Thomas Montgomery, III v. Mark Esper
Defendant: PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, Acting Secretary of Defense
Plaintiff / Appellant: THOMAS V. MONTGOMERY, III, Dr.
Defendant / Appellee: DR. MARK T. ESPER
Case Number: 19-2205
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Thomas V. Montgomery, III to vacate lower court decison and remand. Titled: Appellant's motion for relief due to appellee's failure to respond to the appellant's informal opening brief. [1000646216] [19-2205] RE [Entered: 12/17/2019 11:09 AM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Mark T. Esper that no brief will be filed. [19-2205] John Swords [Entered: 12/06/2019 11:14 AM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John E. Swords for Mark T. Esper. [1000639821] [19-2205] John Swords [Entered: 12/06/2019 11:03 AM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thomas V. Montgomery, III. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000636783] [19-2205] RE [Entered: 12/03/2019 11:43 AM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Thomas V. Montgomery, III. [19-2205] RE [Entered: 11/25/2019 04:18 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Thomas V. Montgomery, III re: filing of disclosure form. Mailed to: Thomas Montgomery. [19-2205] RE [Entered: 11/20/2019 01:27 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01317-CMH-IDD. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-2205] RE [Entered: 11/13/2019 10:19 AM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 11/26/2019. [19-2205] RE [Entered: 11/12/2019 11:42 AM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Thomas Montgomery. Informal Opening Brief due 11/25/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2205] RE [Entered: 10/31/2019 08:31 AM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01317-CMH-IDD. Case manager: REdwards. [19-2205] RE [Entered: 10/31/2019 08:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas Montgomery, III v. Mark Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS V. MONTGOMERY, III, Dr.
Represented By: Thomas V. Montgomery III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. MARK T. ESPER
Represented By: John Earl Swords
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK M. SHANAHAN, Acting Secretary of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?