David Mullaney v. Bank of America, NA
Defendant / Appellee: CITI MORTGAGE INCORPORATED and BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as successor by merger to Merrill Lynch Bank, USA
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID DUNN MULLANEY and ELISE HUMPHRIES MULLANEY
Trustee: JOHN C. BIRCHER, III
Case Number: 19-2456
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 02/28/2020. Response brief due 03/30/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000662278] [19-2456] CP [Entered: 01/14/2020 03:17 PM]
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, National Association and Citi Mortgage Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000654969] [19-2456] Zipporah Edwards [Entered: 01/03/2020 12:44 PM]
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Zipporah B. Edwards for Bank of America, National Association and Citi Mortgage Incorporated. [1000654967] [19-2456] Zipporah Edwards [Entered: 01/03/2020 12:42 PM]
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-2456] MRB [Entered: 01/03/2020 10:51 AM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elise Humphries Mullaney. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000654126] [19-2456] Richard Cook [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:24 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/11/2020. Response Brief due 03/12/2020. [19-2456] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:24 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David Dunn Mullaney. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000654124] [19-2456] Richard Cook [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:24 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John C. Bircher, III. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000654122] [19-2456] Richard Cook [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:23 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 DOCKETING STATEMENT by John C. Bircher, III, David Dunn Mullaney and Elise Humphries Mullaney. [19-2456] Richard Cook [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:22 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Richard P. Cook for John C. Bircher, III, David Dunn Mullaney and Elise Humphries Mullaney. [1000654118] [19-2456] Richard Cook [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:20 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Citi Mortgage Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000651852] [19-2456] Donald Pocock [Entered: 12/26/2019 03:54 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Donald R. Pocock for Citi Mortgage Incorporated. [1000651845] [19-2456] Donald Pocock [Entered: 12/26/2019 03:53 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 7:19-cv-00078-FL. Mailed to: Z. Edwards, A. Randall. [19-2456] CP [Entered: 12/20/2019 11:33 AM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 7:19-cv-00078-FL. Case manager: CPoulsen. [19-2456] CP [Entered: 12/20/2019 11:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Mullaney v. Bank of America, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITI MORTGAGE INCORPORATED
Represented By: Donald Richard Pocock
Represented By: Zipporah Basile Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as successor by merger to Merrill Lynch Bank, USA
Represented By: Zipporah Basile Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID DUNN MULLANEY
Represented By: Richard Preston Cook
Represented By: Anne J. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELISE HUMPHRIES MULLANEY
Represented By: Richard Preston Cook
Represented By: Anne J. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: JOHN C. BIRCHER, III
Represented By: Richard Preston Cook
Represented By: Anne J. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?