NC NAACP State Conference v. Philip Berger
Appellant: PHILIP E. BERGER, in his official capacity as President Pro Tempore of the North Carolina Senate and TIMOTHY K. MOORE, in his official capacity as Speaker of the North Carolina House of Representatives
Plaintiff / Appellee: CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO NAACP, MOORE COUNTY NAACP, HIGH POINT NAACP, GREENSBORO NAACP, STOKES COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP, NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP and WINSTON SALEM-FORSYTH COUNTY NAACP
Defendant / Appellee: JEFFERSON CARMON, in his official capacity as a member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections, DAVID C. BLACK, in his official capacity as a member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections, STELLA ANDERSON, in her official capacity as Secretary of the North Carolina State Board of Elections, KEN RAYMOND, in his official capacity as a member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections and DAMON CIRCOSTA, in his official capacity as Chair of the North Carolina State Board of Elections
Case Number: 19-2273
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 30 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/13/2020. Response Brief due 02/11/2020 [19-2273] MR [Entered: 12/03/2019 09:29 AM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000635201] [19-2273] Stephen Wirth [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:33 PM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000635200] [19-2273] Stephen Wirth [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:32 PM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000635199] [19-2273] Stephen Wirth [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:31 PM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000635197] [19-2273] Stephen Wirth [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:30 PM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000635195] [19-2273] Stephen Wirth [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:29 PM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000635192] [19-2273] Stephen Wirth [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:27 PM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000635190] [19-2273] Stephen Wirth [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:26 PM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000634817] [19-2273] Stephen Wirth [Entered: 11/27/2019 07:22 AM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 21 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Penda D. Hair for Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP. [1000634635] [19-2273] Penda Hair [Entered: 11/26/2019 03:39 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephen K. Wirth for Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP. [1000632874] [19-2273] Stephen Wirth [Entered: 11/25/2019 10:31 AM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John C. Ulin for Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP. [1000632857] [19-2273] John Ulin [Entered: 11/25/2019 10:27 AM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew Tutt for Chapel Hill-Carrboro NAACP, Greensboro NAACP, High Point NAACP, Moore County NAACP, North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, Stokes County Branch of the NAACP and Winston Salem-Forsyth County NAACP. [1000632855] [19-2273] Andrew Tutt [Entered: 11/25/2019 10:25 AM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Ken Raymond. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000628859] [19-2273] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 11/19/2019 11:22 AM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Damon Circosta. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000628846] [19-2273] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 11/19/2019 11:19 AM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jefferson Carmon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000628842] [19-2273] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 11/19/2019 11:18 AM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by David C. Black. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000628838] [19-2273] Olga Vysotskaya de Brito [Entered: 11/19/2019 11:16 AM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Stella Anderson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000628807] [19-2273] Paul Cox [Entered: 11/19/2019 10:58 AM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Stella Anderson, David C. Black, Jefferson Carmon, Damon Circosta and Ken Raymond. [1000628802] [19-2273] Paul Cox [Entered: 11/19/2019 10:57 AM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Stella Anderson, David C. Black, Damon Circosta, Ken Raymond and Jefferson Carmon. [1000628730] [19-2273] Paul Cox [Entered: 11/19/2019 10:17 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. [19-2273] Nicole Moss [Entered: 11/15/2019 11:03 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000626948] [19-2273] David Thompson [Entered: 11/15/2019 11:01 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Nicole F. Reaves for Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. [1000626934] [19-2273] Nicole Frazer Reaves [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:57 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Haley N. Proctor for Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. [1000626927] [19-2273] Haley Proctor [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:55 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Peter A. Patterson for Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. [1000626911] [19-2273] Peter Patterson [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:52 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Nicole J. Moss for Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. [1000626908] [19-2273] Nicole Moss [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:51 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David H. Thompson for Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. [1000626906] [19-2273] David Thompson [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:50 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael W. Kirk for Philip E. Berger and Timothy K. Moore. [1000626904] [19-2273] Michael Kirk [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:49 AM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01034-LCB-LPA.. [19-2273] MR [Entered: 11/14/2019 09:54 AM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01034-LCB-LPA. Case manager: MRadday. [19-2273] MR [Entered: 11/14/2019 09:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NC NAACP State Conference v. Philip Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PHILIP E. BERGER, in his official capacity as President Pro Tempore of the North Carolina Senate
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: Nicole J. Moss
Represented By: Nathan A. Huff
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Represented By: Haley Marie Nix Proctor
Represented By: Michael William Kirk
Represented By: Nicole Frazer Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TIMOTHY K. MOORE, in his official capacity as Speaker of the North Carolina House of Representatives
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: Nicole J. Moss
Represented By: Nathan A. Huff
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Represented By: Haley Marie Nix Proctor
Represented By: Michael William Kirk
Represented By: Nicole Frazer Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHAPEL HILL-CARRBORO NAACP
Represented By: Irving L. Joyner Esq. I
Represented By: Caitlin Swain-McSurely
Represented By: Leah Kang
Represented By: Stephen K. Wirth
Represented By: Andrew Tutt
Represented By: John Charles Ulin Esq.
