Thomas Richards, Jr. v. Nancy Berryhill
Plaintiff / Appellant: THOMAS G. RICHARDS, JR.
Defendant / Appellee: NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 19-2455
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Thomas G. Richards, Jr.. [19-2455] Thomas Richards [Entered: 02/12/2020 03:04 PM]
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 RECORD ON APPEAL filed (paper form). Record Part: Sealed Volume, Comments: SEALED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00743-MSN. [19-2455] RHS [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:50 PM]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 6 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 02/12/2020 Copies to all parties. [1000656760] [19-2455] RHS [Entered: 01/07/2020 09:54 AM]
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Thomas G. Richards, Jr. to extend filing time for informal opening brief.. Date and method of service: 01/06/2020 ecf. [1000656279] [19-2455] Thomas Richards [Entered: 01/06/2020 04:17 PM]
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00743-MSN. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-2455] RHS [Entered: 01/06/2020 03:43 PM]
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 01/21/2020. [19-2455] RHS [Entered: 01/06/2020 03:14 PM]
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kimere J Kimball for Nancy A. Berryhill. [1000655306] [19-2455] Kimere Kimball [Entered: 01/03/2020 05:27 PM]
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by R. Trent McCotter for Nancy A. Berryhill. [1000652719] [19-2455] R. McCotter [Entered: 12/30/2019 09:53 AM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 01/13/2020 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-2455] RHS [Entered: 12/19/2019 02:21 PM]
December 19, 2019 Social Security case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00743-MSN. Date notice of appeal filed: 12/18/2019. Case manager: RSewell. [19-2455] RHS [Entered: 12/19/2019 02:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas Richards, Jr. v. Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS G. RICHARDS, JR.
Represented By: Thomas G. Richards Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Represented By: Antonia Marie Konkoly
Represented By: Kimere Jane Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?