David Smith v. County of Wake
Defendant / Appellee: COUNTY OF WAKE and DONNIE HARRISON, Sheriff
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID LEE SMITH, on behalf of himself and all other similarly situated
Case Number: 19-6330
Filed: March 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT by David Lee Smith to motion to reconsider (titled as Motion to Amend). [1000499062] [19-6330]--[Edited 04/30/2019 by MFT - Event Modified] RHS [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:23 PM]
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by David Lee Smith to reconsider order [ # 5 ]. Date and method of service: 03/21/2019 US mail. [1000483007] [19-6330] RHS [Entered: 03/27/2019 01:01 PM]
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to David Lee Smith re: failure to satisfy fee requirements under PLRA Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: David Smith. [19-6330] TW [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:55 PM]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER filed [1000477220] denying motion for leave to proceed PLRA [4]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: David Smith. [19-6330] TW [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:53 PM]
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by David Lee Smith. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6330] RHS [Entered: 03/15/2019 04:01 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by David Lee Smith. [19-6330] RHS [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:46 PM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ David Lee Smith ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: David Smith. [19-6330] RHS [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:55 AM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:03-ct-00561-BO. Case manager: RSewell. [19-6330] RHS [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: David Smith v. County of Wake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF WAKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONNIE HARRISON, Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID LEE SMITH, on behalf of himself and all other similarly situated
Represented By: David Lee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?