Charles Kee v. B. Antonelli
Respondent / Appellee: B. M. ANTONELLI, Warden
Petitioner / Appellant: CHARLES KEE, a/k/a O. P. G., a/k/a Billy Bad Ass, a/k/a G.F., a/k/a 9 Tray, a/k/a Punisher, a/k/a Ali, a/k/a O. G. Pun, a/k/a Ali Talib Abdul Skakur Muslum and CHARLES KEE, a/k/a O.P.G., a/k/a Billy Bad Ass, a/k/a G.F., a/k/a 9 Tray, a/k/a Punisher, a/k/a Ali, a/k/a O. G. Pun, a/k/a Ali Talib Abdul Skakur Muslum
Case Number: 19-7341
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 28, 2020 Charles Kee v. B. Antonelli

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [7]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Charles Kee. [1000630052] [19-7341] EB [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:14 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Charles Kee. [19-7341] EB [Entered: 11/20/2019 12:53 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 IFP-TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT (court access only) by Charles Kee. [19-7341] EB [Entered: 11/20/2019 12:52 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Charles Kee. [19-7341] EB [Entered: 11/20/2019 12:52 PM]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 4 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 11/27/2019. Fee/IFP/CJA 23 due 11/27/2019. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Charles Kee. [1000615493] [19-7341] EB [Entered: 10/28/2019 06:13 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00217-MGL. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-7341] EB [Entered: 10/28/2019 06:11 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Charles Kee to extend filing time for payment of fee/filing of IFP appl or CJA 23 and informal opening brief. [1000615491] [19-7341] EB [Entered: 10/28/2019 06:09 PM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Carles Kee. Informal Opening Brief due 10/17/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-7341] EB [Entered: 09/23/2019 02:51 PM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Charles Kee - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 10/23/2019. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00217-MGL. Mailed to: Charles Kee. [19-7341] EB [Entered: 09/23/2019 02:49 PM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00217-MGL. Date notice of appeal filed: 09/23/2019. Case manager: EBorneisen. Did district court rule on COA? N/A. [19-7341] EB [Entered: 09/23/2019 02:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Charles Kee v. B. Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: B. M. ANTONELLI, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CHARLES KEE, a/k/a O. P. G., a/k/a Billy Bad Ass, a/k/a G.F., a/k/a 9 Tray, a/k/a Punisher, a/k/a Ali, a/k/a O. G. Pun, a/k/a Ali Talib Abdul Skakur Muslum
Represented By: Charles Kee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CHARLES KEE, a/k/a O.P.G., a/k/a Billy Bad Ass, a/k/a G.F., a/k/a 9 Tray, a/k/a Punisher, a/k/a Ali, a/k/a O. G. Pun, a/k/a Ali Talib Abdul Skakur Muslum
Represented By: Charles Kee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?