Albert Mills v. State of Maryland
Defendant / Appellee: MARYLAND DIVISION OF CORRECTION, STATE OF MARYLAND, LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor of the State of Maryland, in his official and individual capacities, NORTH BRANCH CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION and STEPHEN T. MOYER, Maryland State's Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services, in his official and indvidual capacities
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALBERT CURTIS MILLS
Case Number: 19-6971
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 26, 2019 Albert Mills v. State of Maryland

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed [1000560931] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [7] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Albert Mills #173-446. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Albert Mills and PLRA Custodian. [19-6971] RE [Entered: 08/06/2019 08:56 AM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Albert Curtis Mills. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-6971] RE [Entered: 08/06/2019 08:54 AM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Albert Curtis Mills. [19-6971] RE [Entered: 08/06/2019 08:53 AM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-02305-DKC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-6971] TW [Entered: 07/18/2019 08:58 AM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/22/2019. [19-6971] RE [Entered: 07/08/2019 12:03 PM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Albert Mills. Informal Opening Brief due 08/01/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-6971] RE [Entered: 07/08/2019 12:00 PM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Albert Curtis Mills ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Albert Mills. [19-6971] RE [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:59 AM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-02305-DKC. Case manager: REdwards. [19-6971] RE [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Albert Mills v. State of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARYLAND DIVISION OF CORRECTION
Represented By: Ari Jason Kodeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Ari Jason Kodeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAWRENCE J. HOGAN, JR., Governor of the State of Maryland, in his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Ari Jason Kodeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORTH BRANCH CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Represented By: Ari Jason Kodeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN T. MOYER, Maryland State's Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services, in his official and indvidual capacities
Represented By: Ari Jason Kodeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALBERT CURTIS MILLS
Represented By: Albert Curtis Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?