Thomas Jenkins v. Lawlor & Englert Law Firm
Defendant / Appellee: LAWLOR & ENGLERT LAW FIRM
Plaintiff / Appellant: THOMAS KEVIN JENKINS
Case Number: 19-7237
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed [1000598770] suspending informal briefing Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Thomas Jenkins. [19-7237] AW [Entered: 10/02/2019 07:43 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Thomas Kevin Jenkins to transfer case to the DC Circuit. [1000598766] [19-7237] AW [Entered: 10/02/2019 07:42 AM]
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 8:19-cv-01277-PX. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-7237] AW [Entered: 09/05/2019 07:11 AM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 09/18/2019. [19-7237] AW [Entered: 09/04/2019 08:35 AM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Thomas Jenkins. Informal Opening Brief due 09/30/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-7237] AW [Entered: 09/04/2019 08:34 AM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Thomas Kevin Jenkins - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 10/04/2019 Originating case number: 8:19-cv-01277-PX. Mailed to: Thomas Jenkins. [19-7237] AW [Entered: 09/04/2019 08:32 AM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:19-cv-01277-PX. Case manager: AWalker. [19-7237] AW [Entered: 08/30/2019 12:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Thomas Jenkins v. Lawlor & Englert Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAWLOR & ENGLERT LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS KEVIN JENKINS
Represented By: Thomas Kevin Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?