Donald Trump v. Intl Refugee Assistance
Petitioner: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, in this official capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, in his official capacity as Secretary of State, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, MARK A. MORGAN, in his official capacity as Senior Official Performing the Functions and Duties of the Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, JOSEPH MAGUIRE, In his official capacity as Acting Director of National Intelligence, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE and WILLIAM P. BARR, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States
Respondent: MIDDLE EAST STUDIES ASSOCIATION OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., on behalf of itself and its members, FAKHRI ZIAOLHAGH, EBLAL ZAKZOK, JANE DOE #2, JANE DOE #4, JOHN DOE #5, INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT, a Project of the Urban Justice Center, Inc., on behalf of itself and its clients, YEMENI-AMERICAN MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION, IRANIAN STUDENTS' FOUNDATION, Iranian Alliances Across Borders Affiliate at the University of Maryland College Park, AFSANEH KHAZAELI, JANE DOE #3, IBRAHIM AHMED MOHOMED, SHAPOUR SHIRANI, GRANNAZ AMIRJAMSHIDI, PAUL HARRISON, JANE DOE #6, MOHAMAD MASHTA, MUHAMMED METEAB, SUMAYA HAMADMAD, JOHN DOE #4, JANE DOE #1, FAHED MUQBIL, HIAS, INC., on behalf of itself and its clients, JOHN DOE #2, JANE DOE #5, IRANIAN ALLIANCES ACROSS BORDERS, JOHN DOES #1 - #3 and ARAB AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK, on behalf of itself and its clients
Case Number: 19-350
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Grannaz Amirjamshidi, Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, John Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, John Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, John Doe #5, Jane Doe #6, John Does #1 - #3, Sumaya Hamadmad, Paul Harrison, HIAS, Inc., International Refugee Assistance Project, Iranian Alliances Across Borders, Iranian Students' Foundation, Afsaneh Khazaeli, Mohamad Mashta, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed, Fahed Muqbil, Shapour Shirani, Yemeni-American Merchants Association, Eblal Zakzok and Fakhri Ziaolhagh to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 3 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [19-350] Steven Herzog [Entered: 09/06/2019 09:52 PM]
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Steven C. Herzog for Eblal Zakzok, Sumaya Hamadmad, Fahed Muqbil, John Does #1 - #3 and John Doe #2. [1000582046] [19-350] Steven Herzog [Entered: 09/05/2019 01:46 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 5 NOTICE issued to Grannaz Amirjamshidi, Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, John Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, John Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, John Doe #5, Jane Doe #6, John Does #1 - #3, HIAS, Inc., Sumaya Hamadmad, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Iranian Alliances Across Borders, Iranian Students' Foundation, Afsaneh Khazaeli, Mohamad Mashta, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed, Fahed Muqbil, Shapour Shirani, Yemeni-American Merchants Association, Eblal Zakzok and Fakhri Ziaolhagh requesting response to petition. Mailed to:Gadeir F. Abbas; Nimra Azmi; Michelle Bennett; David Douglas Cole; Linda B. Evarts; Hugh Handeyside; Mariko Hirose; Joseph H. Hunt; Sarah L. Mehta; Kathryn Claire Meyer; Thomas Christman Rice; Justin Mark Sadowsky; Hina Shamsi; Karun Tilak; Rebecca G. Van Tassell; Max Samuel Wolson. [19-350] EB [Entered: 08/30/2019 06:27 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE ISSUED to Grannaz Amirjamshidi, Arab American Association of New York, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, John Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, Jane Doe #4, John Doe #4, Jane Doe #5, John Doe #5, Jane Doe #6, John Does #1 - #3, HIAS, Inc., Sumaya Hamadmad, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Iranian Alliances Across Borders, Iranian Students' Foundation, Afsaneh Khazaeli, Mohamad Mashta, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed, Fahed Muqbil, Shapour Shirani, Yemeni-American Merchants Association and Eblal Zakzok requesting response to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 3 ]. Response due: 09/06/2019. Mailed to:Gadeir F. Abbas; Nimra Azmi; Michelle Bennett; David Douglas Cole; Linda B. Evarts; Hugh Handeyside; Mariko Hirose; Joseph H. Hunt; Sarah L. Mehta; Kathryn Claire Meyer; Thomas Christman Rice; Justin Mark Sadowsky; Hina Shamsi; Karun Tilak; Rebecca G. Van Tassell; Max Samuel Wolson [1000578511]. [19-350] EB [Entered: 08/30/2019 06:19 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by William P. Barr, Mr. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Department of State, Joseph Maguire, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security for stay pending appeal. [1000578507] [19-350] EB [Entered: 08/30/2019 06:05 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for permission to appeal filed by William P. Barr, Mr. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Department of State, Joseph Maguire, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. Is petition filed under Class Action Fairness Act (28 USC 1453(c))? N. [19-350] EB [Entered: 08/30/2019 05:51 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 Permission to appeal case docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC, 8:17-cv-02921-TDC, 1:17-cv-02969-TDC. Case manager: EBorneisen. [19-350] EB [Entered: 08/30/2019 05:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald Trump v. Intl Refugee Assistance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, in this official capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Robert K. Hur
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan
Represented By: Joshua Paul Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Robert K. Hur
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan
Represented By: Joshua Paul Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Robert K. Hur
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan
Represented By: Joshua Paul Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAEL R. POMPEO, in his official capacity as Secretary of State
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Robert K. Hur
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan
Represented By: Joshua Paul Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Robert K. Hur
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan
Represented By: Joshua Paul Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARK A. MORGAN, in his official capacity as Senior Official Performing the Functions and Duties of the Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Robert K. Hur
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan
Represented By: Joshua Paul Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Robert K. Hur
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan
Represented By: Joshua Paul Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSEPH MAGUIRE, In his official capacity as Acting Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Robert K. Hur
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan
Represented By: Joshua Paul Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Robert K. Hur
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan
Represented By: Joshua Paul Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WILLIAM P. BARR, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Joseph H. Hunt
Represented By: Robert K. Hur
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan
Represented By: Joshua Paul Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MIDDLE EAST STUDIES ASSOCIATION OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., on behalf of itself and its members
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Kathryn Claire Meyer
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: David Kautsky Hausman
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FAKHRI ZIAOLHAGH
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: EBLAL ZAKZOK
Represented By: Robert A. Atkins
Represented By: Thomas Christman Rice
Represented By: Lena Fatina Masri
Represented By: Faiza Patel
Represented By: Justin Mark Sadowsky
Represented By: Liza Velazquez
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Represented By: Charles E. Davidow
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Steven C. Herzog
Represented By: Jethro Mark Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JANE DOE #2
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver Esq.
