Olandio Workman v. Metro PCS Mobile Phone Company

Plaintiff / Appellant: OLANDIO RAY WORKMAN
Defendant / Appellee: MR. LEWIS, Greenville County Sheriff's Office, MR. RICHARDSON, GREENVILLE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE and METRO PCS MOBILE PHONE COMPANY
Case Number: 19-6085
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER filed [1000447271] deferring action on motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant Olandio Ray Workman [ # 8 ]; deferring action on motion to amend filed by Appellant Olandio Ray Workman [ # 7 ] Copies to all parties.. [19-6085] MR [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:58 AM]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed [1000447263] granting application for leave to proceed PLRA [6] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: OLANDIO RAY WORKMAN (273352). Copies to all parties. Mailed to: appellant and Financial Section, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Post Office Box 21787, Columbia, SC 29221. [19-6085] MR [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:56 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Olandio Ray Workman for stay pending appeal. Date of action to be stayed, if applicable:until conclusion of state court proceedings.. Date and method of service: 01/17/2019 US mail. [1000447255] [19-6085] MR [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:53 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Olandio Ray Workman to amend/correct complaint. Date and method of service: 01/18/2019 US mail. [1000447249] [19-6085] MR [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:51 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Olandio Ray Workman. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6085] MR [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:48 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Olandio Ray Workman. [19-6085] MR [Entered: 01/29/2019 10:47 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 02/04/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6085] MR [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:05 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Olandio Ray Workman ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days.. [19-6085] MR [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:03 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 6:17-cv-01208-RBH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6085] MR [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:00 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:17-cv-01208-RBH. Case manager: MRadday. [19-6085] MR [Entered: 01/10/2019 08:59 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olandio Workman v. Metro PCS Mobile Phone Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OLANDIO RAY WORKMAN
Represented By: Olandio Ray Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. LEWIS, Greenville County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREENVILLE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METRO PCS MOBILE PHONE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?