manager: AWalker. [19-2134] AW [Entered: 10/17/2019 11:39 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose Duru v. President Trump Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, Marietta, Georgia
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H&R BLOCK BAILEY'S CROSSROADS CENTER
Represented By: Ellisleslie Leon Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID R. CLOUSTON, Attorney
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KERRY KOHNEN, of KPGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF TEXAS, -Judicial Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HENRIETTA KING, of KPGA/TSPMG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. CIVIL COURT ADMINISTRATORS
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RANDALL ALAN CONSTANTINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HENRY J. KAISER, of Kaiser Family Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAISER PERMANENTE NORTHERN CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAISER PERMANENTE VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIM KAISER, of Kaiser Family Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAISER PERMANENTE COLORADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGELA D. CAESAR, Clerk of Court U.S. District Court-DC
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELINDA LOUIE, Schwab
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAW FIRM- SESSIONS, FISHMAN, NATHAN AND ISRAEL, LLP
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAISER PERMANENTE MARYLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATHWAYS TO HOUSING DC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC, -TSPMG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COURT ADMINISTRATOR, State of Texas Judicial Court
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPUTY CLERKS OF U.S. COURTHOUSE-DC
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAISER PERMANENTE SOUTHERN CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HCA HEALTHCARE CORPORATION OF AMERICA, North Texas Division
Represented By: Leslie Paul Machado Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF TEXAS, District Court Clerk
Represented By: Aaron Samuel Book
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H&R BLOCK, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Ellisleslie Leon Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL F. DOHERTY, of KPGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAISER PERMANENTE CAPITOL HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER P. RICHIE, Attorney
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, Northbrook, IL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNNAMED DEFENDANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE PERMANENTE FEDERATION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAISER PERMANENTE VENTURES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE CITY OF WASHINGTON, DC DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LESLYE E. MOSLEY, Attorney
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JODI MADDOX, Schwab
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATHALIA CIBOLTI, Pathways to Housing District of Columbia Government Outreach Specialist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK LANGLEY, Court Clerk U.S. Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNNAMED CO-DEFENDANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAISER PERMANENTE U.S.A. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF TEXAS, District Court Administrator
Represented By: Aaron Samuel Book
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES SCHWAB & COMPANY, INCORPORATED, 401K/IRA
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. CHARLES SCHWAB, Schwab
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT SCHREINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HCA HEALTHCARE CORPORATION OF AMERICA, Corporate Headquarters-One Park Plaza
Represented By: Leslie Paul Machado Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE STATE DEPARTMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PRESIDENT TRUMP ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICE OF THE CLERK, United States District Court-DC
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H&R BLOCK ADVISORS
Represented By: Ellisleslie Leon Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H&R BLOCK EASTERN ENTERPRISES, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Ellisleslie Leon Bennett
Represented By: Anthony J. Durone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAZURSKY CONSTANTINE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: Wendy Cohen McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, Dallas, Texas
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CRAIG FAERBER, of KPGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEOFFREY BECKHAM, Schwab
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, San Francisco, CA
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REX TILLERSON, Former Secretary of State 2017
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROSE ADANMA DURU
Represented By: Rose Adanma Duru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?