Robert Bartlett, Sr. v. Paula Smith
Defendant / Appellee: DIEDRE HARRELSON, BRAD PERRITT, JAMESE SMITH, PAULA SMITH, LARRY THOMPSON, PATSY CHAVIS and NURSE PALMER
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROBERT ANDREW BARTLETT, SR.
Case Number: 19-6475
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 23, 2019 Robert Bartlett, Sr. v. Paula Smith

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 PLRA TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Robert Andrew Bartlett, Sr. [19-6475] KS [Entered: 05/16/2019 03:12 PM]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed [1000510988] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [7] Fee Amount: $505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: Robert Andrew Bartlett, Sr., #0693774. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Robert Andrew Bartlett Sr. TABOR CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION 4600 Swamp Fox Hwy West Tabor City, NC 28463, Donna Gaa, Division of Prisons, Administrative Services Section, 831 W. Morgan Street, 4265 MSC, Raleigh, NC 27699-4265. [19-6475] AB [Entered: 05/13/2019 09:02 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Robert Andrew Bartlett, Sr.. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6475] AB [Entered: 05/13/2019 08:58 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Robert Andrew Bartlett, Sr. [19-6475] AB [Entered: 05/13/2019 08:56 AM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Robert Andrew Bartlett, Sr. re: for failure to satisfy PLRA and informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Robert Andrew Bartlett Sr. TABOR CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION 4600 Swamp Fox Hwy West Tabor City, NC 28463. [19-6475] AB [Entered: 05/09/2019 10:39 AM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:18-ct-03124-FL. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6475] AB [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:46 AM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Robert Andrew Bartlett Sr. TABOR CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION 4600 Swamp Fox Hwy West Tabor City, NC 28463. Informal Opening Brief due 05/06/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-6475] AB [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:44 AM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Robert Andrew Bartlett, Sr. ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Robert Andrew Bartlett Sr. TABOR CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION 4600 Swamp Fox Hwy West Tabor City, NC 28463. [19-6475] AB [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:37 AM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:18-ct-03124-FL. Case manager: ABrownlee. [19-6475] AB [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert Bartlett, Sr. v. Paula Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIEDRE HARRELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRAD PERRITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMESE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAULA SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LARRY THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATSY CHAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NURSE PALMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT ANDREW BARTLETT, SR.
Represented By: Robert Andrew Bartlett Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?