Dwayne Lester v. Mark Esper
Plaintiff / Appellant: DWAYNE LAVAUGHN LESTER
Defendant / Appellee: CINDY YOUR, KATHERINE LLOYD, (DISA), OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, ALAN LYNN, Director, DEFENSE INFORMATION SYSTEMS AGENCY, NANCY SOLOMON, IG Inspector, ROBERT KNUTTI, Visual Information Chief, MARK T. ESPER, Secretary, United States Department of Defense and JANG SUH, IG Inspector
Case Number: 19-2189
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dwayne Lavaughn Lester. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000645181] [19-2189] JSN [Entered: 12/16/2019 11:09 AM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Dwayne Lavaughn Lester re: filing of disclosure form. Mailed to: Dwayne Lester. [19-2189] JSN [Entered: 11/25/2019 12:08 PM]
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Dwayne Lavaughn Lester. [19-2189] JSN [Entered: 11/25/2019 12:07 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03749-CCB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-2189] JSN [Entered: 11/13/2019 02:43 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 11/12/2019. [19-2189] JSN [Entered: 10/29/2019 11:14 AM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 11/22/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. Mailed to: Dwayne Lester.[19-2189] JSN [Entered: 10/29/2019 11:11 AM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-03749-CCB. Case manager: JeffNeal. [19-2189] JSN [Entered: 10/29/2019 11:05 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dwayne Lester v. Mark Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DWAYNE LAVAUGHN LESTER
Represented By: Dwayne Lavaughn Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CINDY YOUR
Represented By: Matthew Paul Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHERINE LLOYD, (DISA)
Represented By: Matthew Paul Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL
Represented By: Matthew Paul Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALAN LYNN, Director
Represented By: Matthew Paul Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEFENSE INFORMATION SYSTEMS AGENCY
Represented By: Matthew Paul Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NANCY SOLOMON, IG Inspector
Represented By: Matthew Paul Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT KNUTTI, Visual Information Chief
Represented By: Matthew Paul Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK T. ESPER, Secretary, United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Matthew Paul Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANG SUH, IG Inspector
Represented By: Matthew Paul Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?