Huberto Espindola-Soto v. Officer One

Defendant: TRACY JOHNS, Warden
Defendant / Appellee: OFFICER TWO, unknown name, Virginia's Piedmont Regional Jail and OFFICER ONE, unknown name, Virginia's Piedmont Regional Jail
Plaintiff / Appellant: HUBERTO ESPINDOLA-SOTO, a/k/a Felix Hernandez
Case Number: 19-6008
Filed: January 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed [1000451497] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [6]. Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Huberto Espindola-Soto, Inmate No. 59257-056. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Huberto Espindola-Soto and Warden, ATTN: Accounting Office, at D. Ray James Correctional Facility. [19-6008] KS [Entered: 02/05/2019 10:45 AM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 PLRA-CONSENT TO PAYMENT form by Huberto Espindola-Soto. [19-6008] KS [Entered: 02/05/2019 10:42 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Huberto Espindola-Soto re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Huberto Espindola-Soto. [19-6008] KS [Entered: 01/24/2019 02:35 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Huberto Espindola-Soto. Consent to Payment Form: No; Trust Account Statement: Yes. [19-6008] KS [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:06 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Huberto Espindola-Soto. [19-6008] KS [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:06 PM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00577-HEH-RCY. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6008] KS [Entered: 01/03/2019 07:49 AM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Huberto Espindola-Soto. Informal Opening Brief due 01/28/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6008] KS [Entered: 01/03/2019 07:47 AM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Huberto Espindola-Soto ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Huberto Espindola-Soto. [19-6008] KS [Entered: 01/03/2019 07:45 AM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:18-cv-00577-HEH-RCY. Case manager: KStump. [19-6008] KS [Entered: 01/03/2019 07:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huberto Espindola-Soto v. Officer One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER TWO, unknown name, Virginia's Piedmont Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER ONE, unknown name, Virginia's Piedmont Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY JOHNS, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HUBERTO ESPINDOLA-SOTO, a/k/a Felix Hernandez
Represented By: Huberto Espindola-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?