William Von Long v. Keven Soggs
Defendant: JAMES C. GALMORE
Defendant / Appellant: KEVEN BRADLY SOGGS
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILLIAM VON LONG
Case Number: 19-6651
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 23, 2019 William Von Long v. Keven Soggs

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed [1000514215] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5] Fee Amount: $$505.00. Name and Prisoner Number: #238950. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: W. Von Long. [19-6651] CT [Entered: 05/16/2019 03:48 PM]
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 4:19-cv-00053-DCC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6651] CT [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:10 PM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by William Von Long. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: Yes. [19-6651] CT [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:08 PM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by William Von Long. [19-6651] CT [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:06 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: W. Von Long. Informal Opening Brief due 05/28/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-6651] CT [Entered: 05/03/2019 04:06 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ William Von Long ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: W. Von Long. [19-6651] CT [Entered: 05/03/2019 04:03 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 4:19-cv-00053-DCC. Case manager: CathyHerb. [19-6651] CT [Entered: 05/03/2019 04:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: William Von Long v. Keven Soggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KEVEN BRADLY SOGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES C. GALMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM VON LONG
Represented By: William Von Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?