Represented By: David Douglas Cole
Represented By: Kathryn Claire Meyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya Esq.
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: David Kautsky Hausman
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Sarah L. Mehta
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JANE DOE #4
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya Esq.
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Marianne Frances Kies
Represented By: Karun Tilak
Represented By: Mark William Mosier
Represented By: John Wallace Sorrenti
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Cahoy
Represented By: Jose Enrique Arvelo
Represented By: Nimra Azmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOE #5
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT, a Project of the Urban Justice Center, Inc., on behalf of itself and its clients
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver Esq.
Represented By: David Douglas Cole
Represented By: Kathryn Claire Meyer
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: David Kautsky Hausman
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Sarah L. Mehta
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: YEMENI-AMERICAN MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: IRANIAN STUDENTS' FOUNDATION, Iranian Alliances Across Borders Affiliate at the University of Maryland College Park
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya Esq.
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Marianne Frances Kies
Represented By: Karun Tilak
Represented By: Mark William Mosier
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Cahoy
Represented By: Nimra Azmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AFSANEH KHAZAELI
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JANE DOE #3
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya Esq.
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Marianne Frances Kies
Represented By: Karun Tilak
Represented By: Mark William Mosier
Represented By: John Wallace Sorrenti
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Cahoy
Represented By: Jose Enrique Arvelo
Represented By: Nimra Azmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: IBRAHIM AHMED MOHOMED
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Kathryn Claire Meyer
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: David Kautsky Hausman
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SHAPOUR SHIRANI
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GRANNAZ AMIRJAMSHIDI
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PAUL HARRISON
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Kathryn Claire Meyer
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: David Kautsky Hausman
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JANE DOE #6
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Marianne Frances Kies
Represented By: Karun Tilak
Represented By: Mark William Mosier
Represented By: John Wallace Sorrenti
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Cahoy
Represented By: Jose Enrique Arvelo
Represented By: Nimra Azmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MOHAMAD MASHTA
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MUHAMMED METEAB
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Kathryn Claire Meyer
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: David Kautsky Hausman
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SUMAYA HAMADMAD
Represented By: Robert A. Atkins
Represented By: Thomas Christman Rice
Represented By: Lena Fatina Masri
Represented By: Faiza Patel
Represented By: Justin Mark Sadowsky
Represented By: Liza Velazquez
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Represented By: Charles E. Davidow
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Steven C. Herzog
Represented By: Jethro Mark Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOE #4
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JANE DOE #1
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Marianne Frances Kies
Represented By: Karun Tilak
Represented By: Mark William Mosier
Represented By: John Wallace Sorrenti
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Cahoy
Represented By: Jose Enrique Arvelo
Represented By: Nimra Azmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FAHED MUQBIL
Represented By: Robert A. Atkins
Represented By: Thomas Christman Rice
Represented By: Lena Fatina Masri
Represented By: Faiza Patel
Represented By: Justin Mark Sadowsky
Represented By: Liza Velazquez
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Represented By: Charles E. Davidow
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Steven C. Herzog
Represented By: Jethro Mark Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HIAS, INC., on behalf of itself and its clients
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver Esq.
Represented By: David Douglas Cole
Represented By: Kathryn Claire Meyer
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: David Kautsky Hausman
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Sarah L. Mehta
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOE #2
Represented By: Robert A. Atkins
Represented By: Thomas Christman Rice
Represented By: Lena Fatina Masri
Represented By: Faiza Patel
Represented By: Justin Mark Sadowsky
Represented By: Liza Velazquez
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Represented By: Charles E. Davidow
Represented By: Andrew J. Ehrlich
Represented By: Steven C. Herzog
Represented By: Jethro Mark Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JANE DOE #5
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya Esq.
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Marianne Frances Kies
Represented By: Karun Tilak
Represented By: Mark William Mosier
Represented By: John Wallace Sorrenti
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Cahoy
Represented By: Jose Enrique Arvelo
Represented By: Nimra Azmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: IRANIAN ALLIANCES ACROSS BORDERS
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya Esq.
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Marianne Frances Kies
Represented By: Karun Tilak
Represented By: Mark William Mosier
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Cahoy
Represented By: Nimra Azmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOES #1 - #3
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver Esq.
Represented By: David Douglas Cole
Represented By: Kathryn Claire Meyer
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: David Kautsky Hausman
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Steven C. Herzog
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Sarah L. Mehta
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ARAB AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF NEW YORK, on behalf of itself and its clients
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: David Kautsky Hausman
Represented By: Linda B. Evarts
Represented By: Kathryn Claire Meyer
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?