Reynaldo Suazo v. US Bank Trust, N.A.
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: US BANK TRUST, N.A., Solely in its capacity as trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: CATHERINE MARTINSON, EVA SUAZO, RONALD LEWIS and REYNALDO SUAZO
Case Number: 19-2210
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Mediation forms. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2210] MRB [Entered: 12/18/2019 08:38 AM]
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER filed extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 01/24/2020. Number of days granted: 45. Opening brief and appendix due 01/24/2020. Response brief due 02/24/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000631887] [19-2210] MR [Entered: 11/22/2019 12:10 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Reynaldo Suazo. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000630156] [19-2210] Emanwel Turnbull [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:53 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Eva Suazo. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000630153] [19-2210] Emanwel Turnbull [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:53 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Catherine Martinson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000630150] [19-2210] Emanwel Turnbull [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:52 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Ronald Lewis. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000630147] [19-2210] Emanwel Turnbull [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:52 PM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Peter A. Holland for Ronald Lewis, Catherine Martinson, Eva Suazo and Reynaldo Suazo. [1000626468] [19-2210] Peter Holland [Entered: 11/14/2019 03:39 PM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by US Bank Trust, N.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000626051] [19-2210] Emily Patterson [Entered: 11/14/2019 11:16 AM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000626030] [19-2210] Emily Patterson [Entered: 11/14/2019 11:09 AM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lyle D. Kossis for Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and US Bank Trust, N.A.. [1000625994] [19-2210] Lyle Kossis [Entered: 11/14/2019 11:01 AM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Emily M. Patterson for Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and US Bank Trust, N.A.. [1000625989] [19-2210] Emily Patterson [Entered: 11/14/2019 10:58 AM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Brian E. Pumphrey for Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and US Bank Trust, N.A.. [1000625981] [19-2210] Brian Pumphrey [Entered: 11/14/2019 10:55 AM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ava E. Lias-Booker for Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and US Bank Trust, N.A.. [1000625972] [19-2210] Ava Lias-Booker [Entered: 11/14/2019 10:51 AM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2210] MRB [Entered: 11/08/2019 09:02 AM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Emanwel J. Turnbull for Reynaldo Suazo, Eva Suazo, Catherine Martinson and Ronald Lewis. [1000621761] [19-2210] Emanwel Turnbull [Entered: 11/06/2019 08:37 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Ronald Lewis, Catherine Martinson, Eva Suazo and Reynaldo Suazo. [19-2210] Emanwel Turnbull [Entered: 11/06/2019 08:36 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/10/2019. Response Brief due 01/09/2020 [19-2210] MR [Entered: 10/31/2019 10:59 AM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 8:18-cv-01451-RDB.. [19-2210] MR [Entered: 10/31/2019 10:57 AM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-01451-RDB. Case manager: MRadday. [19-2210] MR [Entered: 10/31/2019 10:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynaldo Suazo v. US Bank Trust, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US BANK TRUST, N.A., Solely in its capacity as trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Brian Emory Pumphrey
Represented By: Ava E. Lias-Booker
Represented By: Emily Michele Patterson
Represented By: Lyle David Kossis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC.
Represented By: Brian Emory Pumphrey
Represented By: Ava E. Lias-Booker
Represented By: Emily Michele Patterson
Represented By: Lyle David Kossis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CATHERINE MARTINSON
Represented By: Scott C. Borison
Represented By: Phillip R. Robinson
Represented By: Peter Albert Holland
Represented By: Emanwel Josef Turnbull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EVA SUAZO
Represented By: Scott C. Borison
Represented By: Phillip R. Robinson
Represented By: Peter Albert Holland
Represented By: Emanwel Josef Turnbull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONALD LEWIS
Represented By: Scott C. Borison
Represented By: Phillip R. Robinson
Represented By: Peter Albert Holland
Represented By: Emanwel Josef Turnbull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REYNALDO SUAZO
Represented By: Scott C. Borison
Represented By: Phillip R. Robinson
Represented By: Peter Albert Holland
Represented By: Emanwel Josef Turnbull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?