Represented By: Ralf O. Dunn
Represented By: Penda D. Hair
Represented By: James William Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MOORE COUNTY NAACP
Represented By: Irving L. Joyner Esq. I
Represented By: Caitlin Swain-McSurely
Represented By: Leah Kang
Represented By: Stephen K. Wirth
Represented By: Andrew Tutt
Represented By: John Charles Ulin Esq.
Represented By: Ralf O. Dunn
Represented By: Penda D. Hair
Represented By: James William Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HIGH POINT NAACP
Represented By: Irving L. Joyner Esq. I
Represented By: Caitlin Swain-McSurely
Represented By: Leah Kang
Represented By: Stephen K. Wirth
Represented By: Andrew Tutt
Represented By: John Charles Ulin Esq.
Represented By: Ralf O. Dunn
Represented By: Penda D. Hair
Represented By: James William Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREENSBORO NAACP
Represented By: Irving L. Joyner Esq. I
Represented By: Caitlin Swain-McSurely
Represented By: Leah Kang
Represented By: Stephen K. Wirth
Represented By: Andrew Tutt
Represented By: John Charles Ulin Esq.
Represented By: Ralf O. Dunn
Represented By: Penda D. Hair
Represented By: James William Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STOKES COUNTY BRANCH OF THE NAACP
Represented By: Irving L. Joyner Esq. I
Represented By: Caitlin Swain-McSurely
Represented By: Leah Kang
Represented By: Stephen K. Wirth
Represented By: Andrew Tutt
Represented By: John Charles Ulin Esq.
Represented By: Ralf O. Dunn
Represented By: Penda D. Hair
Represented By: James William Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NORTH CAROLINA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP
Represented By: Irving L. Joyner Esq. I
Represented By: Caitlin Swain-McSurely
Represented By: Leah Kang
Represented By: Stephen K. Wirth
Represented By: Andrew Tutt
Represented By: John Charles Ulin Esq.
Represented By: Ralf O. Dunn
Represented By: Penda D. Hair
Represented By: James William Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WINSTON SALEM-FORSYTH COUNTY NAACP
Represented By: Irving L. Joyner Esq. I
Represented By: Caitlin Swain-McSurely
Represented By: Leah Kang
Represented By: Stephen K. Wirth
Represented By: Andrew Tutt
Represented By: John Charles Ulin Esq.
Represented By: Ralf O. Dunn
Represented By: Penda D. Hair
Represented By: James William Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFERSON CARMON, in his official capacity as a member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Paul Mason Cox
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Olga Eugenia Vysotskaya de Brito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID C. BLACK, in his official capacity as a member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Paul Mason Cox
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Olga Eugenia Vysotskaya de Brito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STELLA ANDERSON, in her official capacity as Secretary of the North Carolina State Board of Elections
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Paul Mason Cox
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Olga Eugenia Vysotskaya de Brito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEN RAYMOND, in his official capacity as a member of the North Carolina State Board of Elections
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Paul Mason Cox
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Olga Eugenia Vysotskaya de Brito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAMON CIRCOSTA, in his official capacity as Chair of the North Carolina State Board of Elections
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Represented By: Paul Mason Cox
Represented By: Stephanie A. Brennan
Represented By: Olga Eugenia Vysotskaya de Brito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?