Curtis Williamson v. Richard Graham, Jr.
Defendant: JANET GILMORE, PA
Defendant / Appellee: KIMBERLY MARTIN, RN, RICHARD GRAHAM, JR., Warden, DOCTOR ASHRAF, DR. R. BARRERA, PEGGY MAHLER, PA, DOCTOR DR. JOUBERT and WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INCORPORATED
Plaintiff / Appellant: CURTIS WILLIAMSON
Case Number: 19-6209
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 10, 2019 Curtis Williamson v. Richard Graham, Jr.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Curtis Williamson. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 03/22/2019 03:26 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Ashraf, R. Barrera, Dr. Joubert, Peggy Mahler, Kimberly Martin and Wexford Health Sources, Incorporated. [19-6209]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by CT, clarify type of brief]--[Edited 03/22/2019 by MFT - event modified] Gina Smith [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:41 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Ashraf, R. Barrera, Dr. Joubert, Peggy Mahler and Kimberly Martin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000474189] [19-6209] Gina Smith [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:34 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Wexford Health Sources, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000474188] [19-6209] Gina Smith [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:33 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Ashraf, R. Barrera, Dr. Joubert, Peggy Mahler, Kimberly Martin and Wexford Health Sources, Incorporated. [1000474187] [19-6209] Gina Smith [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:32 PM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 PLRA/IFP-TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Curtis Williamson. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:49 AM]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed [1000468842] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [9] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Curtis Williamson, #445292/1286857. Copies to all parties.. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 03/04/2019 12:47 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Curtis Williamson. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 03/04/2019 12:44 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Curtis Williamson. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 03/04/2019 12:41 PM]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed [1000465073] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 7 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief and PLRA documents due 04/04/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:09 AM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Curtis Williamson to extend filing time for informal opening brief and plra forms by 30-60 days. Date and method of service: 02/15/2019 US mail. [1000464458] [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/25/2019 04:55 PM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 DOCUMENT (copy of NOA) by Curtis Williamson. [1000460711] [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/19/2019 04:13 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD & SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-01915-GLR. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/11/2019 08:33 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 02/22/2019. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:36 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 03/04/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:32 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Curtis Williamson ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:29 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-01915-GLR. Case manager: CathyHerb. [19-6209] CT [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:49 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Curtis Williamson v. Richard Graham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIMBERLY MARTIN, RN
Represented By: Joseph Barry Chazen
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD GRAHAM, JR., Warden
Represented By: Stephanie Judith Lane-Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOCTOR ASHRAF
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. R. BARRERA
Represented By: Joseph Barry Chazen
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PEGGY MAHLER, PA
Represented By: Joseph Barry Chazen
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOCTOR DR. JOUBERT
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Joseph Barry Chazen
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Meister
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET GILMORE, PA
Represented By: Gina Marie Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CURTIS WILLIAMSON
Represented By: Curtis Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?